Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 707 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 12566 Month
» 328797 Year
» 839899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Westhouses


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Westhouses Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7466       01/01/1948 18B w/e 08/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3850       01/01/1948 18B 02/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3860       01/01/1948 18B w/e 07/03/1959 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3866       01/01/1948 18B 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3867       01/01/1948 18B w/e 08/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3880       01/01/1948 18B w/e 10/01/1959 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3882       01/01/1948 18B 8w/e 29/11/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3966       01/01/1948 18B 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3992       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 19/05/1951 17D Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4014       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 23/03/1957 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4130       01/01/1948 18B m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4136       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 26/03/1955 18C Hasland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4188       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 23/03/1957 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4191       01/01/1948 18B m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4321       01/01/1948 18B m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 554       01/01/1948 18B m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8011       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 02/12/1950 9G Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8056       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 26/01/1957 17D Rowsley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8057       01/01/1948 18B w/e 30/01/1960 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8060       01/01/1948 18B w/e 03/10/1959 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8063       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 23/02/1957 17D Rowsley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8076       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 24/02/1951 20D Normanton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8083       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 16/06/1951 19C Canklow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8102       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 11/08/1956 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8115 04/1939 2E Warwick (New) 01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 04/10/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8118       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 04/10/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8125       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 06/11/1954 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8136       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 22/03/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8212       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 29/12/1956 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8280       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 26/01/1957 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8333       01/01/1948 18B w/e 03/10/1959 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8342       01/01/1948 18B 8w/e 14/06/1952 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8353       01/01/1948 18B w/e 30/01/1960 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8358       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 27/01/1951 20B Stourton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8391       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 02/12/1950 15B Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8494       01/01/1948 18B w/e 07/02/1959 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8495       01/01/1948 18B w/e 07/02/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8534       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 03/10/1953 1E Bletchley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8535       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 07/10/1950 4A Bletchley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8536       01/01/1948 18B w/e 01/06/1963 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8549       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 07/10/1950 4A Bletchley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8620       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 04/10/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8623       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 26/01/1957 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8650       01/01/1948 18B w/e 16/01/1960 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8661       01/01/1948 18B w/e 16/01/1960 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3235       01/01/1948 18B w/e 20/06/1959 18A Toton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3254       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 04/12/1954 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3266       01/01/1948 18B 18/03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3331       01/01/1948 18B 03/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3379       01/01/1948 18B 4w/e 19/05/1951 16C Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3580       01/01/1948 18B w/e 10/01/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3253 01/01/1948 16B Spital Bridge 3w/e 11/12/1948 18B w/e 07/02/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3317 01/01/1948 16B Spital Bridge 3w/e 11/12/1948 18B 15/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44118 4w/e 27/01/1951 16A Nottingham 4w/e 16/06/1951 18B w/e 22/04/1961 27F Brunswick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44173 01/01/1948 19C Canklow 4w/e 23/02/1952 18B m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48444 01/01/1948 26B Agecroft 4w/e 23/02/1952 18B m/e 16/06/1956 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44598 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 22/03/1952 18B m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48037 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 19/04/1952 18B 4w/e 28/11/1953 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48164 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 4w/e 19/04/1952 18B 8w/e 19/06/1954 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46500 03/1952 18A Toton (New) 4w/e 19/04/1952 18B 8w/e 14/06/1952 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43856 4w/e 04/10/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 8w/e 29/11/1952 18B 4w/e 01/12/1956 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48128 4w/e 21/02/1953 18A Toton 8w/e 11/07/1953 18B 4w/e 28/11/1953 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44122 01/01/1948 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 27/02/1954 18B 4w/e 27/03/1954 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48404 4w/e 23/02/1952 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 27/02/1954 18B m/e 16/06/1956 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44006 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 27/03/1954 18B m/e 10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44284 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 24/04/1954 18B 4w/e 04/10/1958 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44285 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 24/04/1954 18B m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48082 8w/e 16/07/1955 18A Toton 4w/e 13/08/1955 18B m/e 16/06/1956 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48125 8w/e 16/07/1955 18A Toton 4w/e 13/08/1955 18B 4w/e 26/01/1957 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48139 4w/e 09/10/1954 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 13/08/1955 18B 4w/e 30/11/1957 3A Bescot
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44150 4w/e 13/08/1955 18A Toton 4w/e 05/11/1955 18B w/e 28/03/1959 15D Coalville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44233 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 05/11/1955 18B m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43193 4w/e 22/03/1952 17B Burton 4w/e 03/12/1955 18B 22/03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92062 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 25/02/1956 18B 4w/e 25/05/1956 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92063 4w/e 31/12/1955 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 25/02/1956 18B 4w/e 25/05/1956 54B Tyne Dock
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44204 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A Saltley 4w/e 25/02/1956 18B 4w/e 14/06/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48037 4w/e 24/03/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 21/04/1956 18B m/e 16/06/1956 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48112 4w/e 24/03/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 19/05/1956 18B w/e 13/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48176 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 19/05/1956 18B m/e 16/06/1956 19C Canklow
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43825 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 11/08/1956 18B w/e 18/11/1961 17C Rowsley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48037 m/e 16/06/1956 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 06/10/1956 18B 4w/e 29/12/1956 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92113       30/11/1956 (New) 18B w/e 18/06/1960 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92114       30/11/1956 (New) 18B w/e 18/06/1960 18A Toton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92115       31/12/1956 (New) 18B w/e 13/06/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92116       31/12/1956 (New) 18B w/e 09/03/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92117       31/12/1956 (New) 18B w/e 07/10/1961 16D Annesley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92118       31/12/1956 (New) 18B w/e 07/11/1959 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92119       28/02/1957 (New) 18B w/e 10/01/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92120       28/02/1957 (New) 18B w/e 25/10/1958 16D Annesley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43970 4w/e 22/03/1952 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 18/05/1957 18B 4w/e 10/08/1957 17B Burton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92150       31/10/1957 (New) 18B w/e 07/02/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48638 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 30/11/1957 18B w/e 20/12/1958 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92161       31/12/1957 (New) 18B 4w/e 12/07/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92162       31/12/1957 (New) 18B 4w/e 12/07/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48127 3w/e 14/01/1950 19D Heaton Mersey 4w/e 22/02/1958 18B w/e 03/10/1959 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44289 4w/e 31/10/1953 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958 18B w/e 07/10/1961 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44362 4w/e 31/10/1953 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958 18B m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48204 4w/e 24/03/1951 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958 18B w/e 30/01/1960 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48382 4w/e 17/05/1958 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958 18B w/e 22/11/1958 15D Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48543 8w/e 29/11/1952 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958 18B w/e 06/12/1958 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92120 w/e 25/10/1958 16D Annesley w/e 29/11/1958 18B w/e 06/12/1958 21A Saltley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44154 4w/e 04/10/1958 27F Brunswick w/e 09/05/1959 18B w/e 07/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90524 4w/e 21/02/1953 86C Cardiff Canton w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 03/10/1959 2F Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90563 4w/e 06/11/1954 82B St Philips Marsh w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 05/12/1959 2F Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90152 4w/e 30/09/1951 84B Oxley w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 23/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90176 4w/e 25/01/1958 82B St Philips Marsh w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 30/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90238       w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 23/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90010 4w/e 25/01/1958 82B St Philips Marsh w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 30/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90251 m/e 16/06/1956 81F Oxford w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 19/09/1959 2F Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90284 m/e 16/06/1956 81F Oxford w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 30/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90701 4w/e 25/01/1958 86G Pontypool Road w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 19/09/1959 2F Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90716 4w/e 23/04/1955 84C Banbury w/e 18/07/1959 18B w/e 30/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44177 w/e 20/06/1959 17C Rowsley w/e 25/07/1959 18B w/e 15/09/1962 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43982 4w/e 05/11/1955 17D Rowsley w/e 21/11/1959 18B w/e 10/09/1960 18C Hasland
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90251 w/e 19/09/1959 2F Woodford Halse w/e 05/12/1959 18B w/e 30/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92057 31/10/1955 18A Toton (New) w/e 30/01/1960 18B w/e 07/05/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92100 w/e 12/12/1959 18A Toton w/e 30/01/1960 18B w/e 09/03/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92131 4w/e 16/06/1957 18A Toton w/e 30/01/1960 18B w/e 05/12/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47250 w/e 21/02/1959 15C Leicester Midland w/e 02/04/1960 18B m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44387 4w/e 31/12/1955 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 30/04/1960 18B m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47000 w/e 03/01/1959 17A Derby w/e 14/05/1960 18B w/e 09/07/1960 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48033 w/e 19/03/1960 18A Toton w/e 18/06/1960 18B w/e 14/03/1964 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48184 4w/e 07/10/1950 18A Toton w/e 18/06/1960 18B w/e 10/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48197 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 18/06/1960 18B w/e 10/09/1960 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44244 01/01/1948 18C Hasland w/e 02/07/1960 18B w/e 14/09/1963 15C Kettering
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48353 w/e 30/01/1960 18A Toton w/e 02/07/1960 18B w/e 14/03/1964 5B Crewe South
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90214 w/e 09/04/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/07/1960 18B w/e 23/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90046       w/e 08/10/1960 18B w/e 30/06/1962 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48750 w/e 20/06/1959 18A Toton w/e 18/02/1961 18B w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44118 w/e 22/04/1961 27F Brunswick w/e 01/07/1961 18B w/e 15/09/1962 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43917 4w/e 28/11/1953 16A Nottingham w/e 18/11/1961 18B 25/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44131 4w/e 07/10/1950 16A Nottingham w/e 18/11/1961 18B w/e 07/04/1962 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47638 w/e 20/02/1960 17A Derby w/e 06/01/1962 18B m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92104 4w/e 22/03/1958 15C Leicester Midland w/e 07/04/1962 18B w/e 05/12/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92070 w/e 17/09/1960 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 09/03/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48177 w/e 09/12/1961 21A Saltley w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48195 4w/e 07/10/1950 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 16/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48196 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48197 w/e 10/09/1960 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48507 4w/e 22/03/1958 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48538 w/e 12/12/1959 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 10/11/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48615 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48620 4w/e 04/10/1958 18A Toton w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48625 w/e 28/04/1962 21A Saltley w/e 23/06/1962 18B w/e 03/04/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92009 w/e 23/06/1962 21A Saltley w/e 07/07/1962 18B w/e 12/10/1963 16J Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92058 w/e 24/09/1960 18A Toton w/e 07/07/1962 18B w/e 25/04/1964 15A Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92054 w/e 29/09/1962 15C Leicester Midland w/e 08/12/1962 18B w/e 13/06/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48204 w/e 30/01/1960 18A Toton w/e 12/01/1963 18B w/e 19/08/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48008 w/e 01/07/1961 15B Kettering w/e 29/06/1963 18B w/e 02/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47442 w/e 18/05/1963 18A Toton w/e 27/07/1963 18B m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48432 w/e 24/02/1962 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 14/09/1963 16G w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92158 30/11/1957 18A Toton (New) w/e 21/09/1963 16G w/e 13/06/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44178 4w/e 12/07/1958 18A Toton w/e 05/10/1963 16G m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92153 31/10/1957 18A Toton (New) w/e 12/10/1963 16G w/e 26/06/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44049 4w/e 04/12/1954 17A Derby w/e 07/12/1963 16G m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44381 w/e 06/04/1963 18C Hasland w/e 14/12/1963 16G w/e 02/05/1964 16H Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48286 4w/e 04/10/1958 16A Nottingham w/e 25/01/1964 16G m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48384 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 22/02/1964 16G w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48600 w/e 28/09/1963 1G Woodford Halse w/e 29/02/1964 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48258 w/e 22/09/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/03/1964 16G w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48368 w/e 25/01/1964 5B Crewe South w/e 28/03/1964 16G w/e 02/05/1964 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48678 w/e 13/04/1963 16D Annesley w/e 25/04/1964 16G w/e 02/05/1964 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48163 w/e 15/02/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 11/07/1964 16G w/e 07/11/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48355 w/e 15/02/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 11/07/1964 16G w/e 07/11/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48538 w/e 10/11/1962 15A Wellingborough w/e 11/07/1964 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43991 w/e 12/01/1963 18A Toton w/e 08/08/1964 16G 15/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44278 w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton w/e 22/08/1964 16G m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43865 4w/e 11/08/1956 18A Toton w/e 26/09/1964 16G 15/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48145 w/e 13/07/1963 18A Toton w/e 26/09/1964 16G w/e 29/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44528 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 10/10/1964 16G m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44599 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 10/10/1964 16G w/e 07/11/1964 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47535 01/01/1948 18C Hasland w/e 17/10/1964 16G m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47543 w/e 03/08/1963 18C Hasland w/e 17/10/1964 16G m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47611 w/e 03/08/1963 18C Hasland w/e 17/10/1964 16G w/e 14/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43967 4w/e 06/09/1958 18C Hasland w/e 24/10/1964 16G w/e 07/11/1964 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43982 w/e 10/09/1960 18C Hasland w/e 24/10/1964 16G w/e 03/04/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44054 01/01/1948 18C Hasland w/e 24/10/1964 16G m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44235 w/e 08/08/1964 16H Hasland w/e 24/10/1964 16G m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44118 w/e 20/07/1963 17A Derby w/e 05/12/1964 16G m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44214 m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn w/e 05/12/1964 (R) 16G      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44243 w/e 09/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 05/12/1964 16G m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44420 01/01/1948 17A Derby w/e 05/12/1964 16G m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44355 w/e 27/02/1960 5F Uttoxeter w/e 12/12/1964 16G m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44043 w/e 01/08/1964 15E Coalville w/e 19/12/1964 16G w/e 13/03/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44113 4w/e 24/04/1954 17C Coalville w/e 19/12/1964 16G m/e 01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44203 w/e 10/10/1964 15E Coalville w/e 19/12/1964 16G m/e 03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44218 w/e 24/10/1964 5B Crewe South w/e 02/01/1965 16G m/e 03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48127 w/e 06/10/1962 15B Kettering w/e 13/03/1965 16G m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48045 w/e 14/03/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 23/10/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48046 w/e 28/03/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 05/03/1966 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48143 w/e 30/05/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48184 w/e 11/04/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 17/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48214 w/e 11/07/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48393 w/e 28/11/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48638 w/e 07/01/1961 16A Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 22/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48763 4w/e 14/08/1954 16A Nottingham w/e 10/04/1965 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47534 w/e 22/10/1960 17A Derby w/e 26/06/1965 16G m/e 03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92031 4w/e 15/06/1957 38B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16G w/e 24/07/1965 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92113 w/e 24/10/1964 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16G w/e 31/07/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48324 w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16G w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48661 w/e 12/12/1964 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16G w/e 18/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47231 w/e 17/08/1963 16A Nottingham w/e 07/07/1965 16G m/e 03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48060 w/e 19/09/1964 16C Derby w/e 07/08/1965 16G w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48073 w/e 12/12/1964 16C Derby w/e 07/08/1965 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48124 w/e 07/11/1959 17A Derby w/e 07/08/1965 16G w/e 23/10/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48149 w/e 22/02/1964 16C Derby w/e 07/08/1965 16G w/e 24/09/1966 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48219 w/e 21/11/1964 15E Coalville w/e 30/10/1965 16G w/e 24/09/1966 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48376 w/e 31/07/1965 15E Coalville w/e 30/10/1965 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48388 w/e 07/11/1964 15E Coalville w/e 30/10/1965 16G w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48619 w/e 21/02/1959 15D Coalville w/e 30/10/1965 16G w/e 26/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48644 w/e 15/08/1959 15D Coalville w/e 30/10/1965 16G w/e 22/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48699 w/e 26/01/1963 15D Coalville w/e 30/10/1965 16G w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47629 w/e 12/09/1964 16F Burton w/e 05/02/1966 16G m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48662 w/e 23/05/1959 17B Burton w/e 05/02/1966 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48272 w/e 09/04/1960 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 12/02/1966 16G w/e 17/09/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48678 w/e 13/03/1965 16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 12/02/1966 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12051 w/e 19/02/1966 16A Toton w/e 19/03/1966 16G w/e 12/11/1966 9D Newton Heath
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12052 w/e 19/02/1966 16A Toton w/e 19/03/1966 16G w/e 12/11/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48254 w/e 12/12/1964 16F Burton w/e 11/06/1966 16G m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48332 w/e 05/05/1962 17B Burton w/e 11/06/1966 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48606 w/e 19/09/1964 16F Burton w/e 11/06/1966 16G m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48690 w/e 19/09/1964 16F Burton w/e 11/06/1966 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48137 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 16/07/1966 16G m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48361 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 16/07/1966 16G m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48432 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 16/07/1966 16G m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47313 w/e 29/10/1960 17B Burton w/e 06/08/1966 16G m/e 06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47643 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 06/08/1966 16G m/e 10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48083 4w/e 30/01/1954 17A Derby w/e 24/09/1966 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48370 w/e 09/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 24/09/1966 16G w/e 22/10/1966 16B Colwick
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47289 w/e 19/11/1966 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 04/02/1967 16G m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47383 w/e 08/01/1966 9D Newton Heath w/e 04/02/1967 16G m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68012 w/e 20/06/1964 9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 13/05/1967 16G m/e 10/1967 Withdrawn