Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 198 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4444 Week
» 1552 Month
» 108498 Year
» 1330063 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wellington


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Wellington Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3649       4w/e 03/11/1945 184 m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5332 01/01/1934 114 Oxley 4w/e 29/12/1945 WLN 4w/e 01/11/1958 87F Llanelly
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5309 01/01/1934 133 Newton Abbot 8w/e 23/03/1946 WLN 3w/e 17/05/1952 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 3100/5100 2-6-2T 5125 8w/e 23/03/1946 STR Stratford 4w/e 30/10/1948 WLN m/e 07/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1619       23/12/1949 (New) WLN 4w/e 21/02/1953 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3760       4w/e 31/12/1949 WLN 4w/e 30/09/1950 84H Wellington
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3760 4w/e 31/12/1949 WLN Wellington 4w/e 30/09/1950 84H 4w/e 29/11/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9742       4w/e 30/04/1951 84H 8w/e 20/04/1957 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4605 3w/e 19/05/1951 84A Stafford Road 6w/e 30/06/1951 84H 23/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3782       4w/e 31/01/1952 84H 4w/e 29/02/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4158       4w/e 27/12/1952 84H 4w/e 08/09/1962 84E Tyseley
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4178 29/11/1949 NEA Neasden (New) 4w/e 21/02/1953 84H 4w/e 01/01/1955 84E Tyseley
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5712       4w/e 21/02/1953 84H m/e 10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 2021 0-6-0PT 2061 3w/e 17/05/1952 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 21/02/1953 84H m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5745 4w/e 30/10/1948 BAN Banbury 8w/e 11/07/1953 84H m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9774       8w/e 11/07/1953 84H 4w/e 13/08/1955 84C Banbury
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4155 4w/e 28/02/1951 85A Worcester 4w/e 03/10/1953 84H 4w/e 21/05/1955 84E Tyseley
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9435 31/01/1951 84A Stafford Road (New) 4w/e 31/10/1953 84H 4w/e 25/11/1953 84A Stafford Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3744       4w/e 27/03/1954 84H w/e 15/08/1964 2B Oxley
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4178 4w/e 01/01/1955 84E Tyseley 8w/e 26/03/1955 84H 4w/e 11/08/1956 83A Newton Abbot
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1663       31/03/1955 (New) 84H 4w/e 01/11/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5164       4w/e 21/05/1955 84H 4w/e 08/09/1956 83A Newton Abbot
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5167       4w/e 18/06/1955 84H 4w/e 03/10/1959 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4142 8w/e 26/03/1955 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 08/10/1955 84H 4w/e 22/03/1958 85A Worcester
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9774 4w/e 13/08/1955 84C Banbury 4w/e 08/10/1955 84H w/e 15/08/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82004 4w/e 23/04/1955 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/08/1956 84H 4w/e 13/06/1959 84G Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82006 4w/e 16/07/1955 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/08/1956 84H 4w/e 30/01/1960 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82009 4w/e 23/04/1955 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 08/09/1956 84H 4w/e 13/06/1959 84G Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82034 28/01/1955 83A Newton Abbot (New) 4w/e 08/09/1956 84H 4w/e 06/10/1956 88F Treherbert
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4110       4w/e 29/12/1956 84H 4w/e 03/10/1959 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4120       8w/e 20/04/1957 84H 4w/e 16/07/1960 84E Tyseley
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9741 8w/e 20/04/1957 85A Worcester 4w/e 15/06/1957 84H 4w/e 05/11/1960 89A Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82007 4w/e 03/12/1955 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/06/1958 84H 4w/e 14/06/1958 84D Leamington
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3626 4w/e 27/12/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 21/02/1959 84H 4w/e 27/01/1962 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82004 4w/e 13/06/1959 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 05/09/1959 84H 4w/e 31/10/1959 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82009 4w/e 13/06/1959 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 05/09/1959 84H 4w/e 30/01/1960 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82038 4w/e 03/12/1955 85A Worcester 4w/e 03/10/1959 84H 4w/e 30/01/1960 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82030 4w/e 11/07/1959 85A Worcester 4w/e 31/10/1959 84H 4w/e 30/01/1960 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41201 4w/e 21/03/1953 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 31/10/1959 84H w/e 01/02/1964 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41241 4w/e 04/10/1958 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 31/10/1959 84H w/e 01/02/1964 2L Leamington
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9621 4w/e 27/12/1958 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 26/12/1959 84H 4w/e 28/01/1961 87F Llanelly
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41204 4w/e 28/11/1959 89A Oswestry 4w/e 30/01/1960 84H 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D Leamington
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41232 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 27/02/1960 84H w/e 08/02/1964 2L Leamington
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41231 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 26/03/1960 84H 4w/e 07/10/1961 84D Leamington
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9636       4w/e 10/09/1960 84H m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4178 4w/e 21/05/1960 83C Exeter 4w/e 08/10/1960 84H 4w/e 11/08/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9630 4w/e 08/10/1960 85A Worcester 4w/e 05/11/1960 84H w/e 15/08/1964 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4120 4w/e 16/07/1960 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/12/1960 84H 4w/e 19/05/1962 84A Stafford Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9741 4w/e 05/11/1960 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1960 84H m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41204 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D Leamington 4w/e 25/03/1961 84H w/e 22/06/1963 5A Crewe North
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6421 4w/e 16/07/1960 84C Banbury 4w/e 07/10/1961 84H 2w/e 17/11/1962 83D Laira
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6429 4w/e 13/06/1959 84C Banbury 4w/e 07/10/1961 84H m/e 03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3776 4w/e 02/12/1961 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/11/1962 84H w/e 15/08/1964 2B Oxley
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41201 w/e 01/02/1964 6C Croes Newydd w/e 13/06/1964 2M w/e 20/06/1964 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41241 w/e 01/02/1964 2L Leamington w/e 13/06/1964 2M w/e 20/06/1964 6H Bangor