Depot: Bidston
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Bidston | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8671 | on | 01/01/1948 | BID | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8701 | m/e | 11/1935 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | on | 01/01/1948 | BID | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8714 | on | 01/01/1948 | BID | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8727 | on | 01/01/1948 | BID | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9289 | on | 01/01/1948 | BID | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8006 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | GOR | Gorton | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BID | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 8065 | m/e | 03/1938 | Withdrawn | w/e | 05/03/1949 (R) | BID | |||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 8066 | on | 01/01/1948 | GOR | Gorton | w/e | 05/03/1949 | BID | w/e | 22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4805 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | GOR | Gorton | on | 25/12/1949 | BID | on | 01/01/1950 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64741 | on | 21/08/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 03/01/1950 | BID | on | 10/01/1950 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69339 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6F | w/e | 17/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68063 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6F | w/e | 06/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47627 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47628 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47672 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47674 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47627 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47628 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47672 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47674 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47160 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47164 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47166 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68013 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68030 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68034 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68065 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6F | w/e | 22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48165 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 6F | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48253 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 6F | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92047 | on | 19/02/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough (New) | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48667 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 6F | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92045 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92046 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47622 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47160 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6F | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47565 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6F | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47166 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6F | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68553 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6F | w/e | 20/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68671 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6F | m/e | 02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68714 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6F | m/e | 03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68727 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6F | w/e | 27/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90532 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6F | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 90763 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6F | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47495 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48476 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 6F | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2386 | on | 24/03/1961 (New) | 6F | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92055 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 6F | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92113 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 6F | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47674 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92165 | on | 30/04/1958 | 21A | Saltley (New) | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92166 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92167 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47160 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47164 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 6F | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |