Depot: Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1775 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | WEY | m/e | 10/1938 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2714 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | WEY | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4803 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | WEY | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 162 | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1710 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | WEY | m/e | 02/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1485 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | WEY | ||||||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3408 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | WEY | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4939 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | WEY | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8358 | on | 01/01/1934 | 32 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | WEY | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3432 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | WEY | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 517 | 0-4-2T | 1427 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | WEY | ||||||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | m/e | 06/1937 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 10/1937 | WEY | m/e | 11/1937 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | on | 24/04/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1938 | WEY | m/e | 06/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | on | 18/12/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 04/1939 | WEY | m/e | 06/1939 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2955 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | WEY | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6867 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | WEY | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7782 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | WEY | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1367 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1368 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 83B | Taunton | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1370 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 1789 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2912 | on | 31/07/1907 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2955 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4527 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4562 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4660 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1403 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 162 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SDN | Swindon | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1454 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1467 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4988 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | OXY | Oxley | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5305 | on | 01/01/1934 | 133 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 07/1952 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5314 | on | 01/01/1934 | 22 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 07/1957 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5328 | on | 01/01/1934 | 54 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5337 | on | 01/01/1934 | 83 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5338 | on | 01/01/1934 | 133 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82D | Westbury | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5340 | on | 01/01/1934 | 53 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 09/1948 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5359 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 10/1951 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5384 | on | 01/01/1934 | 133 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | w/e | 11/10/1960 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5968 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5969 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | m/e | 31/05/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6945 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7408 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9642 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5978 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 31/05/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6902 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 31/05/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6912 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 31/05/1948 | WEY | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1366 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 30/06/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 30/10/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 30/06/1948 | WEY | m/e | 07/1948 | LA | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7711 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 30/06/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3022 | m/e | 02/1909 | Withdrawn | m/e | 30/06/1948 (R) | WEY | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | WOS | Worcester | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3763 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6988 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9642 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 3032 | m/e | 10/1913 | Withdrawn | on | 14/10/1948 (R) | WEY | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | WEY | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3763 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4520 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | WEY | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4563 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1453 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | WEY | w/e | 05/04/1960 | 81B | Slough |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6993 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1002 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1002 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1433 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6836 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1436 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8746 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | WEY | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4539 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 82F | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | 28 | on | 15/06/1947 | KDR | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 82F | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | LA | Laira | on | 02/06/1950 | 82F | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | on | 02/06/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82F | on | 04/11/1950 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4507 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82F | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9620 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82F | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9620 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 82F | on | 06/10/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5328 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82F | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5328 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5508 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 06/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1403 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82F | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | m/e | 06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82F | m/e | 07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1403 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5771 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5771 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 82F | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4538 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5718 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4907 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82F | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4907 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4647 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7726 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4647 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6375 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82F | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7726 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82F | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4527 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82F | m/e | 03/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6375 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9764 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5932 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82F | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5932 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 82F | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5781 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82F | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5781 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5771 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82D | Westbury | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5978 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82D | Westbury | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1403 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 82F | m/e | 11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3764 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82F | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5757 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3739 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4507 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8744 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7415 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7421 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5190 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6945 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4150 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5784 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1367 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 72F | Wadebridge |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1370 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3692 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6389 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4624 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82F | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6919 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4965 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1454 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5997 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8793 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7749 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1366 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4562 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 82F | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1368 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82F | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 72F | Wadebridge |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4562 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82F | m/e | 03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4133 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82F | on | 05/11/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4166 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82F | on | 05/11/1961 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3643 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 82F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7421 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 82F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3737 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82F | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5422 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82F | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5548 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82F | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9601 | on | 15/06/1947 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82F | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4507 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82F | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7782 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 82F | on | 06/10/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5964 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6977 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8799 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6967 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 82F | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5392 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 87F | Llanelli | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6945 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7780 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82F | m/e | 06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9626 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3746 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5981 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1418 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82F | m/e | 10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6309 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7303 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7415 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 82F | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1459 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82F | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6344 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82F | on | 02/12/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6914 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82D | Westbury | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 71G | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1472 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1474 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81C | Southall | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | w/e | 05/04/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73017 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | w/e | 04/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73018 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73020 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73022 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73029 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4689 | on | 15/06/1947 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71G | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7303 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71G | on | 02/12/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3759 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 71G | on | 08/09/1963 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73041 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71G | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73042 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71G | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73080 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71G | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1361 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71G | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 89Z | |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1369 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71G | 4w/e | 27/08/1962 | 72F | Wadebridge |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9756 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 71G | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2292 | on | 19/05/1960 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73041 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73042 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | w/e | 08/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73080 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 71G | w/e | 25/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31405 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71G | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31406 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71G | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31407 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71G | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2397 | on | 15/09/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction (New) | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 71G | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2398 | on | 30/09/1961 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 71G | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2295 | on | 24/06/1960 | 70C | Guildford (New) | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 71G | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2399 | on | 21/10/1961 | 73F | Ashford (New) | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 71G | 4w/e | 19/04/1963 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2082 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 19/04/1963 | 71G | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4610 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71G | on | 08/09/1963 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80081 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71G | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80147 | on | 15/11/1956 | 75A | Brighton (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71G | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31816 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71G | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41261 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 71G | w/e | 18/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41297 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh | on | 08/09/1963 | 71G | on | 05/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73002 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | w/e | 19/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41293 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | w/e | 21/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41298 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41305 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | w/e | 13/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41310 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | w/e | 18/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41311 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | w/e | 12/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71G | w/e | 03/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35005 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | on | 10/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35012 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35014 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 26/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35016 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 08/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35017 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 17/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35019 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 05/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35020 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 14/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35022 | on | 23/02/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 22/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35024 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 24/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35026 | on | 23/02/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 26/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35028 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35029 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | w/e | 11/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35030 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41284 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | on | 04/10/1964 | 70G | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73083 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | Feltham | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70G | w/e | 04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2280 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70G | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 30F | Parkeston Quay |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35007 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41301 | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70G | m/e | 10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73113 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70G | w/e | 22/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73114 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70G | w/e | 05/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73016 | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 70G | w/e | 04/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2043 | on | 06/05/1959 | 32B | Ipswich (New) | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 70G | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2043 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | 70G | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35003 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70F | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35008 | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35013 | on | 06/09/1964 | 70F | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70G | m/e | 02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Merchant Navy | 4-6-2 | 35023 | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 71B | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70G | 5w/e | 17/04/1967 | 70A | Nine Elms |