Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1015 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24646 Week
» 89600 Month
» 292264 Year
» 3319117 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Balloch
Type |
Class |
Wheels |
Number |
|
Date to Previous Shed |
Code |
Previous Shed |
|
Date to Balloch |
Code |
|
Date to Next Shed |
Code |
Next Shed |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3533 |
|
|
|
|
on |
10/07/1958 (New) |
65I |
4w/e |
27/09/1958 |
65E |
Kipps |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3534 |
|
|
|
|
on |
11/07/1958 (New) |
65I |
4w/e |
13/04/1963 |
67C |
Ayr |