Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 16 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3438 Week
» 15216 Month
» 304608 Year
» 815710 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Westbury


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Westbury Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4314       01/01/1934 172 m/e 06/1937 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4315       01/01/1934 172 m/e 04/1937 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4326       01/01/1934 172 4w/e 18/04/1953 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4349       01/01/1934 172 m/e 06/1938 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4365       01/01/1934 172 m/e 04/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4368       01/01/1934 172 m/e 02/1939 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6341       01/01/1934 172 3w/e 17/05/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6382       01/01/1934 172 4w/e 30/10/1948 KDR Kidderminster
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6384       01/01/1934 172 4w/e 20/04/1946 WES Westbury
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7302       01/01/1934 172 4w/e 30/12/1961 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5420       4w/e 03/11/1945 172 4w/e 01/12/1945 131 Southall
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4573 4w/e 03/11/1945 22 Holyhead 4w/e 01/12/1945 172 4w/e 21/02/1953 85A Worcester
Steam Dean Goods 0-6-0 2322       4w/e 26/01/1946 WES m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5509       8w/e 23/03/1946 WES 3w/e 19/05/1951 82C Swindon
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5554 4w/e 26/01/1946 YEO Yeovil Town 8w/e 23/03/1946 WES 4w/e 05/09/1959 83B Taunton
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6365 01/01/1934 37 Mold Junction 4w/e 20/04/1946 WES 4w/e 18/05/1946 WES Westbury
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6384 01/01/1934 172 Westbury 4w/e 20/04/1946 WES 4w/e 18/05/1946 SDN Swindon
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6351 01/01/1934 77 Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 18/05/1946 WES 4w/e 05/11/1949 BRD Bristol Bath Road
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6365 4w/e 20/04/1946 WES Westbury 4w/e 18/05/1946 WES 4w/e 27/02/1954 83C Exeter
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4520       4w/e 07/09/1946 WES m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7726       4w/e 30/10/1948 WES 4w/e 30/04/1952 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6991       23/11/1948 (New) WES 4w/e 09/10/1954 81C Southall
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6935       4w/e 03/12/1949 WES 4w/e 31/12/1955 82C Swindon
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90630       4w/e 03/12/1949 WES 4w/e 30/04/1951 86G Pontypool Road
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90701       4w/e 03/12/1949 WES 4w/e 31/03/1951 83B Taunton
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7917 4w/e 31/08/1950 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 31/10/1950 82D 4w/e 09/03/1963 87H Neyland
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7924       4w/e 31/10/1950 82D 4w/e 28/11/1959 83B Taunton
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4080 02/06/1950 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 04/11/1950 82D 19/05/1953 83A Newton Abbot
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4985 4w/e 31/08/1950 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/11/1950 82D 4w/e 16/05/1953 83F Truro
Steam Star 4-6-0 4034       4w/e 31/12/1950 82D 3w/e 19/05/1951 82C Swindon
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4933       4w/e 31/12/1950 82D 4w/e 28/02/1951 82D Westbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5975       4w/e 31/12/1950 82D 4w/e 31/10/1953 82C Swindon
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5025 08/10/1947 BRD Bristol Bath Road 02/1951 82D 24/04/1951 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5037 07/07/1950 82A Bristol Bath Road 02/1951 82D 17/02/1951 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4933 4w/e 31/12/1950 82D Westbury 4w/e 28/02/1951 82D 7w/e 31/08/1952 81F Oxford
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7309 4w/e 31/12/1950 81C Southall 4w/e 28/02/1951 82D 4w/e 21/03/1953 84E Tyseley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90225 4w/e 31/01/1951 87F Llanelly 4w/e 28/02/1951 82D 6w/e 30/06/1951 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4536 4w/e 31/12/1950 82C Swindon 4w/e 30/04/1951 82D m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4551       3w/e 19/05/1951 82D m/e 02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5508 3w/e 19/05/1951 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 6w/e 30/06/1951 82D 4w/e 05/11/1960 83C Exeter
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5718       4w/e 31/12/1951 82D m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4647 4w/e 31/03/1952 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 3w/e 17/05/1952 82D 4w/e 31/10/1953 82E Yeovil Pen Mill
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1401 4w/e 31/01/1952 84F Stourbridge Junction 6w/e 30/06/1952 82D 4w/e 04/10/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1456 4w/e 29/12/1945 LYD Lydney 6w/e 30/06/1952 82D 4w/e 29/11/1952 87J Fishguard Goodwick
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8479       30/06/1952 (New) 82D 4w/e 02/12/1961 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9764 3w/e 17/05/1952 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 6w/e 30/06/1952 82D 2w/e 12/07/1952 82E Yeovil Pen Mill
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2850       7w/e 31/08/1952 82D 4w/e 26/12/1953 84C Banbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5978       7w/e 31/08/1952 82D w/e 06/09/1952 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5512       4w/e 01/11/1952 82D 4w/e 21/03/1953 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5771 w/e 06/09/1952 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 29/11/1952 82D 4w/e 26/12/1959 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6625 4w/e 01/11/1952 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 27/12/1952 82D 2w/e 17/11/1962 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Dean Goods 0-6-0 2340 4w/e 26/01/1946 BL   4w/e 24/01/1953 82D m/e 06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Dean Goods 0-6-0 2426       4w/e 24/01/1953 82D m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5757 4w/e 24/01/1953 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 21/03/1953 82D m/e 12/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7748 3w/e 19/05/1951 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 18/04/1953 82D m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5358 01/01/1934 32 Workington 4w/e 16/05/1953 82D 4w/e 25/02/1961 85A Worcester
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5368 4w/e 01/11/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 16/05/1953 82D 4w/e 03/10/1953 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6339 01/01/1934 24 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 16/05/1953 82D 4w/e 03/10/1953 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6358 01/01/1934 215 Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1953 82D m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5356 7w/e 31/08/1952 83D Laira 8w/e 11/07/1953 82D 4w/e 08/08/1953 83D Laira
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6375 3w/e 17/05/1952 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 08/08/1953 82D 4w/e 31/10/1953 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8744 4w/e 21/02/1953 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 03/10/1953 82D 05/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4133 4w/e 31/08/1951 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 31/10/1953 82D 8w/e 26/03/1955 83C Exeter
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4930 6w/e 30/06/1952 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 31/10/1953 82D 4w/e 17/05/1958 83B Taunton
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6914       4w/e 31/10/1953 82D q/e 06/06/1958 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6922       4w/e 31/10/1953 82D 4w/e 09/10/1954 81F Oxford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4607       4w/e 25/11/1953 82D 4w/e 08/08/1965 83C Westbury
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4647 4w/e 31/10/1953 82E Yeovil Pen Mill 4w/e 25/11/1953 82D 23/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5338 01/01/1934 133 Newton Abbot 4w/e 25/11/1953 82D m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5767 4w/e 07/09/1946 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 25/11/1953 82D m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5701 4w/e 31/10/1953 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 26/12/1953 82D m/e 01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5327 01/01/1934 66 Cardiff Canton 4w/e 30/01/1954 82D m/e 07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4917 4w/e 27/02/1954 83C Exeter 4w/e 24/04/1954 82D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4965 4w/e 20/05/1950 83G Penzance 4w/e 24/04/1954 82D 4w/e 22/05/1954 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6994       4w/e 24/04/1954 82D 4w/e 04/11/1961 83C Exeter
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4166 4w/e 19/06/1954 87H Neyland 4w/e 17/07/1954 82D 4w/e 16/07/1955 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4965 4w/e 22/05/1954 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 17/07/1954 82D 4w/e 14/08/1954 87E Landore
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4133 8w/e 26/03/1955 83C Exeter 4w/e 23/04/1955 82D 4w/e 16/07/1955 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5910       4w/e 21/05/1955 82D 4w/e 08/10/1955 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5950 4w/e 04/10/1952 84C Banbury 4w/e 21/05/1955 82D 4w/e 08/10/1955 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2208 4w/e 21/03/1953 83B Taunton 4w/e 16/07/1955 82D 4w/e 07/09/1957 87H Neyland
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2268       4w/e 16/07/1955 82D w/e 20/06/1964 6F Machynlleth
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5182 4w/e 27/12/1952 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 08/10/1955 82D 4w/e 21/04/1956 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6822       4w/e 08/10/1955 82D 4w/e 22/03/1958 81F Oxford
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6915 4w/e 05/11/1949 SDN Swindon 4w/e 28/01/1956 82D 4w/e 06/10/1956 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5963       4w/e 25/02/1956 82D 4w/e 09/02/1963 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3614       4w/e 21/04/1956 82D 4w/e 08/10/1960 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4945 4w/e 03/10/1953 81E Didcot m/e 16/06/1956 82D 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4956 4w/e 31/12/1950 81C Southall m/e 16/06/1956 82D 4w/e 06/10/1956 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5422 4w/e 24/03/1956 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 16/06/1956 82D 4w/e 11/08/1956 83C Exeter
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6338 4w/e 09/10/1954 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 11/08/1956 82D 4w/e 13/07/1957 87J Fishguard Goodwick
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5422 4w/e 11/08/1956 83C Exeter 4w/e 08/09/1956 82D 4w/e 02/11/1957 89A Oswestry
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2811 m/e 16/06/1956 85A Worcester 4w/e 06/10/1956 82D m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2827 7w/e 31/08/1952 84C Banbury 4w/e 03/11/1956 82D m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6320 01/01/1934 134 Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/12/1956 82D 4w/e 07/10/1961 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5403 4w/e 26/01/1957 82A Bristol Bath Road 8w/e 20/04/1957 82D m/e 08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5975 4w/e 01/12/1956 82B St Philips Marsh 8w/e 20/04/1957 82D 4w/e 13/08/1960 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5982       8w/e 20/04/1957 82D 4w/e 27/12/1958 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5414 4w/e 09/10/1954 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 07/09/1957 82D m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4555       4w/e 05/10/1957 82D 4w/e 05/09/1959 83A Newton Abbot
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5542 4w/e 16/07/1955 83B Taunton 4w/e 05/10/1957 82D m/e 12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7728       4w/e 05/10/1957 82D 4w/e 30/11/1957 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4909 4w/e 28/01/1956 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/11/1957 82D 4w/e 04/11/1961 83C Exeter
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8482 30/04/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 82D 4w/e 28/01/1961 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4567 8w/e 20/04/1957 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/03/1958 82D 4w/e 27/01/1962 83F Truro
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6408 4w/e 25/01/1958 88C Barry 4w/e 22/03/1958 82D 4w/e 05/09/1959 83D Laira
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9668 4w/e 10/09/1955 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 09/08/1958 82D 4w/e 24/02/1962 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3819       4w/e 06/09/1958 82D 4w/e 07/10/1961 81E Didcot
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4933 4w/e 25/01/1958 84D Leamington 4w/e 06/09/1958 82D 2w/e 17/11/1962 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3629       4w/e 04/10/1958 82D 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5416 4w/e 27/03/1954 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 04/10/1958 82D 4w/e 09/03/1963 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5945 4w/e 06/10/1956 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/10/1958 82D 4w/e 11/07/1959 82C Swindon
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6945 4w/e 25/01/1958 83D Laira 4w/e 04/10/1958 82D 4w/e 26/12/1959 83G Penzance
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7909 4w/e 20/05/1950 83D Laira 4w/e 04/10/1958 82D 4w/e 05/11/1960 83A Newton Abbot
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5526       4w/e 21/03/1959 82D m/e 06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5904 m/e 16/06/1956 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/05/1959 82D 4w/e 03/12/1960 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5935 4w/e 14/06/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/05/1959 82D 4w/e 02/12/1961 88A Cardiff Canton
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6951 4w/e 17/05/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/05/1959 82D 4w/e 04/11/1961 85A Worcester
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5532 4w/e 29/11/1958 82C Swindon 4w/e 13/06/1959 82D 4w/e 28/11/1959 83D Laira
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6973       4w/e 13/06/1959 82D 4w/e 05/09/1959 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3212       4w/e 11/07/1959 82D 4w/e 21/05/1960 87J Fishguard Goodwick
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 5410 4w/e 28/11/1959 81B Slough 4w/e 26/12/1959 82D 4w/e 09/03/1963 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5967 4w/e 29/01/1955 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 26/03/1960 82D 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3840 2w/e 12/07/1952 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 21/05/1960 82D 4w/e 17/06/1961 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4957 4w/e 26/03/1960 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/05/1960 82D m/e 03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4961 4w/e 13/08/1955 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 21/05/1960 82D 05/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6968       4w/e 21/05/1960 82D 4w/e 24/02/1962 87J Fishguard Goodwick
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2846 4w/e 21/05/1960 83D Laira 4w/e 13/08/1960 82D 25/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2875 4w/e 21/05/1960 83D Laira 4w/e 13/08/1960 82D 2w/e 17/11/1962 84C Banbury
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3212 4w/e 21/05/1960 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 10/09/1960 82D 4w/e 14/07/1962 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6363 4w/e 28/11/1959 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 10/09/1960 82D 4w/e 08/10/1960 81E Didcot
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92221 4w/e 18/06/1960 83D Laira 4w/e 10/09/1960 82D 4w/e 08/10/1960 84C Banbury
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92223 4w/e 18/06/1960 83D Laira 4w/e 10/09/1960 82D 4w/e 25/03/1961 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2200 4w/e 13/08/1960 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 08/10/1960 82D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5921 4w/e 18/06/1960 84E Tyseley 4w/e 08/10/1960 82D m/e 01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9769 4w/e 04/10/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/10/1960 82D m/e 03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92205 31/05/1959 82B St Philips Marsh (New) 4w/e 08/10/1960 82D 8w/e 17/01/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92206 31/05/1959 82B St Philips Marsh (New) 4w/e 08/10/1960 82D 8w/e 17/01/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3614 4w/e 08/10/1960 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/11/1960 82D m/e 03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2871       4w/e 25/02/1961 82D 4w/e 07/10/1961 83B Taunton
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2883 4w/e 05/11/1960 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 25/03/1961 82D 19/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3675       4w/e 20/05/1961 82D 4w/e 04/11/1961 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4963 4w/e 06/10/1956 84B Oxley 4w/e 20/05/1961 82D 4w/e 04/11/1961 85A Worcester
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5950 4w/e 11/07/1959 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 20/05/1961 82D m/e 11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5980 4w/e 18/06/1960 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 20/05/1961 82D 4w/e 04/11/1961 85A Worcester
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6957 4w/e 27/02/1960 81E Didcot 4w/e 20/05/1961 82D 4w/e 04/11/1961 88A Cardiff Canton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92211 30/09/1959 81A Old Oak Common (New) 4w/e 17/06/1961 82D 7w/e 23/08/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92239 4w/e 10/09/1960 81C Southall 4w/e 15/07/1961 82D 7w/e 23/08/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8714 4w/e 23/02/1957 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 12/08/1961 82D 4w/e 02/12/1961 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4941 4w/e 19/04/1958 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 07/10/1961 82D 22/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5920 4w/e 20/05/1961 83B Taunton 4w/e 07/10/1961 82D m/e 01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5999       4w/e 07/10/1961 82D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel Hymek B-B D7007       18/10/1961 (New) 82D 4w/e 14/07/1962 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4021 19/06/1960 82B St Philips Marsh (New) 4w/e 04/11/1961 82D 7w/e 27/07/1968 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel Hymek B-B D7002 19/07/1961 82A Bristol Bath Road (New) 4w/e 04/11/1961 82D 4w/e 21/04/1962 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel Hymek B-B D7005 25/09/1961 82A Bristol Bath Road (New) 4w/e 04/11/1961 82D 4w/e 21/04/1962 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3998 4w/e 04/11/1961 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 02/12/1961 82D 2w/e 15/01/1967 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4023 4w/e 04/11/1961 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 02/12/1961 82D 7w/e 27/07/1968 82A Bristol Bath Road
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4016 4w/e 04/11/1961 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 30/12/1961 82D 4w/e 09/03/1963 83A Newton Abbot
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3511 4w/e 06/09/1958 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 27/01/1962 82D 2w/e 21/02/1965 86A Cardiff Canton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4019 4w/e 04/11/1961 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 27/01/1962 82D 7w/e 27/07/1968 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4174 4w/e 30/01/1960 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 27/01/1962 82D 4w/e 04/05/1963 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5180 4w/e 26/12/1959 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 27/01/1962 82D m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5744 4w/e 16/07/1960 83F Truro 4w/e 24/03/1962 82D m/e 04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6999 4w/e 03/12/1960 83B Taunton 4w/e 21/04/1962 82D 2w/e 10/01/1965 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4150 4w/e 15/07/1961 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 14/07/1962 82D 4w/e 11/08/1962 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4157 4w/e 07/10/1961 84E Tyseley 4w/e 14/07/1962 82D 4w/e 04/05/1963 86G Pontypool Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4949 4w/e 29/11/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/07/1962 82D 4w/e 06/10/1962 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4972 4w/e 30/01/1954 82C Swindon 4w/e 14/07/1962 82D m/e 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5929 4w/e 24/02/1962 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/07/1962 82D 2w/e 17/11/1962 81C Southall
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5964 4w/e 06/09/1958 82C Swindon 4w/e 14/07/1962 82D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2273 4w/e 15/07/1961 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4956 4w/e 14/07/1962 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5925 4w/e 01/11/1958 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D 22/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5986 4w/e 07/10/1961 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6319 4w/e 30/01/1960 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D 4w/e 29/06/1963 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6977 4w/e 16/06/1962 81C Southall 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7332 4w/e 05/10/1957 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 82D 4w/e 29/06/1963 87G Carmarthen
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3787 4w/e 30/12/1961 83B Taunton 4w/e 03/11/1962 82D 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1442 4w/e 26/12/1953 81F Oxford 4w/e 03/11/1962 82D 2w/e 17/11/1962 83C Exeter
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6356 4w/e 21/05/1955 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/11/1962 82D 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9674 4w/e 05/09/1953 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/11/1962 82D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2886 4w/e 23/04/1960 86J Aberdare 4w/e 15/12/1962 82D m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6353 4w/e 30/12/1961 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 15/12/1962 82D m/e 05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3739 4w/e 16/05/1953 82C Swindon 4w/e 09/02/1963 82D m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7308 4w/e 30/01/1960 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/02/1963 82D 4w/e 29/06/1963 81E Didcot
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9754 4w/e 22/04/1961 82C Swindon 4w/e 09/02/1963 82D 3w/e 28/03/1965 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3746 4w/e 25/01/1958 83C Exeter 4w/e 09/03/1963 82D m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4661       4w/e 06/04/1963 82D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4569 4w/e 15/07/1961 87H Neyland 4w/e 04/05/1963 82D 4w/e 30/11/1963 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5573 4w/e 06/10/1962 87H Neyland 4w/e 04/05/1963 82D 4w/e 28/12/1963 81C Southall
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6346 4w/e 06/10/1962 83C Exeter 4w/e 01/06/1963 82D 4w/e 29/06/1963 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4989 4w/e 29/06/1963 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 27/07/1963 82D 4w/e 25/01/1964 83B Taunton
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5967 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 27/07/1963 82D m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6968 4w/e 24/02/1962 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 27/07/1963 82D m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6988 4w/e 03/10/1959 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 28/09/1963 82D m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 81xx 2-6-2T 8102 4w/e 06/04/1963 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 02/11/1963 83C 4w/e 25/01/1964 85A Worcester
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6147 4w/e 03/11/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 02/11/1963 83C 4w/e 25/01/1964 85A Worcester
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2218 4w/e 29/12/1945 NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 30/11/1963 83C 6w/e 13/04/1964 82G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3669       4w/e 30/11/1963 83C 4w/e 11/07/1965 83C Westbury
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4673 4w/e 02/11/1963 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 30/11/1963 83C m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9729 4w/e 03/10/1959 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/11/1963 83C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5932 6w/e 13/04/1964 88A Cardiff East Dock 3w/e 04/05/1964 83C 5w/e 24/08/1964 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4978 4w/e 06/10/1962 83D Laira 7w/e 22/06/1964 83C 5w/e 24/08/1964 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4697 7w/e 22/06/1964 81C Southall 5w/e 24/08/1964 83C m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5992 4w/e 09/10/1954 83B Taunton 6w/e 12/10/1964 83C 2w/e 10/01/1965 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7909 2w/e 17/11/1962 83B Taunton 6w/e 12/10/1964 83C w/e 15/11/1964 85A Worcester
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9605 4w/e 21/04/1956 82C Swindon w/e 22/11/1964 83C m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9790 w/e 08/11/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road w/e 22/11/1964 83C m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4163 05/05/1962 83B Taunton (New) 4w/e 11/07/1965 83C 7w/e 27/07/1968 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3669 4w/e 30/11/1963 83C Westbury 4w/e 11/07/1965 83C m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4607 4w/e 25/11/1953 82D Westbury 4w/e 08/08/1965 83C m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3516 7w/e 22/06/1964 83D Exmouth Junction 7w/e 07/11/1965 83C 2w/e 15/01/1967 82A Bristol Bath Road