Depot: Accrington
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Accrington | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10442 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 24A | m/e | 08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2546 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24A | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2205 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24A | on | 01/01/1948 | 27A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1198 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24A | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8416 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8479 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8705 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8722 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12524 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26C | Bolton | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11361 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4460 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4479 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12216 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12238 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12288 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12412 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12441 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 17B | Burton | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12452 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 12821 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 12822 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 12825 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 12831 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2433 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2490 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2548 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2634 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2295 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 676 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 682 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 683 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1100 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1101 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1102 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1185 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1187 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 23A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1194 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1198 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24A | Accrington | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5101 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5367 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8463 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 24A | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 681 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 24A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4038 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4221 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4486 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42153 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 24A | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51410 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 24A | w/e | 03/04/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12445 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 24A | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 24A | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8461 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 24A | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48769 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 24A | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48706 | 2w/e | 13/12/1947 | 91E | To Eastern Region | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 24A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4460 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 24A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8526 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 24A | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48527 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 24A | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8528 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 24A | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8448 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8491 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 680 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90333 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 24A | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90335 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 24A | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90402 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 24A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90632 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 24A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 677 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 24A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 684 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 24A | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42716 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42717 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42718 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8448 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 24A | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8491 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 24A | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42716 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42717 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42718 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42437 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 24A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42661 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 24A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42869 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90171 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 24A | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90206 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90416 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90713 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42843 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 24A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90206 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90416 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24A | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90713 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42643 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 24A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42843 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42643 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42796 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42729 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45335 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42729 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45335 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51390 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42731 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51390 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44921 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24A | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 65A | Eastfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48453 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48710 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48765 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48453 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48710 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48765 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48711 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48762 | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48767 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48711 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48762 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48767 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42551 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90555 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90278 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90306 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 64A | St Margarets | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90555 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90278 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90306 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42551 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45205 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45206 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45209 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45205 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45206 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45209 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 24A | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45226 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90267 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42716 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42717 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42718 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 24A | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44947 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45061 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42294 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90348 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90610 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90399 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45200 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27C | Southport | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90112 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42796 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40586 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40690 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42706 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42733 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42821 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42828 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42843 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24F | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52300 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24A | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44889 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42718 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24F | Fleetwood | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45226 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 24A | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75049 | m/e | 10/1953 (New) | 24A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45209 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75040 | m/e | 08/1953 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75041 | m/e | 08/1953 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75042 | m/e | 09/1953 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75043 | m/e | 09/1953 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75044 | m/e | 09/1953 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41085 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40937 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24A | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24A | w/e | 06/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51474 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 24A | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45078 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 27C | Southport | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51497 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42619 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42620 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42110 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44889 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41188 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 24A | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44689 | on | 30/09/1950 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44692 | on | 31/10/1950 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45068 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45227 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45415 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90266 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 24A | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90374 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 24A | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 24A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44689 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51474 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 24A | w/e | 08/06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51371 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24A | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47562 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 20F | Skipton | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47201 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42480 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 24A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42548 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 24A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40192 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 24A | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43880 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 24A | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43976 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 24A | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90374 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42662 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24A | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47571 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 24A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove |