Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wellingborough


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Wellingborough Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1267 m/e 04/1892 3 Saltley m/e 01/1899 13 m/e 12/1902 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1268 m/e 04/1892 3 Saltley m/e 01/1899 13 m/e 12/1902 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1267 m/e 01/1899 13 Wellingborough m/e 12/1902 13 m/e 05/1908 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1268 m/e 01/1899 13 Wellingborough m/e 12/1902 13 m/e 05/1908 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1241 m/e 12/1902 13 Wellingborough m/e 05/1908 13 m/e 04/1914 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1242 m/e 12/1902 13 Wellingborough m/e 05/1908 13 m/e 04/1914 14 Bedford
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1241 m/e 05/1908 13 Wellingborough m/e 04/1914 13 m/e 12/1921 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1329 m/e 05/1908 5 Brecon m/e 04/1914 13 m/e 12/1921 13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1241 m/e 04/1914 13 Wellingborough m/e 12/1921 13 m/e 03/1930 M13 Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1260 m/e 04/1914 18 Nottingham m/e 12/1921 13 m/e 03/1930 WD LNWR Western Division
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1252 m/e 04/1914 14 Bedford m/e 12/1921 13 m/e 03/1930 W38R Rhyl
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1329 m/e 04/1914 13 Wellingborough m/e 12/1921 13 m/e 03/1930 28 Holbeck (MR)
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1241 m/e 12/1921 13 Wellingborough m/e 03/1930 M13 4w/e 03/12/1932 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1242 m/e 12/1921 12 Kettering m/e 03/1930 M13 4w/e 29/11/1930 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1257 m/e 12/1921 9 Spital Bridge m/e 03/1930 M13 4w/e 26/12/1931 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1259 m/e 12/1921 11 Wigston m/e 03/1930 M13 m/e 09/1933 M13 Wellingborough
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1410 m/e 12/1921 18 Nottingham m/e 03/1930 M13 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1246 m/e 03/1930 W38R Rhyl m/e 09/1933 M13 m/e 11/1945 15A Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1259 m/e 03/1930 M13 Wellingborough m/e 09/1933 M13 4w/e 08/09/1934 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1239 m/e 09/1933 M14 Bedford m/e 11/1945 15A 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 1246 m/e 09/1933 M13 Wellingborough m/e 11/1945 15A 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1340 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham m/e 11/1945 15A 5w/e 16/07/1949 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8124       4w/e 22/06/1946 15A 01/01/1948 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8128       4w/e 22/06/1946 15A 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8177       4w/e 22/06/1946 15A 01/01/1948 15D Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7264       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 21/05/1955 15D Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7265       01/01/1948 15A m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7279       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 07/09/1957 15D Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7333       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 30/01/1954 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7446       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 06/11/1954 20D Normanton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7543       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 10/08/1957 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7554       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 06/11/1954 14C St Albans
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7636       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 09/10/1954 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7642       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 21/05/1955 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3861       01/01/1948 15A w/e 16/01/1960 15D Coalville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3870       01/01/1948 15A w/e 10/01/1959 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3876       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 09/08/1958 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3909       01/01/1948 15A 5w/e 24/12/1949 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3982       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 07/10/1950 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4033       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 31/12/1950 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4160       01/01/1948 15A 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A Saltley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4242       01/01/1948 15A 5w/e 16/07/1949 16B Spital Bridge
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4287       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 29/12/1951 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4332       01/01/1948 15A m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4574       01/01/1948 15A w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4575       01/01/1948 15A w/e 26/01/1963 18A Toton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 353       01/01/1948 15A m/e 07/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 510       01/01/1948 15A m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 548       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 19/04/1952 35C Spital Bridge
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8024       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 24/02/1951 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8050       01/01/1948 15A 8w/e 16/07/1955 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8082       01/01/1948 15A 8w/e 16/07/1955 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8128 4w/e 22/06/1946 15A Wellingborough 01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 24/02/1951 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8167       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 24/02/1951 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8180       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 13/08/1955 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8181       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 13/08/1955 19C Canklow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8192       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 11/08/1956 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8198       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 06/10/1956 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8222       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 10/09/1955 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8264       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 10/08/1957 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8269       01/01/1948 15A m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8281       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 10/09/1955 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8305       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 20/04/1957 2E Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8334       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 26/03/1955 16C Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8338       01/01/1948 15A m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8359       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 18/05/1957 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8360       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 20/04/1957 2E Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8363       01/01/1948 15A 8w/e 05/10/1957 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8364       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 31/12/1950 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8365       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 30/11/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8371       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 26/02/1955 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8374       01/01/1948 15A w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8492       01/01/1948 15A w/e 14/12/1963 15C Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8617       01/01/1948 15A w/e 23/01/1965 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8625       01/01/1948 15A w/e 18/06/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8627       01/01/1948 15A w/e 18/06/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8644       01/01/1948 15A w/e 15/08/1959 15D Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8646       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 28/12/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8651       01/01/1948 15A w/e 24/10/1964 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8671       01/01/1948 15A w/e 08/05/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8678       01/01/1948 15A m/e 21/07/1956 38B Annesley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8692       01/01/1948 15A m/e 16/06/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8694       01/01/1948 15A w/e 23/05/1959 17B Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8695       01/01/1948 15A w/e 09/05/1959 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8699       01/01/1948 15A w/e 26/01/1963 15D Coalville
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3796       01/01/1948 15A 11/09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3797       01/01/1948 15A 13/06/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3808       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 26/02/1955 15D Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3830       01/01/1948 15A 2w/e 14/01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3367       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 13/08/1955 15B Kettering
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7238       01/01/1948 15A 3w/e 24/01/1953 19C Canklow
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9292       01/01/1948 15A m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9121       01/01/1948 15A m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9123       01/01/1948 15A m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9217       01/01/1948 15A m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9223       01/01/1948 15A 3w/e 11/12/1948 3A Bescot
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9288       01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 24/03/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9289       01/01/1948 15A m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9290       01/01/1948 15A m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 58030 m/e 11/1945 15A Wellingborough 01/01/1948 15A 3w/e 11/12/1948 15A Wellingborough
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 58031 m/e 11/1945 15A Wellingborough 01/01/1948 15A 4w/e 18/06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44466 01/01/1948 22A Bristol Barrow Road 3w/e 11/12/1948 15A m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 468 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 3w/e 11/12/1948 15A m/e 05/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 58030 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 3w/e 11/12/1948 15A 4w/e 21/05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58053 m/e 11/1945 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 16/07/1949 15A 8w/e 29/11/1952 17B Burton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47273 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 5w/e 24/12/1949 15A w/e 22/08/1964 5B Crewe South
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58045 m/e 11/1945 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 09/09/1950 15A 4w/e 25/11/1950 33A Plaistow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48008 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 02/12/1950 15A 4w/e 26/03/1955 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48107 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 02/12/1950 15A 4w/e 27/03/1954 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48111 01/01/1948 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 02/12/1950 15A 4w/e 02/01/1954 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8265 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 02/12/1950 15A 4w/e 10/09/1955 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48475 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 02/12/1950 15A 4w/e 19/06/1954 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48543 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 02/12/1950 15A 8w/e 29/11/1952 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48721 01/01/1948 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 02/12/1950 15A 4w/e 16/05/1953 20B Stourton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48131 4w/e 07/10/1950 18A Toton 4w/e 31/12/1950 15A 4w/e 09/08/1952 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48133 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 31/12/1950 15A 4w/e 01/12/1956 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48376 01/01/1948 20C Royston 4w/e 31/12/1950 15A 4w/e 12/07/1958 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48201 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 27/01/1951 15A 4w/e 24/02/1951 18A Toton
Steam Garratt 2-6-6-2T 47974 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 24/02/1951 15A 4w/e 04/12/1954 18A Toton
Steam Garratt 2-6-6-2T 47977 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 24/02/1951 15A 4w/e 04/12/1954 18A Toton
Steam Garratt 2-6-6-2T 47982 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 24/02/1951 15A 4w/e 04/12/1954 18A Toton
Steam Garratt 2-6-6-2T 47994 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 24/02/1951 15A 4w/e 04/12/1954 18A Toton
Steam Garratt 2-6-6-2T 47995 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 24/02/1951 15A 4w/e 04/12/1954 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48364 4w/e 31/12/1950 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 24/02/1951 15A 8w/e 05/10/1957 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48053 4w/e 24/02/1951 17B Burton 4w/e 19/05/1951 15A 4w/e 16/06/1951 20C Royston
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58045 4w/e 23/12/1950 33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/05/1951 15A 4w/e 17/07/1951 23A Skipton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43856 01/01/1948 18C Hasland 4w/e 16/06/1951 15A 4w/e 04/10/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58054 4w/e 09/09/1950 15D Bedford 4w/e 17/07/1951 15A 4w/e 03/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41277 10/1950 7D Rhyl (New) 4w/e 11/08/1951 15A w/e 14/02/1959 17B Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48653 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 06/10/1951 15A 4w/e 26/01/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48467 4w/e 23/02/1952 20D Normanton 4w/e 19/04/1952 15A 8w/e 29/11/1952 15B Kettering
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41328       05/1952 (New) 15A w/e 14/02/1959 17B Burton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43531 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 8w/e 14/06/1952 15A 4w/e 08/10/1955 15D Bedford
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58193       4w/e 09/08/1952 15A 4w/e 21/03/1953 15B Kettering
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58195       4w/e 09/08/1952 15A 4w/e 21/03/1953 15B Kettering
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58164       4w/e 09/08/1952 15A 3w/e 24/01/1953 15B Kettering
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43977 4w/e 22/03/1952 15B Kettering 4w/e 06/09/1952 15A w/e 02/04/1960 15F Market Harborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44287 4w/e 29/12/1951 17A Derby 4w/e 06/09/1952 15A 4w/e 04/10/1952 15B Kettering
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43975 8w/e 29/11/1952 17A Derby 4w/e 21/02/1953 15A 4w/e 02/01/1954 14B Kentish Town
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48266 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 4w/e 18/04/1953 15A 4w/e 16/05/1953 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48314 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 18/04/1953 15A 4w/e 16/05/1953 20B Stourton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40484 01/01/1948 20F Skipton 8w/e 11/07/1953 15A m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48183 4w/e 16/05/1953 15C Leicester Midland 8w/e 11/07/1953 15A 4w/e 02/01/1954 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43979 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 03/10/1953 15A w/e 16/01/1960 15D Coalville
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40487 8w/e 29/11/1952 16D Mansfield 4w/e 03/10/1953 15A 4w/e 28/11/1953 16A Nottingham
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 58091 m/e 11/1945 20G Hellifield 4w/e 03/10/1953 15A 6w/e 25/12/1954 33A Plaistow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48772 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 31/10/1953 15A 4w/e 02/01/1954 18A Toton
Steam Garratt 2-6-6-2T 47986 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 02/01/1954 15A 4w/e 04/12/1954 18C Hasland
Steam Garratt 2-6-6-2T 47988 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 02/01/1954 15A 8w/e 19/06/1954 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44230 4w/e 02/01/1954 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 30/01/1954 15A 4w/e 01/01/1955 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92008       31/03/1954 (New) 15A 4w/e 16/06/1957 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92009       31/03/1954 (New) 15A 4w/e 16/06/1957 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48319 4w/e 24/04/1954 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 8w/e 19/06/1954 15A 4w/e 17/07/1954 21A Saltley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13057       14/08/1954 (New) 15A w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13058       11/09/1954 (New) 15A w/e 17/11/1962 2F Woodford Halse
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13059       11/09/1954 (New) 15A w/e 03/12/1960 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92015       30/09/1954 (New) 15A 4w/e 28/12/1957 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92016       31/10/1954 (New) 15A 4w/e 28/12/1957 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92017       31/10/1954 (New) 15A 4w/e 28/12/1957 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92018       31/10/1954 (New) 15A 4w/e 28/12/1957 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92019       31/10/1954 (New) 15A 4w/e 28/12/1957 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48053 4w/e 16/06/1951 20C Royston 4w/e 06/11/1954 15A 4w/e 26/03/1955 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48125 01/01/1948 18B Westhouses 4w/e 06/11/1954 15A 8w/e 16/07/1955 18A Toton
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 58040 4w/e 06/11/1954 15D Bedford 4w/e 01/01/1955 15A 4w/e 26/03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92045       05/02/1955 (New) 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92046       12/02/1955 (New) 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92047       19/02/1955 (New) 15A 4w/e 13/08/1955 6F Bidston
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92048       26/02/1955 (New) 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43974 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 26/02/1955 15A 14/07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92049       12/03/1955 (New) 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92020       21/03/1955 (New) 15A w/e 02/11/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92021       21/03/1955 (New) 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92022       21/03/1955 (New) 15A w/e 20/07/1963 17C Rowsley
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 58080 4w/e 28/11/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 23/04/1955 15A 4w/e 28/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44182 4w/e 09/10/1954 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 21/05/1955 15A w/e 08/10/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92024       11/06/1955 (New) 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92025       18/06/1955 (New) 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92026       18/06/1955 (New) 15A w/e 11/04/1961 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92027       25/06/1955 (New) 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92028       09/07/1955 (New) 15A w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92029       09/07/1955 (New) 15A w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92051 27/08/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 03/12/1955 15A 4w/e 31/12/1955 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48062 4w/e 24/03/1951 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 03/12/1955 15A 4w/e 31/12/1955 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48170 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 03/12/1955 15A 4w/e 31/12/1955 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48186 4w/e 07/10/1950 18A Toton 4w/e 03/12/1955 15A 4w/e 31/12/1955 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48273 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 03/12/1955 15A 4w/e 31/12/1955 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48452 4w/e 23/02/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 03/12/1955 15A 4w/e 28/01/1956 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92023 4w/e 26/11/1955 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A w/e 03/08/1963 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92060 30/11/1955 54B Tyne Dock (New) 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A 4w/e 21/04/1956 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92061 30/11/1955 54B Tyne Dock (New) 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A 4w/e 21/04/1956 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92062 30/11/1955 54B Tyne Dock (New) 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18B Westhouses
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92063 30/11/1955 54B Tyne Dock (New) 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18B Westhouses
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92064 31/12/1955 54B Tyne Dock (New) 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92065 31/12/1955 54B Tyne Dock (New) 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92066 31/12/1955 54B Tyne Dock (New) 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 18A Toton
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41048 4w/e 26/01/1952 15D Bedford 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A m/e 10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41049 8w/e 29/11/1952 15D Bedford 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A 4w/e 21/04/1956 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41078 4w/e 21/05/1955 15D Bedford 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A 4w/e 25/02/1956 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41199 4w/e 12/07/1952 15D Bedford 4w/e 28/01/1956 15A 4w/e 11/08/1956 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48037 4w/e 28/11/1953 18A Toton 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A 4w/e 24/03/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48112 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A 4w/e 24/03/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48152 4w/e 07/10/1950 18A Toton 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A m/e 16/06/1956 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48168 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A m/e 16/06/1956 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43624 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A w/e 10/01/1959 15B Kettering
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50650 4w/e 06/11/1954 20C Royston 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50650 4w/e 06/11/1954 20C Royston 4w/e 25/02/1956 15A m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48035 4w/e 19/05/1951 15B Kettering 4w/e 21/04/1956 15A m/e 16/06/1956 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92082       31/05/1956 (New) 15A w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92083       31/05/1956 (New) 15A w/e 12/11/1960 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92084       31/05/1956 (New) 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92085       30/06/1956 (New) 15A w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92086       30/06/1956 (New) 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam O1 2-8-0 63725 26/11/1950 38B Annesley 15/07/1956 15A 16/12/1956 38B Annesley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43929 01/01/1948 17D Rowsley 4w/e 11/08/1956 15A w/e 19/05/1962 9G Gorton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47208 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 11/08/1956 15A 4w/e 25/01/1958 6A Chester (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13056 14/08/1954 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 08/09/1956 15A w/e 25/11/1961 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92105       30/09/1956 (New) 15A 4w/e 01/12/1956 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92106       30/09/1956 (New) 15A 4w/e 01/12/1956 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92107       30/09/1956 (New) 15A w/e 09/12/1961 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92108       13/10/1956 (New) 15A 4w/e 01/12/1956 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48191 4w/e 06/10/1956 15B Kettering 4w/e 01/12/1956 15A 4w/e 23/03/1957 17E Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48198 4w/e 06/10/1956 15B Kettering 4w/e 01/12/1956 15A 4w/e 23/03/1957 17E Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48678 m/e 21/07/1956 38B Annesley 4w/e 29/12/1956 15A w/e 23/05/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43995 4w/e 03/12/1955 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 26/01/1957 15A w/e 22/09/1962 15D Coalville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44175 4w/e 29/12/1956 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 26/01/1957 15A m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92121       28/02/1957 (New) 15A 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92122       28/02/1957 (New) 15A w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92123       31/03/1957 (New) 15A w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92124       31/03/1957 (New) 15A w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92125       31/03/1957 (New) 15A w/e 17/12/1960 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92126       31/03/1957 (New) 15A w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92127       30/04/1957 (New) 15A w/e 20/07/1963 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92109 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A Saltley 4w/e 16/06/1957 15A 4w/e 10/08/1957 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92121 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A Saltley 4w/e 16/06/1957 15A 4w/e 10/08/1957 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92154       31/10/1957 (New) 15A 4w/e 17/05/1958 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92159       30/11/1957 (New) 15A w/e 06/12/1958 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92160       30/11/1957 (New) 15A 4w/e 04/10/1958 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92132 31/05/1957 21A Saltley (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92133 30/06/1957 21A Saltley (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A w/e 15/02/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92134 30/06/1957 21A Saltley (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A w/e 15/02/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43859 4w/e 13/08/1955 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A 4w/e 06/09/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44248 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A 4w/e 06/09/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92018 4w/e 28/12/1957 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 25/01/1958 15A w/e 24/03/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92019 4w/e 28/12/1957 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 25/01/1958 15A w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92052 27/08/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A w/e 03/06/1961 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92054 24/09/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A w/e 29/09/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92055 24/09/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A w/e 24/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92056 31/10/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A w/e 24/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92058 31/10/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A w/e 24/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92059 31/10/1955 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A w/e 24/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92080 30/04/1956 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 22/03/1958 15A w/e 03/08/1963 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92154 4w/e 17/05/1958 16D Annesley 4w/e 04/10/1958 15A w/e 15/02/1964 16B Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92159 w/e 06/12/1958 14A Cricklewood East w/e 20/12/1958 15A w/e 08/02/1964 16J Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84006 26/08/1953 17B Burton (New) w/e 10/01/1959 15A w/e 09/12/1961 14D Neasden
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84007 31/08/1953 17B Burton (New) w/e 14/02/1959 15A w/e 24/03/1962 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84008 31/08/1953 17B Burton (New) w/e 14/02/1959 15A w/e 24/06/1961 14D Neasden
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92108 4w/e 01/12/1956 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/04/1959 15A w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92110 4w/e 01/12/1956 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/04/1959 15A w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92111 30/11/1956 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/04/1959 15A w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92112 30/11/1956 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 18/04/1959 15A w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48381 4w/e 11/08/1956 14A Cricklewood East w/e 23/05/1959 15A w/e 11/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48495 w/e 07/02/1959 14A Cricklewood East w/e 23/05/1959 15A w/e 10/08/1963 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48382 w/e 22/11/1958 15D Coalville w/e 15/08/1959 15A w/e 19/11/1960 15D Coalville
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41320 4w/e 22/02/1958 2E Northampton w/e 05/09/1959 15A w/e 19/12/1959 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92118 31/12/1956 18B Westhouses (New) w/e 07/11/1959 15A w/e 20/01/1962 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48141 01/01/1948 15B Kettering w/e 07/11/1959 15A w/e 08/07/1961 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48143 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/11/1959 15A w/e 08/07/1961 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92053 4w/e 22/03/1958 21A Saltley w/e 21/11/1959 15A w/e 22/09/1962 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92081 w/e 07/11/1959 21A Saltley w/e 21/11/1959 15A w/e 03/08/1963 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92120 w/e 06/12/1958 21A Saltley w/e 21/11/1959 15A w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92101 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C Leicester Midland w/e 09/01/1960 15A w/e 09/04/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44156 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 16/01/1960 15A w/e 01/12/1962 15D Coalville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44278 4w/e 06/09/1958 15D Coalville w/e 16/01/1960 15A w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44388 4w/e 05/11/1955 2F Market Harborough w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 30/04/1960 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48007 4w/e 26/03/1955 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 24/09/1960 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48010 4w/e 19/05/1956 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 09/02/1963 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48027 3w/e 14/01/1950 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 20/07/1963 2F Woodford Halse
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48061 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 20/07/1963 2F Woodford Halse
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48107 8w/e 19/06/1954 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 16/07/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48133 4w/e 01/12/1956 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 15/07/1961 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48149 4w/e 02/01/1954 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 08/07/1961 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48266 4w/e 27/02/1954 15C Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960 15A w/e 19/09/1964 16F Burton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43010 w/e 10/10/1959 14D Neasden w/e 02/04/1960 15A w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48117 4w/e 23/04/1955 16A Nottingham w/e 25/06/1960 15A w/e 09/07/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3776 w/e 02/01/1960 15B Kettering w/e 09/07/1960 15A w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3777 25/07/1959 15B Kettering (New) w/e 09/07/1960 15A w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3778 08/08/1959 15B Kettering (New) w/e 09/07/1960 15A w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48627 w/e 18/06/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 16/07/1960 15A w/e 18/04/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47433 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East w/e 24/09/1960 15A w/e 30/09/1961 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12035 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A Saltley w/e 04/02/1961 15A w/e 11/02/1961 21A Saltley
Diesel 11 0-6-0 7122 4w/e 10/08/1957 21A Saltley w/e 04/02/1961 15A w/e 11/02/1961 21A Saltley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3059 w/e 03/12/1960 2F Woodford Halse w/e 18/02/1961 15A w/e 27/05/1961 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92083 w/e 12/11/1960 16D Annesley w/e 04/03/1961 15A w/e 09/02/1963 16D Annesley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44020 8w/e 19/06/1954 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 15A m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44169 8w/e 19/06/1954 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 15A w/e 18/03/1961 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44465 4w/e 30/11/1957 17A Derby w/e 04/03/1961 15A w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44476 w/e 08/10/1960 17A Derby w/e 18/03/1961 15A w/e 07/04/1962 14E Bedford
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92026 w/e 11/04/1961 21A Saltley w/e 29/04/1961 15A w/e 03/08/1963 15B Kettering
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3059 w/e 27/05/1961 2F Woodford Halse w/e 17/06/1961 15A w/e 17/03/1962 2F Woodford Halse
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47660       w/e 30/09/1961 15A w/e 22/12/1962 24B Rose Grove
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3056 w/e 25/11/1961 2F Woodford Halse w/e 16/12/1961 15A w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84027 w/e 21/10/1961 26C Bolton w/e 27/01/1962 15A w/e 24/03/1962 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92108 w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 10/02/1962 15A w/e 29/09/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92019 w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton w/e 10/03/1962 15A w/e 24/03/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92082 w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton w/e 10/03/1962 15A w/e 09/02/1963 16D Annesley
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41224 w/e 24/10/1959 14E Bedford w/e 17/03/1962 15A w/e 05/01/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41227 w/e 14/10/1961 16D Annesley w/e 24/03/1962 15A w/e 04/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92019 w/e 24/03/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 07/04/1962 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92117 w/e 10/03/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 07/04/1962 15A w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41280 w/e 16/01/1960 16D Annesley w/e 14/04/1962 15A w/e 17/11/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47257 w/e 22/10/1960 17A Derby w/e 05/05/1962 15A w/e 02/05/1964 99H Horwich Works
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92056 w/e 31/03/1962 21A Saltley w/e 12/05/1962 15A w/e 22/09/1962 17C Rowsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3059 w/e 17/03/1962 2F Woodford Halse w/e 16/06/1962 15A w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43106 w/e 31/03/1962 21A Saltley w/e 23/06/1962 15A w/e 23/03/1963 15B Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92055 w/e 14/04/1962 18A Toton w/e 07/07/1962 15A w/e 22/09/1962 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92112 w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 07/07/1962 15A w/e 14/07/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92122 w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 07/07/1962 15A w/e 29/09/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48089 4w/e 22/02/1958 18C Hasland w/e 07/07/1962 15A w/e 18/08/1962 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92110 w/e 10/02/1962 26B Agecroft w/e 14/07/1962 15A w/e 29/09/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44235 w/e 14/02/1959 14B Kentish Town w/e 25/08/1962 15A w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44243 5w/e 24/12/1949 14B Kentish Town w/e 25/08/1962 15A w/e 16/02/1963 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44297 4w/e 22/03/1952 14A Cricklewood East w/e 15/09/1962 15A w/e 26/01/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44441 w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 15/09/1962 15A w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48301 w/e 26/11/1960 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 15/09/1962 15A w/e 11/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44118 w/e 15/09/1962 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43012 w/e 20/02/1960 21A Saltley w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 04/01/1964 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43013 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A Saltley w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43019 8w/e 29/11/1952 14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 28/09/1963 5D Stoke
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43031 4w/e 21/02/1953 14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43047 8w/e 11/07/1953 21A Saltley w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43118 8w/e 29/11/1952 14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 28/09/1963 5D Stoke
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43119 w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 30/03/1963 15B Kettering
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43120 11/07/1951 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43121 10/08/1951 14A Cricklewood East (New) w/e 22/09/1962 15A w/e 14/12/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48125 4w/e 10/08/1957 18C Hasland w/e 10/11/1962 15A w/e 06/07/1963 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48538 w/e 23/06/1962 18B Westhouses w/e 10/11/1962 15A w/e 11/07/1964 16G Westhouses
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3058 w/e 17/11/1962 2F Woodford Halse w/e 08/12/1962 15A w/e 27/04/1963 2F Woodford Halse
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 07/07/1962 14B Kentish Town w/e 19/01/1963 15A w/e 02/02/1963 14E Bedford
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84029 w/e 07/07/1962 14B Kentish Town w/e 19/01/1963 15A w/e 16/02/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 02/02/1963 14E Bedford w/e 09/02/1963 15A w/e 08/02/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92010 4w/e 16/02/1957 38B Annesley w/e 09/03/1963 15A w/e 22/06/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92070 w/e 23/06/1962 18B Westhouses w/e 09/03/1963 15A w/e 18/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92083 w/e 09/02/1963 16D Annesley w/e 09/03/1963 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92100 w/e 30/01/1960 18B Westhouses w/e 09/03/1963 15A w/e 18/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92116 31/12/1956 18B Westhouses (New) w/e 09/03/1963 15A w/e 15/02/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92105 4w/e 01/12/1956 15B Kettering w/e 16/03/1963 15A w/e 18/01/1964 15C Kettering
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84008 w/e 29/12/1962 15C Leicester Midland w/e 04/05/1963 15A w/e 08/02/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3058 w/e 27/04/1963 2F Woodford Halse w/e 11/05/1963 15A w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47279 4w/e 07/09/1957 15D Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 15A w/e 02/11/1963 12D Workington
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47437 w/e 29/06/1963 14E Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 15A w/e 21/12/1963 16C Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47485 w/e 17/03/1962 14E Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 15A w/e 02/11/1963 8A Edge Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43935 w/e 18/11/1961 14E Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 15A 02/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44171 w/e 16/12/1961 14E Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 15A w/e 23/11/1963 15E Coalville
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92052 w/e 20/07/1963 18A Toton w/e 17/08/1963 15A w/e 26/10/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92077 31/03/1956 18A Toton (New) w/e 17/08/1963 15A w/e 26/10/1963 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44540 w/e 07/04/1962 14E Bedford w/e 14/09/1963 15B w/e 02/11/1963 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41227 w/e 04/05/1963 15C Leicester Midland w/e 28/09/1963 15B 4w/e 27/04/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84007 w/e 24/03/1962 16D Annesley w/e 14/12/1963 15B 18/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48050 8w/e 16/07/1955 15B Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 11/04/1964 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48132 w/e 23/06/1962 15B Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 15/05/1965 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48285 01/01/1948 15B Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48301 w/e 11/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 28/03/1964 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48381 w/e 11/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 19/09/1964 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48388 w/e 06/10/1962 15B Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 07/11/1964 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48607 w/e 07/01/1961 15B Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 07/11/1964 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48609 4w/e 12/07/1952 15B Kettering w/e 18/01/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D101 w/e 17/03/1962 17A Derby w/e 08/02/1964 15B w/e 21/03/1964 16C Derby
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92113 w/e 14/04/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 08/02/1964 15B w/e 15/02/1964 16A Toton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41225 w/e 17/03/1962 15C Leicester Midland w/e 08/02/1964 15B 4w/e 27/04/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41228 w/e 30/09/1961 15C Leicester Midland w/e 08/02/1964 15B 4w/e 27/04/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48069 01/01/1948 15B Kettering w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 11/04/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48082 w/e 11/01/1964 15C Kettering w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 11/04/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48163 w/e 23/06/1962 15B Kettering w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 11/07/1964 16G Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48184 w/e 23/06/1962 16A Nottingham w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 11/04/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48355 01/01/1948 15B Kettering w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 11/07/1964 16G Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48356 01/01/1948 15B Kettering w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 08/05/1965 16B Annesley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48376 w/e 23/05/1959 15B Kettering w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48490 w/e 07/01/1961 16A Nottingham w/e 15/02/1964 15B w/e 11/04/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48183 w/e 13/10/1962 15B Kettering w/e 29/02/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48492 w/e 14/12/1963 15C Kettering w/e 29/02/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48690 4w/e 12/07/1952 15B Kettering w/e 29/02/1964 15B w/e 19/09/1964 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48301 w/e 28/03/1964 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 04/04/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D104 w/e 15/02/1964 16A Toton w/e 11/04/1964 15B w/e 13/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D105 w/e 07/03/1964 16A Toton w/e 11/04/1964 15B w/e 13/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D106 w/e 15/02/1964 16A Toton w/e 11/04/1964 15B w/e 13/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D107 w/e 05/05/1962 17A Derby w/e 11/04/1964 15B w/e 13/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D109 w/e 07/03/1964 16A Toton w/e 11/04/1964 15B w/e 27/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D132 w/e 15/02/1964 16A Toton w/e 11/04/1964 15B w/e 13/06/1964 14B Cricklewood West
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48082 w/e 11/04/1964 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 18/04/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48362 w/e 14/07/1962 18A Toton w/e 25/04/1964 15B w/e 16/05/1964 16C Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48606 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 25/04/1964 15B w/e 19/09/1964 16F Burton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41225 4w/e 27/04/1964 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/04/1964 15B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41227 4w/e 27/04/1964 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/04/1964 15B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41228 4w/e 27/04/1964 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/04/1964 15B m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 08/02/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 30/05/1964 15B w/e 19/09/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84008 w/e 08/02/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 30/05/1964 15B w/e 19/09/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5269 06/05/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 06/06/1964 15B w/e 26/09/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5270 14/05/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 06/06/1964 15B w/e 26/09/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5272 22/05/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 06/06/1964 15B w/e 26/09/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5273 22/05/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 06/06/1964 15B w/e 26/09/1964 16D Nottingham
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7592 13/05/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 06/06/1964 15B w/e 04/07/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5240 w/e 27/06/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 04/07/1964 15B w/e 26/09/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5241 w/e 27/06/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 04/07/1964 15B w/e 26/09/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D7595 20/06/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 11/07/1964 15B w/e 25/07/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84006 w/e 14/04/1962 16D Annesley w/e 18/07/1964 15B w/e 19/09/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5242 w/e 27/06/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 25/07/1964 15B w/e 26/09/1964 16C Derby
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5271 15/05/1964 16A Toton (New) w/e 01/08/1964 15B w/e 19/09/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 D157 03/03/1962 17A Derby (New) w/e 12/09/1964 15B 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 D159 23/03/1962 17A Derby (New) w/e 12/09/1964 15B 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 D160 31/03/1962 17A Derby (New) w/e 12/09/1964 15B 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 D161 31/03/1962 17A Derby (New) w/e 12/09/1964 15B 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 D162 09/04/1962 17A Derby (New) w/e 12/09/1964 15B 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48381 w/e 19/09/1964 16F Burton w/e 24/10/1964 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D119 23/09/1961 17A Derby (New) w/e 07/11/1964 15B 16/01/1965 D15 Leicester Division
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48180 w/e 23/05/1959 15B Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48382 w/e 07/11/1964 15C Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48530 w/e 09/03/1963 15B Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48545 w/e 24/11/1962 15B Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48637 w/e 27/06/1964 15C Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 15B w/e 27/03/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48645 w/e 10/03/1962 15B Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 15B w/e 27/03/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48759 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath w/e 13/03/1965 15B w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3056 w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 16/04/1966 15B w/e 04/11/1967 16C Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3057 w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 16/04/1966 15B w/e 29/03/1969 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3058 w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 16/04/1966 15B w/e 29/03/1969 16A Toton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3059 w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 16/04/1966 15B w/e 04/11/1967 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3785 w/e 11/07/1964 15A Leicester Midland w/e 16/04/1966 15B w/e 29/03/1969 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3863 w/e 06/11/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 16/04/1966 15B w/e 29/03/1969 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3776 w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 04/11/1967 15B w/e 29/03/1969 15A Leicester Midland