Depot: Blackpool Central
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Blackpool Central | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10445 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 24E | m/e | 02/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10460 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 24E | y/e | 1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10465 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 24E | y/e | 1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10446 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 24E | m/e | 06/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4927 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4947 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4950 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 52542 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12558 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12174 | y/e | 1940 | 91M | To London Midland Region | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12194 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25D | Mirfield | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12215 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12275 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12415 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 24D | Lower Darwen | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12572 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12430 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 22/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12447 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12459 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10721 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50725 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10749 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50750 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10766 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10799 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24D | Lower Darwen | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50889 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6411 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6412 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6413 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2636 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2637 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2638 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1192 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1195 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1197 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4778 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4779 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | Bury | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4927 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | Blackpool Central | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | Blackpool Central | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4929 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4930 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4932 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4947 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | Blackpool Central | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4950 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24E | Blackpool Central | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4988 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5571 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5574 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5588 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2A | Rugby | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5653 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 10B | Preston | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5695 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5697 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5707 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1185 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 24E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10752 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 24E | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5077 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12182 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 24E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12215 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 24E | w/e | 05/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10778 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 24E | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50849 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 24E | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12458 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 24E | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10757 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24E | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12437 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 24E | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12437 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24E | w/e | 05/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10757 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24E | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46435 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 (New) | 24E | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 27C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45043 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 28A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45107 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 28A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45214 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 28A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45043 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28A | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45107 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28A | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45214 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28A | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50746 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 28A | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50748 | 4w/e | 11/03/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 28A | m/e | 09/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50749 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 28A | w/e | 26/01/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50844 | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 28A | m/e | 09/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50752 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 28A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52138 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52157 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | w/e | 18/04/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52334 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52357 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52466 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50752 | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46413 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50806 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24F | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 28A | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41264 | on | 18/11/1950 | 28A | on | 14/09/1954 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41263 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 28A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41263 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 28A | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45061 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45200 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52588 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50712 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52588 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 28A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50712 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 28A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41193 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 27A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44778 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45061 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45334 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41187 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41192 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45061 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41187 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41192 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 28A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 15B | Kettering |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45334 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 28A | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46435 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 28A | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50777 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45450 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 28A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52182 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 28A | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46486 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 28A | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46487 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 28A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41100 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 28A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44947 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 28A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44737 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44926 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44737 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44926 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45077 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24E | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45580 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45580 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 24E | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45584 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 24E | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52240 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24E | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26A | Newton Heath | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 24E | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44927 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73029 | m/e | 06/1953 (New) | 28A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41085 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40937 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 25F | Low Moor | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45061 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44889 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44982 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45200 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45318 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45436 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52240 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24F | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42473 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42474 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42476 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42629 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41260 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41261 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41262 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41280 | m/e | 10/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood (New) | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41193 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52527 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 24E | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40099 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 24E | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40072 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40103 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40109 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | w/e | 21/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40164 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40174 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | w/e | 09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42625 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45719 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 24E | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45077 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27C | Southport | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 24E | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24E | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44689 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 24E | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52523 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 24E | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45705 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 24E | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45077 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 24E | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 24E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45700 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 24E | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80046 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24E | on | 04/02/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80093 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24E | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41101 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24E | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45201 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 24E | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 24E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44917 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45500 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40166 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 24E | on | 28/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42455 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42657 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40091 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 24E | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45078 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24E | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45227 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24E | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45415 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42206 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 24E | w/e | 20/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42207 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 24E | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45377 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45442 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45102 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 24E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45559 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 24E | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42643 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24E | on | 14/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42294 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24E | on | 18/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42153 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24E | on | 08/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42558 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42559 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 24E | on | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44728 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45681 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 24E | on | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45691 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 24E | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45731 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 24E | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45732 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 24E | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45697 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 24E | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45703 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 24E | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42295 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44664 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 24E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44819 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 24E | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45274 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 24E | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45035 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24E | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45397 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24E | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45402 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24E | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45347 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 24E | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45373 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 24E | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45026 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 24E | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42464 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10B | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42081 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 10B | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42439 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 10B | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45584 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 10B | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45653 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 10B | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45495 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10B | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45256 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 10B | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45238 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10B | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45210 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 10B | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45286 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 10B | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45303 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 10B | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |