Depot: Bletchley
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Bletchley | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2956 | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 23/02/1935 | 2B | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9260 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 2B | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 25187 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2B | m/e | 03/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6930 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2B | ||||||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6699 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2B | m/e | 11/1945 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 25706 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2B | m/e | 12/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 25330 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2B | m/e | 09/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 25393 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 2B | m/e | 05/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 5225 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 2B | m/e | 11/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8367 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 2B | m/e | 11/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9425 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 2B | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2957 | w/e | 26/04/1947 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 13/12/1947 | 2B | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2949 | w/e | 24/01/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/12/1947 | 2B | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3841 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | on | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4072 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4447 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 12E | Moor Row | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7288 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7298 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7452 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6909 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1C | Watford | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | on | 27/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6912 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 08/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9005 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 1E | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9007 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9037 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8902 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9391 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8913 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8894 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8925 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 17/09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9076 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8931 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8935 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9100 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9359 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9372 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8951 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 31/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8952 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9371 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9154 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9093 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9117 | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | on | 01/01/1948 (R) | 2B | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 1A | Willesden | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9127 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9401 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2A | Rugby | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9406 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9416 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9427 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9443 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9173 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9179 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2F | Coventry | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9193 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9201 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2F | Coventry | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9208 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9213 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | on | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9300 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9307 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9332 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 2E | Warwick | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6604 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2442 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2458 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2566 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2591 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2600 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4968 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5025 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5130 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5314 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5316 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5331 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 25722 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 25827 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46883 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2B | on | 22/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3002 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3003 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3005 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2B | on | 27/10/1950 | 31A | Cambridge | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3001 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 2B | on | 27/10/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3000 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) |
Steam | Improved Precedent | 2-4-0 | 5057 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 2B | ||||||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6900 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2B | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46917 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2B | w/e | 30/04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9144 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9292 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2B | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9122 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2B | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9121 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2B | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2B | m/e | 01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9217 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2B | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9289 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2B | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9290 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2B | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 7692 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 2B | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42610 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 2B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42659 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46601 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42303 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2348 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9061 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49356 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2B | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49351 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2B | w/e | 12/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9405 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2B | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9417 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2B | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 2D | Coventry |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9420 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2B | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9422 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2B | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4D | Abergavenny |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9450 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9155 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58912 | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2B | on | 16/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44874 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 2B | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44875 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 2B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45404 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 2B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49287 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 2B | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41222 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2B | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42669 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49453 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2B | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48953 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49014 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2B | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58926 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9070 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 2B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49082 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48964 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 2B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9049 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48964 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9070 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2B | on | 23/10/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9049 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42666 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49453 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48526 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48927 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 2B | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9385 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 2B | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49181 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 2B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48016 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2A | Rugby | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1H | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48020 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48036 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49181 | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 2B | Bletchley | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | w/e | 04/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40438 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69304 | on | 01/01/1948 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | w/e | 12/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9304 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 9G | Northwich |
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | 10800 | on | 01/07/1950 (New) | 4A | m/e | 12/1950 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58897 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 4A | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49018 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 4A | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48207 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48207 | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 4A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48373 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48688 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48535 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48549 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48550 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48693 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58911 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45353 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41275 | m/e | 10/1950 (New) | 4A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48373 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48535 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48549 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48550 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 1H | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48688 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 1H | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48693 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58911 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48964 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45353 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58887 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58887 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4A | w/e | 09/04/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44712 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42378 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4A | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48754 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42582 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42582 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42667 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48953 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 4A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49088 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 4A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48754 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 12B | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48953 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49082 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42584 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42584 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6683 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2E | Warwick | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 2C | Warwick |
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | 10800 | m/e | 12/1950 | 1A | Willesden | m/e | 06/1951 | 4A | on | 09/08/1952 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48544 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48544 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4A | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9385 | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44364 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44364 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9385 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 4A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44593 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49144 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 4A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44593 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 4A | w/e | 10/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48898 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49310 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44869 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48898 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 4A | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49310 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 4A | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44869 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42061 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42062 | on | 15/12/1950 | 5D | Stoke (New) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45135 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58932 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44771 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 1E | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 41E | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45070 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 1E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45071 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 1E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45070 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 1E | Bletchley | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45071 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 1E | Bletchley | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1E | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80039 | on | 18/06/1952 (New) | 1E | on | 02/01/1954 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80040 | on | 27/06/1952 (New) | 1E | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80041 | on | 05/07/1952 (New) | 1E | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80042 | on | 15/07/1952 (New) | 1E | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80043 | on | 24/07/1952 (New) | 1E | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73H | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42061 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 1E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41275 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | m/e | 07/1953 (New) | 1E | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46601 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2A | Rugby | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48426 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48441 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2C | Northampton | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48534 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2C | Northampton | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41275 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 1E | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42580 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 1E | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44072 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 1E | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42178 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 1E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47500 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1E | w/e | 26/09/1959 | Wolverton Works | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80081 | on | 31/03/1954 (New) | 1E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80082 | on | 15/04/1954 (New) | 1E | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80083 | on | 03/05/1954 (New) | 1E | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80084 | on | 14/05/1954 (New) | 1E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80085 | on | 28/05/1954 (New) | 1E | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13051 | on | 19/06/1954 | 5B | Crewe South (New) | m/e | 14/08/1954 | 1E | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13052 | on | 19/06/1954 | 5B | Crewe South (New) | m/e | 14/08/1954 | 1E | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42541 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42597 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42669 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80039 | on | 02/01/1954 | 9A | Longsight | on | 26/02/1955 | 1E | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73F | Ashford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80083 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80085 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45004 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45020 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45195 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45307 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45331 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45388 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45393 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42669 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48446 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 1E | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 58854 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42487 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 1E | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12050 | w/e | 20/11/1954 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 13/08/1955 | 1E | w/e | 14/01/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12053 | w/e | 11/12/1954 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 13/08/1955 | 1E | w/e | 14/01/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49005 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 1E | w/e | 10/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48535 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 1E | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49330 | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 2D | Coventry | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 1E | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 41902 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 1E | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 2C | Warwick |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84002 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1E | on | 17/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84004 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1E | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 89D | Oswestry |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49094 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1E | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75030 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 1E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49061 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 1E | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 1E | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49330 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 1E | on | 07/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41275 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 1E | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45307 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 1E | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49093 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 1E | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45195 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 1E | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48610 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44370 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1E | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44397 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 1E | w/e | 31/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49450 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 1E | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49403 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 1E | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45089 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45184 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26F | Patricroft | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44364 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 1E | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44364 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 1E | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42467 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 1E | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48074 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1E | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48764 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47348 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1E | w/e | 30/04/1960 | Wolverton Works | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44117 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 1E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42105 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42106 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42066 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42067 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42069 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42071 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75E | Three Bridges | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44308 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 1E | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47500 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1E | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48646 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49130 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | w/e | 03/06/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49439 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45222 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45292 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12073 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 1E | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12074 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 1E | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45292 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1E | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42351 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 1E | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42586 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 1E | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45020 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 1E | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49078 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 1E | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41289 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 1E | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44780 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 1E | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45037 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 1E | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45379 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 1E | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48657 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 1E | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48203 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1E | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48427 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48656 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48668 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1E | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48529 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 1E | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48534 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45020 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 1E | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48408 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42454 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1E | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42479 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1E | on | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42615 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1E | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45147 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 1E | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49246 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 1E | w/e | 13/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48529 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 1E | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49078 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 1E | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49106 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 1E | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75039 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 1E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75013 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75014 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75028 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75053 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75054 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48360 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 1E | w/e | 03/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75051 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48626 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48729 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1E | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48755 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1E | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 1F | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42221 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 33C | Shoeburyness | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1E | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45222 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 1E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48154 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1E | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42227 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 1E | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48085 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 1E | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41289 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | w/e | 22/12/1962 (R) | 1E | w/e | 19/01/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48077 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45064 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 1E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45299 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 1E | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47341 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 1E | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47606 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 1E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47307 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75055 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1E | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75056 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1E | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3796 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 1E | on | 15/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48366 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 1E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48368 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 1E | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48493 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48554 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 1E | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45434 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73004 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73013 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73014 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73033 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73038 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73039 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73040 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73048 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73067 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73070 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73160 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 1E | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75055 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 1E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43017 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43122 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4111 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 1E | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 1G | Woodford Halse |
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | D2510 | on | 28/08/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 1E | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44837 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44863 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44870 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44909 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44915 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44938 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43073 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48757 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1E | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45027 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1E | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10A | Carnforth |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3069 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1E | w/e | 04/03/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D320 | on | 22/03/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D323 | on | 19/05/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D331 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D334 | on | 08/03/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D337 | on | 24/03/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5002 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5003 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5005 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5010 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5011 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1E | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D01 | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D309 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D312 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D315 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D318 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D322 | on | 21/04/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D324 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D329 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D339 | on | 11/04/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D340 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D343 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D344 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D384 | on | 19/03/1962 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5000 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3795 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 1E | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5018 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1B | Camden | on | 01/01/1966 | 1E | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5007 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5009 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5016 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5019 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5025 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5032 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5040 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D05 | Stoke Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5140 | on | 05/11/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5028 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5030 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5033 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5034 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | D2510 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 1E | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5133 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 1E | on | 18/04/1966 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3976 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 1E | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3852 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 1E | w/e | 22/06/1968 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3023 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 1E | w/e | 22/12/1973 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3024 | w/e | 29/07/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 1E | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2301 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | on | 21/09/1968 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2383 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | w/e | 27/07/1968 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2385 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | w/e | 27/07/1968 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3228 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | on | 24/12/1985 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3054 | m/e | 14/08/1954 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 27/07/1968 | 1E | w/e | 04/12/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3053 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | on | 01/06/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3055 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | w/e | 03/08/1974 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3066 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | w/e | 18/05/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3797 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3859 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | w/e | 11/01/1975 | LR | Leicester Midland |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12045 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | on | 25/01/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12046 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | on | 25/01/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12049 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12088 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | w/e | 29/11/1969 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12090 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | on | 17/07/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12099 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | on | 17/07/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3795 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/05/1969 | 1E | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3015 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 1E | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3850 | w/e | 18/11/1967 | 14B | Cricklewood West | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 1E | w/e | 16/09/1972 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3110 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 1E | on | 23/03/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3018 | w/e | 22/05/1971 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 17/07/1971 | 1E | on | 13/12/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3188 | w/e | 13/03/1971 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 21/08/1971 | 1E | m/e | 12/1977 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3107 | w/e | 14/11/1970 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/11/1971 | 1E | w/e | 22/01/1972 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3699 | w/e | 02/07/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 1E | w/e | 26/05/1973 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3179 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 1E | w/e | 27/07/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4139 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 20/05/1972 | 1E | w/e | 11/05/1974 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4098 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 01/07/1972 | 1E | w/e | 15/09/1973 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3572 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 14B | Cricklewood West | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 1E | m/e | 02/1978 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3107 | w/e | 22/01/1972 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 1E | on | 02/11/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3067 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 16/06/1973 | BY | w/e | 04/08/1973 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3936 | w/e | 13/06/1970 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/10/1973 | BY | w/e | 13/07/1974 | CW | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3833 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/11/1973 | BY | on | 16/01/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3291 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 12/01/1974 | BY | on | 01/03/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08627 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 12/01/1974 | BY | w/e | 26/01/1974 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3699 | w/e | 26/05/1973 | WN | Willesden | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BY | w/e | 13/07/1974 | CW | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08684 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | CW | Cricklewood East | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BY | on | 07/12/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08702 | w/e | 04/08/1973 | CD | Cricklewood East | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BY | on | 28/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08667 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | WN | Willesden | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BY | on | 11/11/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08403 | w/e | 26/06/1971 | 14A | Cricklewood East | m/e | 11/1976 | BY | on | 18/10/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08806 | m/e | 10/1976 | WN | Willesden | m/e | 04/1977 | BY | on | 31/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08235 | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | WN | Willesden | m/e | 11/1981 | BY | on | 10/07/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08458 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East | m/e | 11/1981 | BY | on | 16/08/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08704 | w/e | 25/05/1974 | LR | Leicester Midland | m/e | 11/1981 | BY | on | 22/11/1981 | Withdrawn |