Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 680 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 7043 Week
» 9625 Month
» 274258 Year
» 1495823 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Aberdeen Ferryhill


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Aberdeen Ferryhill Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam O4 2-8-0 6351   06/1920 ROD   19/08/1924 29B 22/07/1943 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6370   08/1921 ROD   20/08/1924 29B 27/10/1939 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam O4 2-8-0 6582   01/1921 ROD   15/01/1929 ABD 07/10/1930 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 2742       31/07/1929 (New) ABD 10/03/1959 64A St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 2741 12/07/1929 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge (New) 01/08/1929 ABD 18/12/1949 64A St Margarets
Steam O4 2-8-0 6286 12/03/1931 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge m/e 09/1931 ABD 22/07/1943 IMM Immingham
Steam P2 2-8-2 2002 22/06/1935 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 10/09/1936 ABD 04/09/1949 64B Haymarket
Steam P2 2-8-2 2006 05/09/1936 HAY Haymarket (New) 16/11/1936 ABD 23/10/1942 HAY Haymarket
Steam A3 4-6-2 2500 10/07/1934 HAY Haymarket (New) 28/03/1937 ABD 04/04/1937 HAY Haymarket
Steam A3 4-6-2 2796 17/05/1930 HAY Haymarket (New) 04/04/1937 ABD 06/03/1938 HAY Haymarket
Steam O4 2-8-0 6291 12/03/1931 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 03/08/1937 ABD 24/07/1943 IMM Immingham
Steam V2 2-6-2 4787       26/10/1937 (New) ABD m/e 03/1940 STM St Margarets
Steam V2 2-6-2 4790       15/11/1937 (New) ABD 01/01/1959 64B Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 4793       09/12/1937 (New) ABD 05/11/1950 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam V2 2-6-2 4805       09/09/1938 (New) ABD 23/10/1942 STM St Margarets
Steam V2 2-6-2 4822 24/03/1939 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge (New) 01/04/1939 ABD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6370 27/10/1939 CAR Carlisle Canal 02/11/1939 ABD 16/07/1943 IMM Immingham
Steam A3 4-6-2 2598 09/03/1939 HAY Haymarket 20/07/1940 ABD 18/10/1941 HAY Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 3658       23/08/1941 (New) ABD m/e 12/1941 HAY Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 4807 m/e 05/1941 HAY Haymarket m/e 10/1941 ABD m/e 11/1941 HAY Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 4787 m/e 05/1941 HAY Haymarket m/e 11/1941 ABD 28/11/1942 STM St Margarets
Steam V2 2-6-2 4807 m/e 11/1941 HAY Haymarket m/e 08/1942 ABD m/e 12/1942 STM St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 2977 27/05/1932 EFD Eastfield (New) 13/04/1943 ABD 12/12/1943 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam J39 0-6-0 2978 07/06/1932 EFD Eastfield (New) 17/04/1943 ABD 23/09/1947 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 2979 15/06/1932 EFD Eastfield (New) 17/04/1943 ABD 12/12/1943 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 2980 16/06/1932 EFD Eastfield (New) 17/04/1943 ABD 12/12/1943 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam V2 2-6-2 4819 m/e 05/1941 HAY Haymarket 02/05/1943 ABD 29/10/1944 HAY Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 3685 27/04/1943 HAY Haymarket (New) m/e 07/1943 ABD m/e 10/1943 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam V2 2-6-2 4787 17/04/1943 HAY Haymarket m/e 07/1944 ABD 29/10/1944 HAY Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 3658 m/e 12/1941 HAY Haymarket m/e 07/1944 ABD 29/10/1944 HAY Haymarket
Steam A2 4-6-2 2001 21/02/1935 HAY Haymarket 29/10/1944 ABD 04/09/1949 64B Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 3685 m/e 10/1943 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 11/04/1945 ABD 30/05/1960 PTH Perth (LNER)
Steam V2 2-6-2 3682 05/11/1944 EFD Eastfield 20/08/1945 ABD 12/06/1960 PTH Perth (LNER)
Steam V2 2-6-2 4859 28/03/1943 GHD Gateshead 13/10/1945 ABD 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 4869 28/03/1943 GHD Gateshead 13/10/1945 ABD 28/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 4890 24/04/1944 GHD Gateshead 13/10/1945 ABD 11/05/1964 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam V2 2-6-2 824 13/10/1945 STM St Margarets 27/01/1947 ABD 01/01/1959 64B Haymarket
Steam V2 2-6-2 825 13/10/1945 STM St Margarets 27/01/1947 ABD 20/11/1949 64A St Margarets
Steam V2 2-6-2 827 13/10/1945 STM St Margarets 27/01/1947 ABD 01/01/1959 64B Haymarket
Steam J39 0-6-0 4975 20/08/1945 CAR Carlisle Canal 16/10/1947 ABD 13/03/1959 64A St Margarets
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9128       01/01/1948 ABD 4w/e 01/07/1961 64A St Margarets
Steam N15 0-6-2T 9129       01/01/1948 ABD 02/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 955 22/09/1942 HAY Haymarket (New) 08/03/1948 ABD 18/05/1964 64A St Margarets
Steam A2 4-6-2 503 13/05/1945 HAY Haymarket 17/05/1948 ABD 26/05/1948 HAY Haymarket
Steam B1 4-6-0 61343       04/02/1949 (New) 61B 16/05/1949 61A Kittybrewster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61345       08/04/1949 (New) 61B 16/05/1949 61A Kittybrewster
Steam A2 4-6-2 60506 23/10/1942 HAY Haymarket 08/04/1949 61B 15/05/1949 64B Haymarket
Steam B1 4-6-0 61132 26/02/1947 KIT Kittybrewster (New) 16/05/1949 61B 14/01/1951 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61133 28/02/1947 KIT Kittybrewster (New) 16/05/1949 61B 19/08/1951 61A Kittybrewster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61134 04/03/1947 KIT Kittybrewster (New) 16/05/1949 61B 09/10/1949 61A Kittybrewster
Steam A2 4-6-2 60537 02/01/1949 NWE New England 01/07/1949 61B 07/01/1951 64B Haymarket
Steam A2 4-6-2 60531 12/03/1948 GHD Gateshead (New) 07/08/1949 61B 02/12/1962 50A York (North)
Steam A2 4-6-2 60525 12/12/1948 NWE New England 28/08/1949 61B 27/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60509 14/03/1945 HAY Haymarket 04/09/1949 61B 25/09/1949 64B Haymarket
Steam A2 4-6-2 60510 01/03/1949 64B Haymarket 04/09/1949 61B 25/09/1949 64B Haymarket
Steam N14 0-6-2T 69125 01/01/1948 KIT Kittybrewster 4w/e 23/12/1950 61B 25/03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60532 27/11/1949 64B Haymarket 07/01/1951 61B 19/06/1961 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45245 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 8w/e 09/09/1951 61B 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45367 3w/e 14/01/1950 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 8w/e 09/09/1951 61B 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William
Steam C16 4-4-2T 67501 01/01/1948 EFD Eastfield 4w/e 06/10/1951 61B 4w/e 13/04/1957 61C Keith
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90020       4w/e 23/02/1952 61B 4w/e 16/05/1953 62A Thornton Junction
Steam J35 0-6-0 64482 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 17/05/1952 61B 4w/e 14/06/1952 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J35 0-6-0 64485 01/01/1948 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 17/05/1952 61B 02/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65247 01/01/1948 KPS Kipps 4w/e 29/11/1952 61B 4w/e 07/08/1954 61A Kittybrewster
Steam K2 2-6-0 61734 16/11/1952 62A Thornton Junction 10/05/1953 61B 07/07/1954 61C Keith
Steam V4 2-6-2 61700 23/10/1943 EFD Eastfield 24/05/1954 61B 14/03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam V4 2-6-2 61701 12/09/1941 EFD Eastfield 24/05/1954 61B 26/11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam N2 0-6-2T 69503 01/01/1948 KPS Kipps 4w/e 12/06/1954 61B 03/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J35 0-6-0 64483 01/01/1948 DFU Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 07/08/1954 61B 4w/e 14/03/1959 64A St Margarets
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45162 4w/e 11/07/1953 66A Polmadie 4w/e 04/09/1954 61B 4w/e 22/08/1964 64C Dalry Road
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45367 4w/e 12/06/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 04/09/1954 61B 4w/e 02/10/1954 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44794 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 02/10/1954 61B 5w/e 31/12/1966 63A Perth South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44703 4w/e 19/05/1951 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 06/08/1955 61B 9w/e 26/11/1966 65A Eastfield
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45469 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 06/08/1955 61B 4w/e 02/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40604 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 02/09/1955 61B 4w/e 01/10/1955 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J36 0-6-0 65267 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 26/11/1955 61B 4w/e 12/05/1956 61C Keith
Steam V2 2-6-2 60804 28/11/1936 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge (New) 23/12/1955 61B 02/01/1956 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam V2 2-6-2 60972 14/01/1951 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 02/01/1956 61B 28/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65242 4w/e 26/12/1953 64A St Margarets 4w/e 21/01/1956 61B 26/08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45167 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 04/08/1956 61B 4w/e 04/06/1960 61A Kittybrewster
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78053 m/e 11/1955 66B Motherwell (New) 8w/e 27/10/1956 61B 8w/e 22/12/1956 61C Keith
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78054 m/e 12/1955 66B Motherwell (New) 8w/e 27/10/1956 61B 8w/e 22/12/1956 61C Keith
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40617 01/01/1948 30B Hurlford 4w/e 16/03/1957 61B 4w/e 13/04/1957 61C Keith
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40618 01/01/1948 30B Hurlford 4w/e 16/03/1957 61B 4w/e 13/04/1957 61C Keith
Steam J36 0-6-0 65247 4w/e 07/08/1954 61A Kittybrewster 8w/e 31/08/1957 61B 4w/e 21/12/1957 61C Keith
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69189 4w/e 06/07/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 8w/e 31/08/1957 61B 18/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69138 4w/e 06/07/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 28/09/1957 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 64A St Margarets
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56325 01/01/1948 29C Dundee West 4w/e 21/12/1957 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 66B Motherwell
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56323 01/01/1948 29C Dundee West 4w/e 21/12/1957 61B 07/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69127 8w/e 31/08/1957 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 10/05/1958 61B 16/06/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3546       12/09/1958 (New) 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3547       19/09/1958 (New) 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3548       26/09/1958 (New) 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549       26/09/1958 (New) 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3550       03/10/1958 (New) 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3551       03/10/1958 (New) 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster
Steam J36 0-6-0 65305 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959 61B 4w/e 12/03/1960 61C Keith
Steam J36 0-6-0 65310 01/01/1948 STM St Margarets 4w/e 14/03/1959 61B 4w/e 11/04/1959 61C Keith
Steam N15 0-6-2T 69224 4w/e 12/04/1958 61C Keith 4w/e 11/04/1959 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 64A St Margarets
Steam A2 4-6-2 60527 04/04/1960 63A Perth South 28/05/1960 61B 15/09/1963 66A Polmadie
Steam A2 4-6-2 60528 02/05/1960 63A Perth South 28/05/1960 61B 19/06/1961 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61346 21/12/1950 61A Kittybrewster 19/06/1961 61B 26/12/1962 62A Thornton Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61347 21/12/1950 61A Kittybrewster 19/06/1961 61B 09/08/1964 64C Dalry Road
Steam B1 4-6-0 61350 28/07/1949 61A Kittybrewster (New) 19/06/1961 61B 16/05/1962 64A St Margarets
Steam B1 4-6-0 61400 30/03/1950 61A Kittybrewster (New) 19/06/1961 61B 09/08/1964 64C Dalry Road
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76104 m/e 07/1957 61A Kittybrewster (New) 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 28/11/1964 64F Bathgate
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76105 m/e 07/1957 61A Kittybrewster (New) 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 6w/e 30/12/1961 64C Dalry Road
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76106 4w/e 04/06/1960 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 6w/e 30/12/1961 64C Dalry Road
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76107 4w/e 04/06/1960 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 28/11/1964 64F Bathgate
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76108 m/e 08/1957 61A Kittybrewster (New) 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 19/01/1963 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78045 4w/e 02/07/1960 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 25/07/1964 64F Bathgate
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78053 8w/e 22/12/1956 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 19/01/1963 65J Stirling
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78054 8w/e 22/12/1956 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 25/07/1964 64F Bathgate
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80115 4w/e 22/10/1960 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 26/08/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80121 4w/e 26/11/1955 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 29/07/1961 66A Polmadie
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40618 4w/e 13/04/1957 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 27/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90077 4w/e 08/04/1961 66E Carstairs 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 06/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46460 4w/e 07/05/1960 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 26/08/1961 63C Oban
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45469 4w/e 02/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 14/07/1962 64C Dalry Road
Steam J36 0-6-0 65227 4w/e 26/09/1959 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 01/07/1961 64F Bathgate
Steam J36 0-6-0 65297 4w/e 11/04/1959 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 26/08/1961 68B Dumfries
Steam J36 0-6-0 65303 m/e 09/06/1956 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 26/08/1961 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam J36 0-6-0 65304 4w/e 13/04/1957 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 26/08/1961 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam J36 0-6-0 65310 4w/e 11/04/1959 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 29/07/1961 65B St Rollox (Balornock)
Steam J36 0-6-0 65338 4w/e 11/04/1959 61C Keith 4w/e 01/07/1961 61B 4w/e 29/07/1961 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40648 4w/e 15/05/1954 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 26/08/1961 61B 27/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40650 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 26/08/1961 61B 27/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40663 4w/e 15/05/1954 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 26/08/1961 61B 27/09/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/10 0-4-0 D2723 30/06/1958 64A St Margarets (New) 6w/e 30/12/1961 61B 4w/e 27/01/1962 61A Kittybrewster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90536 8w/e 19/04/1952 66A Polmadie 4w/e 24/03/1962 61B m/e 08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60009 29/06/1937 HAY Haymarket (New) 20/05/1962 61B 01/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60011 19/03/1938 HAY Haymarket 11/06/1962 61B 11/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60004 24/07/1941 HAY Haymarket 11/06/1962 61B 20/09/1962 64B Haymarket
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90640 4w/e 11/08/1962 65F Grangemouth 3w/e 29/09/1962 61B 5w/e 30/04/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Steam A2 4-6-2 60522 30/05/1948 YK York (North) 02/12/1962 61B 31/12/1962 64A St Margarets
Steam V2 2-6-2 60970 12/06/1960 PTH Perth (LNER) 29/12/1962 61B 19/07/1964 64A St Margarets
Steam A2 4-6-2 60524 02/12/1962 64A St Margarets 31/12/1962 61B 15/09/1963 66A Polmadie
Steam V2 2-6-2 60959 11/04/1960 64A St Margarets 31/12/1962 61B 01/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam A3 4-6-2 60042 09/09/1962 52B Heaton 07/04/1963 61B 27/10/1963 64A St Margarets
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90386 4w/e 27/09/1958 66B Motherwell 4w/e 08/06/1963 61B 4w/e 08/06/1963 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam A4 4-6-2 60004 20/09/1962 64B Haymarket 17/06/1963 61B 17/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60835 16/06/1963 52A Gateshead 30/06/1963 61B 19/07/1964 64A St Margarets
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90596 4w/e 10/05/1958 66A Polmadie 5w/e 07/09/1963 61B 5w/e 30/04/1966 62A Thornton Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90705 4w/e 16/06/1962 66B Motherwell 4w/e 05/10/1963 61B 4w/e 28/12/1963 62A Thornton Junction
Steam A4 4-6-2 60010 16/06/1963 34E New England 20/10/1963 61B 29/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60016 28/10/1963 64A St Margarets 10/11/1963 61B 19/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60019 28/10/1963 64A St Margarets 10/11/1963 61B 05/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60005 28/10/1963 64A St Margarets 10/11/1963 61B 12/03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60836 17/11/1960 64A St Margarets 24/11/1963 61B 13/04/1964 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam A4 4-6-2 60012 09/09/1963 64C Dalry Road 20/01/1964 61B 20/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60026 20/10/1963 64A St Margarets 13/04/1964 61B 21/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60006 20/10/1963 64A St Margarets 04/05/1964 61B 03/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60023 28/10/1963 64A St Margarets 17/05/1964 61B 30/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60034 20/10/1963 64A St Margarets 17/05/1964 61B 24/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60007 20/10/1963 64A St Margarets 20/07/1964 61B 01/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73008 8w/e 19/04/1952 63A Perth South 4w/e 22/08/1964 61B 20/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73056 4w/e 07/08/1954 66A Polmadie 4w/e 22/08/1964 61B w/e 26/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73058 4w/e 07/08/1954 66A Polmadie 4w/e 22/08/1964 61B 05/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam A4 4-6-2 60024 15/12/1963 64A St Margarets 21/03/1965 61B 05/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60528 19/06/1961 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 24/04/1966 61B 02/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61180 06/11/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 27/11/1966 61B 12/03/1967 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam A2 4-6-2 60532 19/06/1961 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 04/12/1966 61B 31/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61072 06/11/1966 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 04/12/1966 61B 06/01/1967 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6138 02/02/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6139 16/02/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6141 15/03/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6142 4w/e 30/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6143 30/03/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6144 05/04/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6145 4w/e 02/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6146 4w/e 02/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6147 05/05/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6148 15/05/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6149 30/05/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6150 06/06/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6151 13/06/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6153 06/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6154 14/07/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6155 16/08/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6156 15/09/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6157 07/12/1960 61A Kittybrewster (New) 24/09/1967 61B 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2420 14/02/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 5w/e 03/07/1971 66A Polmadie
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2421 24/02/1959 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 4w/e 25/01/1969 65A Eastfield
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2587 4w/e 27/05/1967 61A Kittybrewster 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 5w/e 30/12/1967 62C Dunfermline Upper
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2597 4w/e 27/05/1967 61A Kittybrewster 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 4w/e 25/11/1967 64H Leith Central
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A Thornton Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3550 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 4w/e 28/06/1969 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3551 4w/e 01/07/1961 61A Kittybrewster 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 5w/e 01/03/1969 60A Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3552 10/10/1958 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 5w/e 31/01/1970 66C Hamilton (West)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3553 17/10/1958 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B w/e 26/02/1972 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3930 06/03/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 4w/e 29/05/1971 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3931 10/03/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 4w/e 29/01/1972 64B Haymarket
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3932 17/03/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 5w/e 01/01/1972 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3933 23/03/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B w/e 23/10/1971 15A Leicester Midland
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3934 28/03/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B w/e 09/10/1971 52A Gateshead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3935 06/04/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 2w/e 30/10/1971 51L Thornaby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3935 06/04/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B 4w/e 30/10/1971 91E To Eastern Region
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3936 13/04/1961 61A Kittybrewster (New) 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B w/e 18/05/1968 41C Wath
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3660 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 04/05/1968 61B 5w/e 30/11/1968 60A Inverness
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4097 5w/e 01/06/1968 63A Perth South 4w/e 27/12/1969 61B 4w/e 01/12/1973 ED Eastfield
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2423 4w/e 09/05/1959 60A Inverness 5w/e 03/07/1971 61B 09/06/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3211 5w/e 30/05/1970 64H Leith Central 2w/e 21/08/1971 61B 5w/e 01/07/1972 65A Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3550 5w/e 07/08/1971 64B Haymarket 2w/e 21/08/1971 61B w/e 26/02/1972 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3558 5w/e 07/08/1971 64B Haymarket 2w/e 21/08/1971 61B 5w/e 31/12/1976 ED Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3677 w/e 18/07/1970 52A Gateshead w/e 09/10/1971 61B 20/01/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3539 9w/e 26/11/1966 65F Grangemouth 5w/e 01/01/1972 61B 4w/e 29/12/1973 DE Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3877 5w/e 30/10/1965 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/01/1972 61B 25/01/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3985 w/e 30/10/1971 64B Haymarket 5w/e 01/01/1972 61B 31/05/2004 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3243 4w/e 14/08/1965 52A Gateshead w/e 22/01/1972 61B 4w/e 25/11/1972 65F Grangemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3932 5w/e 01/01/1972 62B Dundee West 4w/e 26/02/1972 61B 4w/e 28/10/1972 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3929 7w/e 27/03/1971 62B Dundee West 4w/e 29/04/1972 61B 4w/e 28/10/1972 62B Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3929 7w/e 27/03/1971 63A Perth South 4w/e 29/04/1972 61B 4w/e 28/10/1972 62B Dundee West
Diesel 06 0-4-0 D2444 5w/e 05/08/1972 62B Dundee West 4w/e 24/02/1973 61B 4w/e 29/12/1973 DE Dundee West
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3932 4w/e 28/10/1972 62B Dundee West 4w/e 21/04/1973 61B 4w/e 03/11/1973 ED Eastfield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3932 4w/e 03/11/1973 ED Eastfield 4w/e 01/12/1973 AB 06/05/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08828 w/e 26/06/1976 ED Eastfield 5w/e 31/12/1976 AB