Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Watford


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Watford Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2598       4w/e 22/06/1946 1C 01/01/1948 1C Watford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7359       4w/e 22/06/1946 1C 01/01/1948 1B Camden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2304       4w/e 22/06/1946 1C 01/01/1948 1C Watford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2445       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 02/01/1954 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2446 4w/e 22/06/1946 1A Willesden 01/01/1948 1C 8w/e 14/06/1952 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2482       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 14/06/1958 6H Bangor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2541       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 29/01/1955 1E Bletchley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2582       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 27/01/1951 4A Bletchley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2589       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 12/07/1952 11E Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2590       01/01/1948 1C 8w/e 14/06/1952 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2593       01/01/1948 1C m/e 30/11/1949 91M To London Midland Region
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2598 4w/e 22/06/1946 1C Watford 01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 12/07/1952 8E Brunswick
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2610       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 11/08/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 1908       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 13/08/1955 9A Longsight
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 1909       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 10/09/1955 2C Warwick
Steam 2P 4-4-0 672       01/01/1948 1C w/e 20/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 03/11/1956 6D Chester Northgate
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 10       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 01/12/1956 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 20       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 11/08/1956 2C Warwick
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 43       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 05/11/1955 6H Bangor
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 46       01/01/1948 1C 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4396       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 27/01/1951 8E Brunswick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4443       01/01/1948 1C m/e 16/06/1956 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2304 4w/e 22/06/1946 1C Watford 01/01/1948 1C 8w/e 11/07/1953 5F Uttoxeter
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2389       01/01/1948 1C 8w/e 11/07/1953 5D Stoke
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8964       01/01/1948 1C 5w/e 24/12/1949 2B Bletchley
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9344       01/01/1948 1C w/e 28/01/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9375       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 24/02/1951 8A Edge Hill
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8915       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 11/08/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9145       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 11/08/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9249       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 17/07/1951 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9262       01/01/1948 1C w/e 17/09/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9323       01/01/1948 1C 4w/e 11/08/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6686       01/01/1948 1C 22/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42593 m/e 30/11/1949 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 24/12/1949 1C 8w/e 14/06/1952 5D Stoke
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40072 2w/e 17/06/1950 1A Willesden 4w/e 07/10/1950 1C 4w/e 11/09/1954 24E Blackpool Central
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49079 01/01/1948 3A Bescot 4w/e 04/11/1950 1C 4w/e 04/10/1952 1A Willesden
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49127 m/e 03/1950 Withdrawn 4w/e 24/02/1951 (R) 1C 4w/e 23/02/1952 8D Widnes
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42063 20/12/1950 5D Stoke (New) 4w/e 19/05/1951 1C 4w/e 16/06/1951 5D Stoke
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41288 12/1950 5A Crewe North (New) 4w/e 11/08/1951 1C 4w/e 23/02/1952 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41289 12/1950 5A Crewe North (New) 4w/e 08/09/1951 1C 4w/e 23/02/1952 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44067 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 4w/e 23/02/1952 1C m/e 16/06/1956 1A Willesden
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44343 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 4w/e 23/02/1952 1C 4w/e 10/08/1957 12C Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44363 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 4w/e 23/02/1952 1C 8w/e 05/10/1957 5D Stoke
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41320 01/1952 5A Crewe North (New) 4w/e 22/03/1952 1C 8w/e 14/06/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44370 4w/e 19/05/1951 1A Willesden 4w/e 19/04/1952 1C 4w/e 16/05/1953 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80035       17/05/1952 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80036       24/05/1952 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80037       24/05/1952 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80038       07/06/1952 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80034 05/04/1952 5A Crewe North (New) 8w/e 14/06/1952 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41275 10/1950 4A Bletchley (New) 4w/e 18/04/1953 1C 4w/e 16/05/1953 1E Bletchley
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80064       09/06/1953 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80065       25/06/1953 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41275 4w/e 16/05/1953 1E Bletchley 8w/e 11/07/1953 1C 4w/e 31/10/1953 1E Bletchley
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80066       15/07/1953 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80067       04/08/1953 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80068       21/08/1953 (New) 1C 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42389 8w/e 11/07/1953 5D Stoke 4w/e 28/11/1953 1C 4w/e 21/05/1955 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42343 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 4w/e 24/04/1954 1C 4w/e 21/05/1955 3B Bushbury
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40043 4w/e 05/11/1955 6H Bangor 4w/e 03/12/1955 1C 4w/e 14/06/1958 1A Willesden
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41320 4w/e 21/05/1955 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 24/03/1956 1C 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44442 01/01/1948 1A Willesden m/e 16/06/1956 1C w/e 23/06/1962 21B Bescot
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40020 4w/e 11/08/1956 2C Warwick 4w/e 06/10/1956 1C 4w/e 14/06/1958 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40010 4w/e 01/12/1956 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 29/12/1956 1C 4w/e 14/06/1958 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40061 4w/e 01/12/1956 2A Rugby 4w/e 23/03/1957 1C 4w/e 18/05/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41275 4w/e 31/10/1953 1E Bletchley 4w/e 23/03/1957 1C 4w/e 18/05/1957 1E Bletchley
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41220 4w/e 26/01/1957 6H Bangor 4w/e 18/05/1957 1C 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41220 4w/e 10/08/1957 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 07/09/1957 1C 8w/e 05/10/1957 3B Bushbury
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44348 4w/e 10/08/1957 6K Rhyl 8w/e 05/10/1957 1C w/e 23/06/1962 21B Bescot
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44440 4w/e 24/03/1951 1A Willesden 8w/e 05/10/1957 1C w/e 23/06/1962 21B Bescot
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41220 8w/e 05/10/1957 3B Bushbury 4w/e 30/11/1957 1C 4w/e 28/12/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41320 4w/e 07/09/1957 2A Rugby 4w/e 30/11/1957 1C 4w/e 22/02/1958 2E Northampton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41220 4w/e 28/12/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 22/02/1958 1C 4w/e 17/05/1958 5A Crewe North
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 41901 4w/e 07/09/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 22/03/1958 1C m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41223 4w/e 24/03/1956 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 14/06/1958 1C w/e 22/12/1962 75A Brighton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41224 4w/e 24/03/1956 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 14/06/1958 1C w/e 24/10/1959 14E Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43325 4w/e 28/01/1956 9A Longsight 4w/e 12/07/1958 1C 18/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46431       w/e 29/11/1958 1C w/e 25/05/1963 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40659 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 07/11/1959 1C m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47307 4w/e 14/06/1958 1B Camden w/e 07/11/1959 1C w/e 14/07/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42095 6w/e 22/10/1959 73F Ashford w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 22/07/1961 12C Carlisle Canal
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42096 4w/e 06/10/1951 74A Ashford w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42097 4w/e 06/10/1951 74A Ashford w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42098 4w/e 06/10/1951 74A Ashford w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 15/07/1961 12G Oxenholme
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42099 3w/e 17/11/1956 74A Ashford w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42100 3w/e 17/11/1956 74A Ashford w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42101 01/09/1950 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 18/06/1960 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42102 4w/e 19/03/1952 75F Tunbridge Wells West w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42103 8w/e 20/07/1953 75F Tunbridge Wells West w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 26/11/1960 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42104 6w/e 15/06/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West w/e 05/12/1959 1C w/e 26/11/1960 2A Rugby
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5074 w/e 02/04/1960 1A Willesden w/e 19/11/1960 1C w/e 09/01/1965 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5081 w/e 20/08/1960 1A Willesden w/e 19/11/1960 1C w/e 09/01/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40657 4w/e 30/11/1957 10B Preston w/e 10/12/1960 1C w/e 20/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40683 4w/e 14/06/1958 24K Preston w/e 10/12/1960 1C m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42368 w/e 12/09/1959 1A Willesden w/e 07/01/1961 1C w/e 10/06/1961 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5063 w/e 05/11/1960 1A Willesden w/e 11/02/1961 1C w/e 11/03/1961 1C Watford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42470 01/01/1948 3D Aston w/e 18/02/1961 1C w/e 10/06/1961 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5063 w/e 11/02/1961 1C Watford w/e 11/03/1961 1C w/e 01/04/1961 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5023 25/09/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 18/03/1961 1C w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44340 w/e 10/09/1960 2E Northampton w/e 11/04/1961 1C w/e 23/06/1962 21B Bescot
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5031 w/e 28/01/1961 1A Willesden w/e 09/09/1961 1C w/e 16/02/1963 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5035 w/e 08/04/1961 1A Willesden w/e 09/09/1961 1C w/e 09/01/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42616 w/e 08/07/1961 6H Bangor w/e 16/09/1961 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42101 w/e 08/07/1961 6H Bangor w/e 16/09/1961 1C w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2518       22/11/1961 (New) 1C w/e 05/01/1963 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5082 w/e 09/07/1960 1A Willesden w/e 12/05/1962 1C w/e 05/01/1963 5A Crewe North
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43007 w/e 17/02/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43021 w/e 17/02/1962 2B Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962 1C w/e 03/04/1965 5D Stoke
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43018 w/e 09/07/1960 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 23/06/1962 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46470 w/e 10/02/1962 21D Aston w/e 23/06/1962 1C w/e 09/03/1963 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47606 w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden w/e 14/07/1962 1C w/e 09/02/1963 Wolverton Works
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46423 w/e 31/01/1959 3D Aston w/e 15/09/1962 1C w/e 25/05/1963 8D Widnes
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5001 w/e 28/07/1962 1A Willesden w/e 06/10/1962 1C w/e 16/02/1963 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42100 w/e 23/06/1962 5A Crewe North w/e 15/12/1962 1C w/e 02/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47606 w/e 09/02/1963 Wolverton Works w/e 09/03/1963 1C w/e 11/05/1963 1E Bletchley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42099 w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden w/e 16/03/1963 1C 05/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46526 4w/e 12/01/1963 84F Stourbridge Junction w/e 30/03/1963 1C w/e 07/12/1963 2E Saltley
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78034 w/e 16/09/1961 6H Bangor w/e 25/05/1963 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78035 4w/e 17/05/1958 8D Widnes w/e 25/05/1963 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78029 w/e 25/05/1963 89D Oswestry w/e 01/06/1963 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12053 w/e 04/04/1959 6A Chester (MR) w/e 12/12/1964 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42233 w/e 26/05/1962 2E Northampton w/e 12/12/1964 1C w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3069 w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden w/e 10/04/1965 1C w/e 19/06/1965 1E Bletchley