Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 707 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 12566 Month
» 328797 Year
» 839899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bedford


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Bedford Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6 0-4-4T 1228   12/1902 14H Hitchin (MR)   05/1908 14   04/1914 8 Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1242 m/e 05/1908 13 Wellingborough m/e 04/1914 14 m/e 12/1921 12 Kettering
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1257 m/e 05/1908 18 Nottingham m/e 04/1914 14 m/e 12/1921 9 Spital Bridge
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1252 m/e 05/1908 3 Saltley m/e 04/1914 14 m/e 12/1921 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1272 m/e 12/1921 20 Buxton (MR) m/e 03/1930 M14 m/e 09/1933 M14 Bedford
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1273 m/e 12/1921 20 Buxton (MR) m/e 03/1930 M14 m/e 09/1933 M14 Bedford
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1239 m/e 03/1930 W9 Ryecroft (Walsall) m/e 09/1933 M14 m/e 11/1945 15A Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1260 m/e 03/1930 WD LNWR Western Division m/e 09/1933 M14 m/e 11/1945 15D Bedford
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1272 m/e 03/1930 M14 Bedford m/e 09/1933 M14 m/e 11/1945 15D Bedford
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1273 m/e 03/1930 M14 Bedford m/e 09/1933 M14 m/e 11/1945 15D Bedford
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1369 m/e 03/1930 M10 Leicester Midland m/e 09/1933 M14 4w/e 18/04/1936 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1260 m/e 09/1933 M14 Bedford m/e 11/1945 15D 01/01/1948 15D Bedford
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1272 m/e 09/1933 M14 Bedford m/e 11/1945 15D 4w/e 30/10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1273 m/e 09/1933 M14 Bedford m/e 11/1945 15D 4w/e 07/10/1950 23A Skipton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1302 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham m/e 11/1945 15D 4w/e 05/10/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1401 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham m/e 11/1945 15D 4w/e 05/10/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3185       4w/e 22/06/1946 15D 01/01/1948 15D Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7549       01/01/1948 15D w/e 30/03/1963 99H Horwich Works
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3888       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 27/03/1954 14C St Albans
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3910       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 12/07/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3967       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 06/09/1958 18C Hasland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3971       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 06/09/1958 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4362       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 31/10/1953 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4582       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 08/10/1955 20C Royston
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1070       01/01/1948 15D 8w/e 29/11/1952 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1091       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 29/01/1955 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1007       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 29/12/1951 16A Nottingham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1009       01/01/1948 15D m/e 11/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1013       01/01/1948 15D m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1017       01/01/1948 15D m/e 08/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1034       01/01/1948 15D m/e 04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1038       01/01/1948 15D m/e 08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1042       01/01/1948 15D m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1044       01/01/1948 15D m/e 09/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 453       01/01/1948 15D w/e 28/01/1961 26F Patricroft
Steam 2P 4-4-0 551       01/01/1948 15D m/e 10/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1209       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 05/09/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8177 4w/e 22/06/1946 15A Wellingborough 01/01/1948 15D w/e 10/01/1959 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3777       01/01/1948 15D 08/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3785       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 27/02/1954 14C St Albans
Steam 3P 4-4-0 762       01/01/1948 15D m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3174       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 08/03/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3185 4w/e 22/06/1946 15D Bedford 01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 25/01/1958 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3222       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 12/04/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3428       01/01/1948 15D w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3474       01/01/1948 15D 18/03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3721       01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 25/01/1958 15B Kettering
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3766       01/01/1948 15D w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47252       01/01/1948 15D m/e 01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 58037 m/e 11/1945 15D Bedford 01/01/1948 15D 4w/e 15/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41035 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 3w/e 11/12/1948 15D 4w/e 11/08/1951 21B Bournville
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 141 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 16/07/1949 15D 4w/e 31/12/1951 86K Abergavenny
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41094 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 5w/e 16/07/1949 15D 8w/e 11/07/1953 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41198 3w/e 11/12/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses 5w/e 24/12/1949 15D 8w/e 11/07/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41269       08/1950 (New) 15D w/e 14/02/1959 27A Bank Hall
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41270       09/1950 (New) 15D w/e 13/12/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41271       09/1950 (New) 15D w/e 01/07/1961 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41272       09/1950 (New) 15D w/e 13/12/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47223 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 09/09/1950 15D 4w/e 19/05/1956 18A Toton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58054 2w/e 17/06/1950 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 09/09/1950 15D 4w/e 17/07/1951 15A Wellingborough
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41056 01/01/1948 20G Hellifield 4w/e 04/11/1950 15D 4w/e 29/12/1951 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 3P 4-4-0 40758 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 24/02/1951 15D m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 4-4-0 40743 5w/e 16/07/1949 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 24/03/1951 15D m/e 07/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43261 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 06/10/1951 15D 4w/e 26/01/1952 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40929 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 29/12/1951 15D 8w/e 29/11/1952 17D Rowsley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41144 4w/e 06/10/1951 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 29/12/1951 15D 8w/e 29/11/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41048 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 26/01/1952 15D 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43629 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 26/01/1952 15D 4w/e 18/04/1953 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43454 5w/e 24/12/1949 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 23/02/1952 15D 12/02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41329       05/1952 (New) 15D w/e 22/11/1958 14D Neasden
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41071 01/01/1948 15B Kettering 8w/e 14/06/1952 15D 8w/e 29/11/1952 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41199 3w/e 11/12/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 12/07/1952 15D 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80045       04/09/1952 (New) 15D 4w/e 29/01/1955 14B Kentish Town
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41097 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 06/09/1952 15D 8w/e 29/11/1952 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80046       17/09/1952 (New) 15D 4w/e 29/01/1955 26D Bury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80047       30/09/1952 (New) 15D 3w/e 24/01/1953 14B Kentish Town
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40931 4w/e 19/05/1951 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 04/10/1952 15D 8w/e 29/11/1952 17D Rowsley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40934 4w/e 04/11/1950 17A Derby 4w/e 04/10/1952 15D 8w/e 29/11/1952 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41054 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 04/10/1952 15D m/e 09/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40900 8w/e 14/06/1952 16A Nottingham 8w/e 29/11/1952 15D 8w/e 11/07/1953 16A Nottingham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41049 01/01/1948 17D Rowsley 8w/e 29/11/1952 15D 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A Wellingborough
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41079 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses 8w/e 29/11/1952 15D 4w/e 19/05/1956 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80044 21/08/1952 17A Derby (New) 5w/e 03/01/1953 15D 4w/e 29/01/1955 26D Bury
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43873 01/01/1948 21D Stratford upon Avon 4w/e 21/02/1953 15D 4w/e 09/08/1958 14C St Albans
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44043 4w/e 27/01/1951 21D Stratford upon Avon 4w/e 21/02/1953 15D 4w/e 06/09/1958 14B Kentish Town
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80060       19/03/1953 (New) 15D 4w/e 29/01/1955 26D Bury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80061       08/04/1953 (New) 15D 4w/e 29/01/1955 26D Bury
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75040       08/1953 (New) 15D 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75041       08/1953 (New) 15D 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005       24/08/1953 (New) 15D w/e 01/07/1961 14D Neasden
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75042       09/1953 (New) 15D 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75043       09/1953 (New) 15D 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75044       09/1953 (New) 15D 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40411 4w/e 11/08/1951 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 31/10/1953 15D 4w/e 09/10/1954 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44317 8w/e 29/11/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 27/03/1954 15D 4w/e 22/03/1958 24L  
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43785 4w/e 27/02/1954 14C St Albans 4w/e 27/03/1954 15D 21/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43313 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 27/03/1954 15D 14/04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44217 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 4w/e 14/08/1954 15D 4w/e 06/11/1954 18A Toton
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41067 01/01/1948 20E Manningham 4w/e 11/09/1954 15D 4w/e 09/10/1954 20E Manningham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41103 4w/e 04/10/1952 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 11/09/1954 15D 4w/e 28/01/1956 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43529 01/01/1948 16D Mansfield 4w/e 11/09/1954 15D w/e 27/08/1960 21A Saltley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41059 4w/e 06/10/1951 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 09/10/1954 15D m/e 11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43829 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 09/10/1954 15D 14/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80093       11/10/1954 (New) 15D 4w/e 29/01/1955 26D Bury
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58040 4w/e 06/09/1952 20C Royston 4w/e 06/11/1954 15D 4w/e 01/01/1955 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75040 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D w/e 16/01/1960 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75041 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D w/e 16/01/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75042 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D w/e 02/05/1959 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75043 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D w/e 16/01/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75044 4w/e 31/10/1953 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/01/1955 15D w/e 16/01/1960 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43808 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 26/02/1955 15D w/e 08/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47264 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 21/05/1955 15D w/e 27/04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41078 01/01/1948 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 21/05/1955 15D 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43531 8w/e 14/06/1952 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 08/10/1955 15D m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45137 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 05/11/1955 15D w/e 06/02/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45139 4w/e 13/08/1955 10C Patricroft 4w/e 05/11/1955 15D w/e 06/02/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45290 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 05/11/1955 15D 4w/e 23/02/1957 26A Newton Heath
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45238 8w/e 16/07/1955 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 28/01/1956 15D m/e 16/06/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45342 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A Saltley 4w/e 28/01/1956 15D w/e 30/04/1960 14B Kentish Town
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45444 4w/e 03/12/1955 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 28/01/1956 15D m/e 16/06/1956 14B Kentish Town
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50646 4w/e 09/10/1954 20C Royston 4w/e 25/02/1956 15D m/e 11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50646 4w/e 09/10/1954 20C Royston 4w/e 25/02/1956 15D m/e 11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58215       4w/e 19/05/1956 15D 4w/e 22/02/1958 15B Kettering
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44984 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town m/e 16/06/1956 15D w/e 06/02/1960 14B Kentish Town
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45267 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town m/e 16/06/1956 15D w/e 30/04/1960 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43898 01/01/1948 16B Spital Bridge 4w/e 06/10/1956 15D 13/07/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44266 01/01/1948 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1956 15D 4w/e 22/03/1958 24L  
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75055       01/1957 (New) 15D w/e 16/01/1960 16A Nottingham
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45221 4w/e 24/02/1951 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 26/01/1957 15D w/e 23/01/1960 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47279 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 07/09/1957 15D w/e 03/08/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58214       4w/e 22/02/1958 15D w/e 18/06/1960 18A Toton
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58298       4w/e 22/03/1958 15D w/e 12/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43440 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/01/1959 14E 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43565 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/01/1959 14E w/e 23/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40020 4w/e 14/06/1958 1A Willesden w/e 31/01/1959 14E w/e 24/10/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41280 4w/e 18/05/1957 24G Skipton w/e 07/02/1959 14E w/e 16/01/1960 16D Annesley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40025 w/e 10/01/1959 14C St Albans w/e 11/07/1959 14E w/e 19/09/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40012 4w/e 22/03/1958 21A Saltley w/e 12/09/1959 14E w/e 07/11/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41224 4w/e 14/06/1958 1C Watford w/e 24/10/1959 14E w/e 17/03/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43333 4w/e 22/03/1958 15B Kettering w/e 24/10/1959 14E 21/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43373 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 24/10/1959 14E w/e 07/11/1959 14E Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43520 4w/e 03/12/1955 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 24/10/1959 14E 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41225       w/e 31/10/1959 14E w/e 24/09/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43261 w/e 10/01/1959 15C Leicester Midland w/e 31/10/1959 14E w/e 24/09/1960 9G Gorton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43373 w/e 24/10/1959 14E Bedford w/e 07/11/1959 14E 21/05/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40012 w/e 07/11/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 28/11/1959 14E w/e 12/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40020 w/e 24/10/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 28/11/1959 14E 08/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43449 3w/e 24/01/1953 20D Normanton w/e 05/12/1959 14E w/e 08/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43456 01/01/1948 20B Stourton w/e 05/12/1959 14E w/e 12/03/1960 9G Gorton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40026 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East w/e 16/01/1960 14E w/e 28/04/1962 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42680 w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 21/05/1960 14E w/e 03/08/1963 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42682 4w/e 06/11/1954 14B Kentish Town w/e 21/05/1960 14E w/e 03/08/1963 27C Southport
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42686 w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 21/05/1960 14E w/e 03/08/1963 26A Newton Heath
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41329 w/e 22/11/1958 14D Neasden w/e 19/11/1960 14E w/e 16/09/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40053 w/e 12/12/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 26/11/1960 14E 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43435 w/e 11/04/1959 17A Derby w/e 11/04/1961 14E w/e 15/07/1961 21A Saltley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44691 w/e 22/10/1960 17A Derby w/e 10/06/1961 14E w/e 22/09/1962 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45416 w/e 18/06/1960 17A Derby w/e 17/06/1961 14E w/e 18/05/1963 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84029 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh w/e 16/09/1961 14E w/e 20/01/1962 14D Neasden
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44985 w/e 12/11/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 16/09/1961 14E w/e 25/05/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45238 4w/e 07/09/1957 14A Cricklewood East w/e 16/09/1961 14E w/e 22/09/1962 2F Woodford Halse
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43935 4w/e 07/10/1950 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/11/1961 14E w/e 03/08/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44228 4w/e 22/03/1952 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/11/1961 14E w/e 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 01/07/1961 14D Neasden w/e 09/12/1961 14E w/e 17/03/1962 14D Neasden
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41225 w/e 24/09/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 09/12/1961 14E w/e 17/03/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44171 4w/e 01/01/1955 21A Saltley w/e 16/12/1961 14E w/e 03/08/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84006 w/e 09/12/1961 14D Neasden w/e 20/01/1962 14E w/e 17/03/1962 14D Neasden
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47485 w/e 04/03/1961 14B Kentish Town w/e 17/03/1962 14E w/e 03/08/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44203 w/e 24/03/1962 15C Leicester Midland w/e 07/04/1962 14E w/e 03/08/1963 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44433 w/e 24/09/1960 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962 14E w/e 03/08/1963 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44476 w/e 18/03/1961 15A Wellingborough w/e 07/04/1962 14E w/e 26/01/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44540 01/01/1948 17D Rowsley w/e 07/04/1962 14E w/e 14/09/1963 15B Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44578 w/e 18/11/1961 17A Derby w/e 07/04/1962 14E w/e 22/06/1963 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4134       07/06/1962 (New) 14E w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4132 28/05/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 16/06/1962 14E w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4133 01/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 16/06/1962 14E w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4135       18/06/1962 (New) 14E w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43453 w/e 07/11/1959 21A Saltley w/e 22/09/1962 14E w/e 02/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43521 w/e 20/02/1960 21A Saltley w/e 22/09/1962 14E w/e 06/04/1963 17A Derby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44774 w/e 22/09/1962 17B Burton w/e 10/11/1962 14E w/e 25/05/1963 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43342 01/01/1948 17D Rowsley w/e 22/12/1962 14E w/e 26/01/1963 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44327 01/01/1948 17D Rowsley w/e 19/01/1963 14E w/e 03/08/1963 17B Burton
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 19/01/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 02/02/1963 14E w/e 09/02/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43342 w/e 26/01/1963 17A Derby w/e 16/02/1963 14E w/e 11/05/1963 17A Derby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42174 w/e 22/09/1962 15C Leicester Midland w/e 30/03/1963 14E w/e 03/08/1963 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44984 w/e 17/03/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 18/05/1963 14E w/e 06/07/1963 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45197 w/e 11/05/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 25/05/1963 14E w/e 06/07/1963 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45289 w/e 11/05/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 25/05/1963 14E w/e 06/07/1963 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47437 w/e 25/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 29/06/1963 14E w/e 03/08/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73053 w/e 18/05/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 06/07/1963 14E w/e 03/08/1963 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73071 w/e 25/05/1963 14A Cricklewood East w/e 06/07/1963 14E w/e 03/08/1963 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73158 w/e 30/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 06/07/1963 14E w/e 03/08/1963 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4135 w/e 14/07/1962 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/01/1964 14C w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4136 22/06/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/01/1964 14C w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5379 27/03/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/01/1964 14C w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5380 06/04/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/01/1964 14C w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5381 06/04/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/01/1964 14C w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5382 18/04/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/01/1964 14C w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo D5383 26/04/1962 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/01/1964 14C w/e 07/03/1964 14B Cricklewood West