Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 143 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7884 Week
» 28326 Month
» 365172 Year
» 1586737 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Blaydon


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Blaydon Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7245       m/e 06/1894 BLA on 25/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7255       m/e 06/1895 BLA on 02/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7259       m/e 06/1895 BLA 5w/e 24/04/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7265       m/e 03/1896 BLA 4w/e 23/10/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7268       m/e 03/1896 BLA 4w/e 22/05/1954 52D Tweedmouth
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7277       m/e 10/1896 BLA 5w/e 18/12/1954 52F Blyth (North)
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7313       m/e 11/1900 BLA on 21/08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7315       m/e 12/1900 BLA 4w/e 20/06/1953 52C Blaydon
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7323       m/e 12/1900 BLA 4w/e 23/10/1954 52F Blyth (North)
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7325       m/e 03/1901 BLA 4w/e 30/06/1950 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7329       m/e 04/1901 BLA 4w/e 30/06/1950 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7339       m/e 09/1901 BLA 4w/e 23/10/1954 52F Blyth (North)
Steam B13 4-6-0 766       m/e 06/1906 (New) BLA on 07/07/1924 YK York (North)
Steam B13 4-6-0 775       m/e 08/1906 (New) BLA m/e 07/1924 YK York (North)
Steam B13 4-6-0 756       m/e 01/1909 (New) BLA on 07/09/1924 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2222       m/e 06/1917 (New) BLA on 14/06/1941 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2238       m/e 12/1918 (New) BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2258       m/e 02/1920 (New) BLA on 14/05/1941 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2260       m/e 02/1920 (New) BLA on 07/11/1931 GHD Gateshead
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2261       m/e 02/1920 (New) BLA on 27/01/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2262       m/e 02/1920 (New) BLA on 07/02/1937 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2266       m/e 03/1920 (New) BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2267       m/e 03/1920 (New) BLA on 02/03/1927 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2269       m/e 04/1920 (New) BLA on 07/11/1931 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1329       m/e 11/1921 (New) BLA on 21/07/1926 HTN Heaton
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1330       m/e 12/1921 (New) BLA on 24/05/1934 MID Middlesbrough
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1521       m/e 12/1921 (New) BLA on 05/10/1935 GHD Gateshead
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1328       m/e 02/1922 (New) BLA on 21/07/1926 HTN Heaton
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1522       m/e 05/1922 (New) BLA on 29/05/1934 SKN Stockton
Steam N9 0-6-2T 1645       by 01/01/1923 BLA m/e 06/1946 Withdrawn
Steam B16 4-6-0 932 m/e 03/1921 HTN Heaton (New) on 01/07/1924 BLA on 30/09/1937 YK York (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2271 m/e 04/1920 CAR Carlisle Canal (New) on 01/07/1924 BLA on 07/11/1931 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2281 m/e 06/1920 CAR Carlisle Canal (New) on 01/07/1924 BLA on 14/06/1941 SKN Stockton
Steam B13 4-6-0 2007 m/e 09/1924 HTN Heaton m/e 01/1925 BLA on 24/10/1928 Withdrawn
Steam B16 4-6-0 2365 m/e 12/1922 GHD Gateshead (New) m/e 01/1925 BLA on 30/09/1937 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam A5 4-6-2T 1756       on 14/11/1925 (New) BLA on 25/05/1928 SALT Saltburn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 1760 on 25/11/1925 DAR Darlington (New) on 02/12/1925 BLA on 25/05/1928 SALT Saltburn
Steam A5 4-6-2T 1768 on 23/12/1925 HTN Heaton (New) on 14/01/1926 BLA on 27/06/1928 HTN Heaton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 1771 on 08/01/1926 DAR Darlington (New) on 14/01/1926 BLA on 27/06/1928 HTN Heaton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 1782       on 21/01/1926 (New) BLA on 27/06/1928 HTN Heaton
Steam A5 4-6-2T 1738 on 07/12/1925 HTN Heaton m/e 02/1926 BLA on 28/05/1928 SALT Saltburn
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2240 m/e 12/1918 TDK Tyne Dock (New) m/e 03/1926 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam A5 4-6-2T 1790       on 31/03/1926 (New) BLA on 25/05/1928 SALT Saltburn
Steam B13 4-6-0 2002 m/e 01/1925 TWD Tweedmouth m/e 01/1927 BLA on 07/07/1931 Withdrawn
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2231 on 31/01/1925 HLS Hull Springhead on 31/03/1927 BLA on 28/10/1939 HTN Heaton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2252 on 08/12/1924 HLS Hull Springhead on 31/03/1927 BLA on 26/01/1931 BLA Blaydon
Steam Q5 0-8-0 669 m/e 07/1911 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 24/05/1927 BLA on 08/06/1937 HTN Heaton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1002 on 26/08/1924 HLS Hull Springhead on 26/05/1927 BLA on 09/10/1934 NBH Blyth (North)
Steam J39 0-6-0 1451 on 15/10/1926 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 25/11/1927 BLA on 06/07/1952 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 1452 on 21/10/1926 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 25/11/1927 BLA on 18/09/1949 GHD Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1454 on 21/10/1926 HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 25/11/1927 BLA on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam H1 4-4-4T 2149 m/e 12/1913 SALT Saltburn (New) on 28/05/1928 BLA on 17/03/1936 HTN Heaton
Steam H1 4-4-4T 2150 m/e 01/1914 SALT Saltburn (New) on 28/05/1928 BLA on 14/06/1935 MID Middlesbrough
Steam H1 4-4-4T 2151 on 07/02/1925 SALT Saltburn on 28/05/1928 BLA on 11/06/1936 MID Middlesbrough
Steam H1 4-4-4T 2152 m/e 12/1913 SALT Saltburn (New) on 28/05/1928 BLA on 29/05/1936 MID Middlesbrough
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1517 on 21/07/1926 HTN Heaton on 27/06/1928 BLA on 12/07/1934 HTN Heaton
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1523 m/e 06/1920 HTN Heaton (New) on 27/06/1928 BLA on 12/07/1934 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1418       on 11/12/1929 (New) BLA on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1425       on 19/12/1929 (New) BLA on 28/02/1948 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1466       on 03/01/1930 (New) BLA on 14/06/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1429       on 08/01/1930 (New) BLA on 22/03/1945 Twd Alnmouth
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2252 on 31/03/1927 BLA Blaydon on 26/01/1931 BLA on 07/11/1931 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2260 on 07/11/1931 GHD Gateshead on 26/11/1931 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2269 on 07/11/1931 BOR Borough Gardens on 26/11/1931 BLA on 14/06/1941 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2271 on 07/11/1931 BOR Borough Gardens on 26/11/1931 BLA on 14/06/1941 SKN Stockton
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1526 m/e 09/1921 DAR Darlington (New) on 24/05/1934 BLA on 20/05/1936 SCA Scarborough
Steam H1 4-4-4T 1503 m/e 07/1921 DAR Darlington (New) on 09/10/1934 BLA on 29/05/1936 DAR Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2218 on 27/11/1933 HTN Heaton on 09/10/1934 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam J39 0-6-0 1584       on 20/12/1935 (New) BLA on 18/09/1949 GHD Gateshead
Steam B16 4-6-0 2377 on 06/06/1923 GHD Gateshead (New) on 15/01/1937 BLA on 28/09/1937 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2242 on 18/06/1931 EHL East Hartlepool on 08/03/1937 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2247 on 21/11/1934 HTN Heaton on 08/06/1937 BLA on 17/07/1939 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1488 on 14/12/1934 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (New) on 24/08/1938 BLA on 18/09/1949 GHD Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1563 on 25/04/1937 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) on 24/08/1938 BLA on 08/09/1943 Twd Alnmouth
Steam A8 4-6-2T 2158 on 25/05/1935 MID Middlesbrough on 16/01/1939 BLA on 30/05/1948 WBY Whitby
Steam A8 4-6-2T 2146 on 28/05/1928 GHD Gateshead on 17/01/1939 BLA on 30/05/1948 SUN Sunderland
Steam A8 4-6-2T 2150 on 14/06/1935 MID Middlesbrough on 17/01/1939 BLA on 07/11/1948 SUN Sunderland
Steam A8 4-6-2T 2151 on 11/06/1936 MID Middlesbrough on 17/01/1939 BLA on 28/03/1940 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens
Steam A8 4-6-2T 2143 on 12/06/1933 MID Middlesbrough on 18/01/1939 BLA on 31/10/1941 SUN Sunderland
Steam A8 4-6-2T 2144 on 14/11/1938 SUN Sunderland on 18/01/1939 BLA on 28/05/1950 51F West Auckland
Steam A8 4-6-2T 1327 on 05/07/1934 MID Middlesbrough on 30/01/1939 BLA on 31/10/1941 SUN Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2296 m/e 12/1920 NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 08/07/1939 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2225 on 07/06/1934 AFP Annfield Plain on 15/07/1939 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam J39 0-6-0 1585 on 08/07/1939 TWD Tweedmouth on 17/01/1940 BLA on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington
Steam Q5 0-8-0 410 on 28/12/1935 HTN Heaton on 27/05/1940 BLA on 20/07/1947 DAR Darlington
Steam A8 4-6-2T 1329 on 20/03/1939 MID Middlesbrough on 18/11/1940 BLA on 27/12/1941 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2214 on 15/01/1938 BOR Borough Gardens on 15/02/1941 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2247 on 02/03/1940 TDK Tyne Dock on 15/02/1941 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2272 on 29/07/1939 TDK Tyne Dock on 15/02/1941 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 1311 on 01/02/1927 BOR Borough Gardens on 29/03/1941 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2279 m/e 06/1920 BOR Borough Gardens (New) on 29/03/1941 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 2300 m/e 01/1921 BOR Borough Gardens (New) on 29/03/1941 BLA on 28/03/1943 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam J39 0-6-0 1458 on 07/11/1938 HAV Haverton Hill on 28/03/1943 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1459 on 07/11/1938 HAV Haverton Hill on 28/03/1943 BLA on 08/09/1943 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1587 on 25/05/1937 HAV Haverton Hill on 28/03/1943 BLA on 08/09/1943 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2118 on 30/03/1942 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 27/07/1947 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2121 on 27/01/1927 NBH Blyth (North) on 28/03/1943 BLA on 05/10/1947 DAR Darlington
Steam Q5 0-8-0 2125 on 07/01/1935 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 20/07/1947 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1002 on 09/10/1934 NBH Blyth (North) on 28/03/1943 BLA on 20/07/1947 SEL Selby
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1685 on 07/11/1938 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 20/07/1947 CUD Cudworth
Steam Q5 0-8-0 474 on 07/11/1938 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 27/07/1947 DAR Darlington
Steam Q5 0-8-0 715 on 21/05/1941 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 05/10/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 430 on 07/11/1938 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 20/07/1947 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q5 0-8-0 444 on 17/11/1941 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 05/10/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 654 on 07/01/1935 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 20/07/1947 NPT Newport (Teeside)
Steam Q5 0-8-0 655 on 07/01/1935 DAR Darlington on 28/03/1943 BLA on 20/07/1947 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam J39 0-6-0 1453 on 28/03/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 19/06/1943 BLA on 15/01/1961 52B Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1469 on 28/03/1943 HAV Haverton Hill on 19/06/1943 BLA on 05/06/1949 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1472 on 12/10/1936 HAV Haverton Hill on 19/06/1943 BLA on 04/03/1951 52A Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1509 on 28/03/1943 SKN Stockton on 19/06/1943 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1551 on 01/01/1940 SKN Stockton on 19/06/1943 BLA on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1487 on 28/03/1943 SKN Stockton on 21/06/1943 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1468 on 16/07/1940 SKN Stockton on 21/06/1943 BLA on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1490 on 16/07/1940 SKN Stockton on 21/06/1943 BLA on 17/07/1949 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1508 on 28/03/1943 SKN Stockton on 21/06/1943 BLA on 08/09/1943 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1470 on 30/12/1940 SKN Stockton on 23/06/1943 BLA on 15/01/1961 52B Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1482 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 23/06/1943 BLA on 22/01/1950 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam J39 0-6-0 1471 on 13/10/1932 DAR Darlington (New) on 26/06/1943 BLA on 14/08/1949 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1463 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 26/06/1943 BLA on 30/06/1957 52B Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1533 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 26/06/1943 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1544 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 26/06/1943 BLA on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1548 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 14/07/1943 BLA on 09/05/1948 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 1449 on 23/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 16/07/1943 BLA on 18/09/1949 GHD Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1543 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 16/07/1943 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1585 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 16/07/1943 BLA on 09/05/1948 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 1536 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 27/07/1943 BLA on 23/10/1949 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1547 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 27/07/1943 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1580 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 27/07/1943 BLA on 09/05/1948 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 1448 on 23/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 03/08/1943 BLA on 04/01/1953 54C Borough Gardens
Steam J39 0-6-0 1456 on 16/07/1934 DAR Darlington on 03/08/1943 BLA on 18/09/1949 GHD Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1481 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 03/08/1943 BLA on 28/02/1948 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 1476 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 03/08/1943 BLA on 23/10/1949 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1835 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 22/08/1943 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam Q5 0-8-0 578 on 21/11/1940 HTN Heaton on 22/10/1944 BLA on 20/07/1947 WHL West Hartlepool
Steam Q5 0-8-0 130 on 18/06/1931 HAV Haverton Hill on 23/07/1945 BLA on 20/07/1947 MID Middlesbrough
Steam Q5 0-8-0 939 on 07/01/1935 NPT Newport (Teeside) on 23/07/1945 BLA on 18/09/1947 Withdrawn
Steam Q5 0-8-0 771 on 08/01/1944 MID Middlesbrough on 23/07/1945 BLA on 05/10/1947 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam Q5 0-8-0 1062 on 19/06/1924 NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/07/1945 BLA on 05/10/1947 HAV Haverton Hill
Steam K1 2-6-0 3445 on 02/12/1945 NWE New England on 16/05/1946 BLA on 05/07/1946 STM St Margarets
Steam J39 0-6-0 4815 on 22/03/1945 Twd Alnmouth on 29/09/1946 BLA on 13/04/1947 Twd Alnmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 4924 on 08/09/1943 Twd Alnmouth on 29/09/1946 BLA on 13/04/1947 Twd Alnmouth
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3353 on 13/05/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3376 on 13/05/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 09/09/1962 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3385 on 04/11/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 24/02/1963 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3391 on 28/03/1943 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3398 on 13/05/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3403 on 29/07/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3412 on 04/12/1930 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 16/06/1957 51G Haverton Hill
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3444 on 29/09/1946 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 17/12/1950 54C Borough Gardens
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3448 on 28/03/1943 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 20/07/1947 BLA on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3399 on 04/11/1944 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/07/1947 BLA on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3432 on 28/03/1943 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/07/1947 BLA on 15/09/1957 51B Newport (Teeside)
Steam A8 4-6-2T 9887 on 31/10/1941 SUN Sunderland on 05/10/1947 BLA on 15/11/1947 SUN Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3356 on 04/12/1943 SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947 BLA on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3381 on 05/03/1945 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/10/1947 BLA on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3390 on 04/12/1943 SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947 BLA on 24/02/1963 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3394 on 05/03/1945 WHL West Hartlepool on 05/10/1947 BLA on 12/05/1963 52E Percy Main
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3413 on 01/02/1943 SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947 BLA on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3428 on 14/06/1941 SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947 BLA on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3437 on 23/06/1943 SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947 BLA on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam Q6 0-8-0 3441 on 01/02/1943 SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947 BLA on 24/02/1963 52G Sunderland
Steam D32 4-4-0 62448       on 01/01/1948 BLA on 02/09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D32 4-4-0 62449       on 01/01/1948 BLA on 13/11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 2349       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 2360       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 2371       on 01/01/1948 BLA 5w/e 21/03/1953 52D Tweedmouth
Steam J21 0-6-0 5025       on 01/01/1948 BLA on 13/11/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 5029       on 01/01/1948 BLA m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 5035       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 20/09/1952 52B Heaton
Steam J21 0-6-0 5062       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 23/12/1950 51F West Auckland
Steam J21 0-6-0 5080       on 01/01/1948 BLA on 05/12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 5100       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 13/12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 5101       on 01/01/1948 BLA m/e 04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 5111       on 01/01/1948 BLA on 21/03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 5112       on 01/01/1948 BLA m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 5295       on 01/01/1948 BLA 5w/e 24/03/1951 65C Parkhead
Steam J36 0-6-0 5331       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 19/05/1951 64F Bathgate
Steam J36 0-6-0 5343       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 19/05/1951 65E Kipps
Steam J71 0-6-0T 8284       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 24/10/1953 53C Hull Springhead
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8010       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 09/09/1961 51A Darlington
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8014       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 02/05/1959 52C Blaydon
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8015       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 07/01/1961 56B Ardsley
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8019       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 20/01/1951 54D Consett
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8021       on 01/01/1948 BLA 5w/e 23/06/1951 52B Heaton
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8024       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 20/12/1958 51A Darlington
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8029       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 19/05/1951 50A York (North)
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8035       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 09/09/1961 51A Darlington
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8036       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 01/10/1960 52H Tyne Dock
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8037       on 01/01/1948 BLA m/e 21/07/1956 51A Darlington
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8038       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 02/05/1959 52H Tyne Dock
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8058       on 01/01/1948 BLA 5w/e 23/06/1951 54A Sunderland
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 8059       on 01/01/1948 BLA 5w/e 23/06/1951 52C Blaydon
Steam N10 0-6-2T 9095       on 01/01/1948 BLA 4w/e 19/07/1952 52A Gateshead
Steam V1 2-6-2T 7636       on 01/01/1948 BLA w/e 22/06/1963 52A Gateshead
Steam V1 2-6-2T 7658       on 01/01/1948 BLA 5w/e 20/07/1957 52B Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 4865 on 20/11/1935 DAR Darlington (New) on 15/02/1948 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 4949 on 04/01/1948 TWD Tweedmouth on 24/02/1948 BLA on 20/08/1950 50B Neville Hill
Steam J39 0-6-0 4863 on 04/01/1948 TWD Tweedmouth on 28/02/1948 BLA on 07/11/1948 HTN Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 4812 on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington on 29/08/1948 BLA on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 4858 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 29/08/1948 BLA on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 64925 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 29/08/1948 BLA on 14/08/1949 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 4940 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 29/08/1948 BLA on 19/11/1950 51A Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 4982 on 03/05/1944 DAR Darlington on 29/08/1948 BLA on 23/05/1949 TWD Tweedmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 64869 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 14/11/1948 BLA on 09/07/1950 52A Gateshead
Steam K1 2-6-0 62021       on 02/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52A Gateshead
Steam K1 2-6-0 62022       on 04/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52K Consett
Steam K1 2-6-0 62023       on 05/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52K Consett
Steam K1 2-6-0 62024       on 08/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52A Gateshead
Steam K1 2-6-0 62025       on 10/08/1949 (New) BLA on 21/01/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam K1 2-6-0 62026       on 11/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52A Gateshead
Steam K1 2-6-0 62027       on 15/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52K Consett
Steam K1 2-6-0 62028       on 17/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52A Gateshead
Steam K1 2-6-0 62029       on 19/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52A Gateshead
Steam K1 2-6-0 62030       on 22/08/1949 (New) BLA on 06/05/1962 52A Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 64705 on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 02/10/1949 BLA on 16/06/1957 52d Alnmouth
Steam J39 0-6-0 64812 on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 02/10/1949 BLA on 04/01/1953 52c Alston
Steam J39 0-6-0 64858 on 04/09/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 02/10/1949 BLA on 15/01/1961 52G Sunderland
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67653 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 30/06/1950 52C on 23/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68702 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead 4w/e 20/01/1951 52C 5w/e 23/06/1951 52B Heaton
Steam J25 0-6-0 5667 on 01/01/1948 CUD Cudworth 5w/e 24/03/1951 52C 4w/e 20/09/1952 52F Blyth (North)
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69023       m/e 04/1951 (New) 52C m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69024       m/e 04/1951 (New) 52C w/e 07/10/1961 52B Heaton
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69025       m/e 04/1951 (New) 52C w/e 07/10/1961 52H Tyne Dock
Steam J21 0-6-0 65039 on 01/01/1948 TWD Tweedmouth 4w/e 21/04/1951 52C 4w/e 13/12/1952 51A Darlington
Steam J21 0-6-0 65042 on 01/01/1948 SEL Selby 4w/e 21/04/1951 52C 4w/e 19/01/1952 52C Blaydon
Steam J21 0-6-0 65105 on 01/01/1948 SEL Selby 4w/e 21/04/1951 52C on 12/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69026       m/e 05/1951 (New) 52C 4w/e 15/11/1952 52C Blaydon
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67325 4w/e 30/06/1950 52A Gateshead 4w/e 19/05/1951 52C 4w/e 21/04/1956 50F Malton
Steam J71 0-6-0T 68267 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead 5w/e 23/06/1951 52C 3w/e 12/11/1955 52A Gateshead
Steam J71 0-6-0T 68273 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 5w/e 23/06/1951 52C 5w/e 20/07/1957 50A York (North)
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68059 on 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon 5w/e 23/06/1951 52C 5w/e 20/07/1957 54B Tyne Dock
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67316 5w/e 23/06/1951 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 21/07/1951 52C 5w/e 23/07/1955 54A Sunderland
Steam J21 0-6-0 65042 4w/e 21/04/1951 52C Blaydon 4w/e 19/01/1952 52C on 07/07/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 65119 on 01/01/1948 DAR Darlington 4w/e 19/01/1952 52C 4w/e 20/09/1952 52C Blaydon
Steam K1 2-6-0 62002 on 25/09/1949 HTN Heaton on 06/07/1952 52C on 06/05/1962 52K Consett
Steam K1 2-6-0 62010 on 25/09/1949 HTN Heaton on 06/07/1952 52C on 21/01/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67248 on 01/01/1948 TWD Tweedmouth 4w/e 19/07/1952 52C 4w/e 15/12/1956 54A Sunderland
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67252 4w/e 19/07/1952 52B Heaton 5w/e 23/08/1952 52C w/e 10/11/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 65119 4w/e 19/01/1952 52C Blaydon 4w/e 20/09/1952 52C w/e 13/12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68731 on 01/01/1948 TDK Tyne Dock 4w/e 20/09/1952 52C 4w/e 16/02/1957 52A Gateshead
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69026 m/e 05/1951 52C Blaydon (New) 4w/e 15/11/1952 52C w/e 07/10/1961 52B Heaton
Steam J39 0-6-0 64713 on 02/09/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates on 30/11/1952 52C on 04/01/1953 54C Borough Gardens
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67304 4w/e 19/07/1952 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/12/1952 52C on 22/02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64864 on 03/12/1950 54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953 52C on 13/06/1954 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam J39 0-6-0 64870 on 24/12/1950 54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953 52C on 26/06/1955 50B Neville Hill
Steam J39 0-6-0 64897 on 24/12/1950 54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953 52C on 28/03/1954 52d Alnmouth
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76024 m/e 01/1953 52A Gateshead (New) 5w/e 21/03/1953 52C 4w/e 18/04/1953 52E Percy Main
Steam J39 0-6-0 64812 on 04/01/1953 52c Alston on 07/06/1953 52C on 14/06/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63408 on 27/01/1952 54C Borough Gardens on 14/06/1953 52C on 24/02/1963 52H Tyne Dock
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43126 on 05/12/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 20/06/1953 52C 5w/e 23/07/1955 52B Heaton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43128 on 31/10/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 4w/e 20/06/1953 52C 5w/e 18/06/1955 51H Kirkby Stephen
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67315 on 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon 4w/e 20/06/1953 52C 5w/e 24/04/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63363 on 26/11/1950 50C Selby on 27/09/1953 52C on 02/12/1962 52H Tyne Dock
Steam K1 2-6-0 62006 on 15/06/1949 DAR Darlington (New) on 31/01/1954 52C on 06/05/1962 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67320 4w/e 30/06/1950 52A Gateshead 5w/e 24/04/1954 52C 5w/e 18/12/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67329 4w/e 30/06/1950 52A Gateshead 5w/e 24/04/1954 52C 5w/e 19/01/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam D20 4-4-0 62349 4w/e 24/10/1953 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 22/05/1954 52C 5w/e 23/07/1955 50C Selby
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67270 5w/e 21/03/1953 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 22/05/1954 52C 4w/e 21/04/1956 54A Sunderland
Steam J21 0-6-0 65088 on 01/01/1948 DAR Darlington 4w/e 23/10/1954 52C on 21/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 65103 on 01/01/1948 KBY Kirkby Stephen 4w/e 23/10/1954 52C on 05/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67639 4w/e 20/06/1953 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 23/10/1954 52C 5w/e 20/04/1957 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67259 5w/e 24/04/1954 52A Gateshead 5w/e 18/12/1954 52C 5w/e 17/12/1955 54A Sunderland
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67687 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead 5w/e 18/12/1954 52C 5w/e 20/04/1957 52A Gateshead
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67682 4w/e 21/10/1950 52A Gateshead 5w/e 22/01/1955 52C w/e 31/01/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67265 4w/e 23/10/1954 52A Gateshead 4w/e 19/03/1955 52C 5w/e 19/01/1957 54A Sunderland
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67320 5w/e 18/12/1954 52A Gateshead 4w/e 19/03/1955 52C 5w/e 22/10/1955 52F Blyth (North)
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67341 on 01/01/1948 SBH Blyth (South) 4w/e 14/05/1955 52C 5w/e 22/10/1955 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77011 on 08/08/1954 51F West Auckland on 29/05/1955 52C on 17/12/1955 52c Alston
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76049 on 01/04/1955 52A Gateshead (New) 5w/e 18/06/1955 52C 5w/e 21/01/1956 52A Gateshead
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76046 m/e 03/1955 52A Gateshead (New) 5w/e 23/07/1955 52C 3w/e 16/06/1956 51F West Auckland
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76045 m/e 03/1955 52A Gateshead (New) 5w/e 22/10/1955 52C 5w/e 21/01/1956 52A Gateshead
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76047 m/e 03/1955 52A Gateshead (New) 5w/e 22/10/1955 52C 3w/e 16/06/1956 51H Kirkby Stephen
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76048 m/e 03/1955 52A Gateshead (New) 5w/e 22/10/1955 52C 3w/e 16/06/1956 51H Kirkby Stephen
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67246 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 5w/e 22/10/1955 52C 5w/e 19/01/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67326 on 01/01/1948 SBH Blyth (South) 5w/e 22/10/1955 52C 4w/e 15/06/1957 53D Bridlington
Steam J21 0-6-0 65070 4w/e 13/12/1952 51A Darlington 3w/e 12/11/1955 52C 4w/e 14/12/1957 52D Tweedmouth
Steam J21 0-6-0 65033 4w/e 20/09/1952 52F Blyth (North) 5w/e 17/12/1955 52C 4w/e 13/09/1958 52F Blyth (North)
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67634 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead 5w/e 17/12/1955 52C on 16/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67683 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead 5w/e 17/12/1955 52C 4w/e 18/05/1957 52D Tweedmouth
Steam J21 0-6-0 65117 4w/e 13/12/1952 51A Darlington 5w/e 24/03/1956 52C 4w/e 14/12/1957 52B Heaton
Steam B16 4-6-0 61469 on 25/09/1955 52B Heaton on 13/05/1956 52C on 08/07/1956 52B Heaton
Steam B16 4-6-0 61414 on 25/09/1955 52B Heaton on 13/05/1956 52C on 10/06/1956 50B Neville Hill
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77014 3w/e 08/10/1955 50G Whitby w/e 16/06/1956 52C on 27/09/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43056 5w/e 18/06/1955 51F West Auckland 3w/e 16/06/1956 52C 4w/e 20/10/1956 52B Heaton
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43057 5w/e 18/06/1955 51F West Auckland 3w/e 16/06/1956 52C 4w/e 17/11/1956 52D Tweedmouth
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43071 5w/e 18/06/1955 51F West Auckland 3w/e 16/06/1956 52C 4w/e 17/11/1956 52D Tweedmouth
Steam Q7 0-8-0 63461 on 02/03/1927 TDK Tyne Dock on 17/06/1956 52C on 16/06/1957 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Q7 0-8-0 63462 m/e 10/1919 TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 17/06/1956 52C on 08/03/1959 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q7 0-8-0 63464 on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock on 17/06/1956 52C on 25/01/1959 52G Sunderland
Steam Q7 0-8-0 63468 on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock on 17/06/1956 52C on 16/06/1957 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Q7 0-8-0 63470 on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock on 17/06/1956 52C on 08/06/1958 54B Tyne Dock
Steam Q7 0-8-0 63471 on 28/03/1943 TDK Tyne Dock on 17/06/1956 52C on 08/03/1959 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q7 0-8-0 63472 on 14/10/1929 TDK Tyne Dock on 17/06/1956 52C on 08/03/1959 52H Tyne Dock
Steam J21 0-6-0 65039 5w/e 17/01/1953 52B Heaton 4w/e 20/10/1956 52C 5w/e 19/01/1957 54B Tyne Dock
Steam J39 0-6-0 64815 on 13/04/1947 Twd Alnmouth on 11/11/1956 52C on 09/10/1960 51C West Hartlepool
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67673 4w/e 20/10/1951 52B Heaton 4w/e 17/11/1956 52C 5w/e 20/04/1957 52A Gateshead
Steam J25 0-6-0 65687 3w/e 16/06/1956 52B Heaton 5w/e 19/01/1957 52C 4w/e 14/12/1957 52A Gateshead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61019 on 17/01/1954 52A Gateshead on 10/02/1957 52C on 01/11/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61100 on 26/11/1946 GHD Gateshead (New) on 10/02/1957 52C on 01/11/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61238 on 26/09/1947 GHD Gateshead (New) on 10/02/1957 52C on 14/06/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam J25 0-6-0 65675 3w/e 16/06/1956 52B Heaton 4w/e 16/02/1957 52C w/e 20/12/1958 52A Gateshead
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63399 on 01/07/1956 52F Blyth (North) on 30/06/1957 52C on 08/11/1959 51L Thornaby
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69001 5w/e 23/07/1955 52B Heaton 5w/e 20/07/1957 52C w/e 28/02/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 64849 on 30/06/1957 52B Heaton on 10/11/1957 52C on 09/10/1960 51C West Hartlepool
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63378 on 16/06/1957 54B Tyne Dock on 14/09/1958 52C on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3673 on 21/05/1958 52E Percy Main (New) w/e 13/12/1958 52C w/e 19/09/1959 52B Heaton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3674 on 28/05/1958 52E Percy Main (New) w/e 13/12/1958 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3678 on 11/08/1958 52E Percy Main (New) w/e 13/12/1958 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2049       on 24/12/1958 (New) 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Steam J21 0-6-0 65033 4w/e 13/09/1958 52F Blyth (North) w/e 10/01/1959 52C w/e 07/05/1960 52F Blyth (North)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2050       on 17/01/1959 (New) 52C w/e 19/09/1959 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63453 on 20/07/1958 54C Borough Gardens on 25/01/1959 52C on 24/02/1963 52H Tyne Dock
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68732 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton w/e 28/02/1959 52C w/e 31/10/1959 52B Heaton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63352 on 05/10/1947 TDK Tyne Dock on 08/03/1959 52C on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63362 on 13/06/1954 54B Tyne Dock on 08/03/1959 52C on 16/06/1963 52F Blyth (North)
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 68014 on 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon w/e 02/05/1959 52C w/e 09/09/1961 51A Darlington
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63366 on 15/02/1948 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 02/12/1962 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63377 on 29/11/1947 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 20/08/1961 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63384 on 15/02/1948 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 19/03/1961 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63386 on 15/02/1948 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 23/09/1962 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63400 on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 17/02/1963 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63402 on 13/04/1947 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 24/02/1963 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63431 on 27/01/1952 54C Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 24/02/1963 52H Tyne Dock
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63434 on 28/03/1943 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 24/02/1963 52F Blyth (North)
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63444 on 17/12/1950 54C Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 24/02/1963 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63456 on 27/01/1952 54C Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 27/09/1959 52K Consett
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63458 on 16/03/1948 BOR Borough Gardens on 14/06/1959 52C on 17/02/1963 52G Sunderland
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2048 on 23/12/1958 52A Gateshead (New) w/e 19/09/1959 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Steam K1 2-6-0 62050 on 10/06/1956 50A York (North) on 01/11/1959 52C on 06/05/1962 52K Consett
Steam K1 2-6-0 62060 on 14/06/1959 50A York (North) on 01/11/1959 52C on 06/05/1962 52K Consett
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63368 on 01/06/1958 51L Thornaby on 08/11/1959 52C on 20/08/1961 52K Consett
Steam J25 0-6-0 65663 w/e 15/08/1959 52F Blyth (North) w/e 07/05/1960 52C w/e 21/01/1961 52B Heaton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61025 on 31/10/1948 TWD Tweedmouth on 12/06/1960 52C on 04/11/1962 52d Alnmouth
Steam B1 4-6-0 61199 on 25/09/1955 52D Tweedmouth on 12/06/1960 52C on 16/06/1963 52H Tyne Dock
Steam B1 4-6-0 61241 on 12/03/1950 52D Tweedmouth on 12/06/1960 52C on 09/09/1962 52B Heaton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61322 on 12/03/1950 52D Tweedmouth on 12/06/1960 52C on 09/09/1962 52B Heaton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61019 on 01/11/1959 52A Gateshead on 11/09/1960 52C on 04/11/1962 52d Alnmouth
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63387 on 01/11/1959 52K Consett on 11/09/1960 52C on 24/02/1963 52G Sunderland
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63437 on 13/12/1959 52K Consett on 11/09/1960 52C on 16/06/1963 52G Sunderland
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2093 on 28/05/1960 52E Percy Main (New) w/e 17/09/1960 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2105 w/e 15/10/1960 52E Percy Main w/e 26/11/1960 52C w/e 10/12/1960 52B Heaton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2106 w/e 22/10/1960 52E Percy Main w/e 26/11/1960 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2165 w/e 05/11/1960 52E Percy Main w/e 26/11/1960 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Steam B1 4-6-0 61035 on 05/04/1948 NEV Neville Hill on 15/01/1961 52C on 10/02/1963 52B Heaton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61216 on 23/05/1948 NEV Neville Hill on 15/01/1961 52C on 09/09/1962 52B Heaton
Steam Q6 0-8-0 63429 on 13/09/1959 52H Tyne Dock on 19/03/1961 52C on 24/02/1963 52F Blyth (North)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2055 w/e 25/03/1961 52E Percy Main w/e 08/04/1961 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2321 on 22/03/1961 52E Percy Main (New) w/e 08/04/1961 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2335       on 27/07/1961 (New) 52C w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main
Steam B1 4-6-0 61038 on 30/04/1961 52G Sunderland on 17/06/1962 52C on 09/09/1962 52B Heaton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61237 on 30/04/1961 52G Sunderland on 17/06/1962 52C on 16/06/1963 52H Tyne Dock
Steam B1 4-6-0 61038 on 09/09/1962 52B Heaton on 04/11/1962 52C on 24/02/1963 52B Heaton