Depot: Boston
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Boston | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | 3404 | m/e | 05/1902 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 02/07/1928 | BOS | on | 30/08/1928 | NWE | New England |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6635 | on | 25/09/1928 | NWE | New England | on | 02/07/1929 | BOS | on | 21/08/1929 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4654 | on | 25/09/1930 | NWE | New England | on | 24/06/1933 | BOS | on | 31/08/1933 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4666 | on | 09/09/1931 | DON | Doncaster | on | 24/06/1933 | BOS | on | 25/08/1933 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4670 | on | 10/09/1931 | DON | Doncaster | on | 28/06/1933 | BOS | on | 31/08/1933 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4658 | on | 21/02/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 08/07/1934 | BOS | on | 23/08/1934 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4666 | on | 25/08/1933 | DON | Doncaster | on | 03/07/1935 | BOS | on | 09/09/1935 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4660 | on | 01/01/1935 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/07/1935 | BOS | on | 10/09/1935 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4510 | m/e | 11/1935 | BOS | m/e | 01/1936 | NWE | New England | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 7328 | m/e | 12/1935 | BOS | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 7385 | m/e | 12/1935 | BOS | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 7350 | m/e | 01/1936 | BOS | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4630 | on | 09/11/1932 | NWE | New England | on | 07/03/1936 | BOS | on | 16/05/1938 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4639 | on | 27/12/1935 | NWE | New England | on | 10/03/1936 | BOS | on | 29/09/1938 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4659 | on | 02/11/1933 | CLK | Colwick | on | 18/06/1936 | BOS | on | 22/09/1936 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4651 | on | 12/08/1930 | CLK | Colwick | on | 28/07/1936 | BOS | on | 01/09/1936 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2987 | on | 14/05/1938 | NWE | New England | on | 17/05/1938 | BOS | on | 03/08/1939 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2693 | on | 22/09/1938 | NWE | New England | on | 28/09/1938 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2695 | on | 23/09/1938 | NWE | New England | on | 06/10/1938 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4672 | on | 06/08/1932 | NWE | New England | on | 26/06/1939 | BOS | on | 30/09/1939 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4681 | on | 19/03/1934 | NWE | New England | on | 03/08/1939 | BOS | on | 14/05/1940 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4657 | on | 31/10/1933 | NWE | New England | on | 14/06/1940 | BOS | on | 14/07/1940 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4681 | on | 14/05/1940 | NWE | New England | on | 15/06/1940 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4654 | on | 31/08/1933 | NWE | New England | on | 21/06/1940 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4635 | on | 29/07/1925 | NWE | New England | on | 17/07/1940 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | NWE | New England |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3093 | on | 05/06/1941 | GRA | Grantham (New) | on | 26/07/1941 | BOS | on | 08/10/1941 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3094 | on | 22/07/1941 | NWE | New England | on | 26/07/1941 | BOS | on | 08/10/1941 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3095 | on | 03/07/1941 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 30/07/1941 | BOS | on | 08/10/1941 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4649 | on | 29/02/1940 | NWE | New England | on | 06/10/1941 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4659 | on | 22/09/1936 | NWE | New England | on | 08/10/1941 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4665 | on | 07/12/1937 | NWE | New England | on | 08/10/1941 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4630 | on | 16/05/1938 | NWE | New England | on | 17/06/1943 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1996 | on | 29/04/1942 | GRA | Grantham | on | 18/03/1944 | BOS | on | 16/04/1945 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1736 | on | 29/02/1940 | DON | Doncaster | on | 07/04/1946 | BOS | on | 16/06/1946 | NWE | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4668 | on | 04/04/1942 | DON | Doncaster | on | 07/04/1946 | BOS | on | 16/06/1946 | NWE | New England |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 3294 | on | 08/06/1924 | NWE | New England | on | 09/06/1946 | BOS | on | 05/01/1947 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1762 | on | 03/07/1943 | NWE | New England | on | 09/06/1946 | BOS | on | 22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1744 | on | 16/04/1945 | NWE | New England | on | 16/06/1946 | BOS | on | 07/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4670 | on | 03/07/1943 | NWE | New England | on | 16/06/1946 | BOS | on | 10/07/1955 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4641 | on | 04/08/1930 | CLK | Colwick | on | 02/07/1946 | BOS | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4665 | on | 16/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 02/07/1946 | BOS | on | 11/02/1951 | 65A | Eastfield |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4635 | on | 16/04/1945 | NWE | New England | on | 04/08/1946 | BOS | on | 26/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2900 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 09/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2901 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 28/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2919 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | w/e | 02/10/1948 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2920 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 03/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2921 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 05/04/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2922 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 23/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2923 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 04/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2924 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 30/01/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2925 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 14/04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 7387 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | w/e | 19/11/1949 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 2154 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 25/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 2179 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 2180 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | m/e | 05/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 2181 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 25/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5016 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | w/e | 19/10/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5017 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | m/e | 01/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5020 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 12/07/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4180 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 34E | New England | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4181 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 35A | New England | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4190 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 14/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4196 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 34B | Hornsey | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4198 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 35A | New England | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4201 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 03/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4204 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 23/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4210 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 35A | New England | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4229 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 09/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4242 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 34B | Hornsey | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4244 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 21/05/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4247 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | on | 09/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4248 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4276 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8528 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 40A | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8543 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 30A | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8560 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40A | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8581 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 40A | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 8655 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 30A | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 8657 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 30A | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 8658 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 30A | Stratford | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 8659 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 30A | Stratford | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8166 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8171 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 40F | Boston | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8162 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | w/e | 14/02/1948 | BOS | w/e | 10/04/1948 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2909 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIN | Lincoln | w/e | 06/03/1948 | BOS | w/e | 02/10/1948 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8179 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | w/e | 12/06/1948 | BOS | w/e | 21/08/1948 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67377 | on | 01/01/1948 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 26/06/1948 | BOS | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 7383 | on | 01/01/1948 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | w/e | 26/06/1948 | BOS | w/e | 05/03/1949 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2902 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | w/e | 02/10/1948 | BOS | on | 01/04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | 2915 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIN | Lincoln | w/e | 02/10/1948 | BOS | on | 08/06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69694 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | LIN | Lincoln | w/e | 06/11/1948 | BOS | w/e | 18/12/1948 | HAT | Hatfield |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69815 | on | 20/09/1927 | NEA | Neasden | on | 06/01/1949 | BOS | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69818 | on | 17/04/1938 | NEA | Neasden | on | 07/01/1949 | BOS | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69815 | on | 06/01/1949 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BOS | on | 16/01/1949 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69818 | on | 07/01/1949 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BOS | on | 16/01/1949 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 9817 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | GRA | Grantham | on | 23/01/1949 | BOS | w/e | 29/01/1949 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 9817 | on | 23/01/1949 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 29/01/1949 | BOS | on | 11/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69809 | on | 09/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden | on | 30/01/1949 | BOS | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69810 | on | 30/12/1939 | NEA | Neasden | on | 30/01/1949 | BOS | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69824 | on | 16/06/1927 | NEA | Neasden | on | 30/01/1949 | BOS | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69809 | on | 30/01/1949 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BOS | on | 11/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69810 | on | 30/01/1949 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BOS | on | 11/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69824 | on | 30/01/1949 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BOS | on | 13/02/1949 | LIN | Lincoln |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68179 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | IMM | Immingham | w/e | 05/02/1949 | BOS | w/e | 02/04/1949 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 67350 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIN | Lincoln | w/e | 06/08/1949 | BOS | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 35A | New England |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69712 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BOS | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69716 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BOS | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69727 | on | 01/01/1948 | STR | Stratford | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BOS | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61750 | on | 10/09/1935 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/01/1950 | BOS | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61756 | on | 18/08/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/01/1950 | BOS | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61770 | on | 07/09/1936 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/01/1950 | BOS | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BOS | Boston |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61750 | on | 08/01/1950 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BOS | on | 22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61756 | on | 08/01/1950 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BOS | on | 01/03/1959 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61770 | on | 08/01/1950 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BOS | on | 14/01/1951 | 65A | Eastfield |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68171 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOS | Boston | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 40F | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 9674 | m/e | 07/1949 | LIN | Lincoln | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 40F | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68171 | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 40F | Boston | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 40F | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69256 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 40F | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69261 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 40F | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69280 | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 40F | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69256 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 40F | Boston | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 40F | on | 19/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69261 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 40F | Boston | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 40F | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69280 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 40F | Boston | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 40F | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 40C | Louth |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69808 | on | 26/03/1950 | 40B | Immingham | on | 06/08/1950 | 40F | on | 19/02/1956 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69811 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 51K | Saltburn | w/e | 06/08/1950 | 40F | on | 19/08/1951 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69819 | on | 26/03/1950 | 40B | Immingham | on | 06/08/1950 | 40F | on | 16/12/1956 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69824 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | GRA | Grantham | on | 15/10/1950 | 40F | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69824 | on | 15/10/1950 | 40F | Boston | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 40F | on | 27/05/1951 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69803 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | GRA | Grantham | on | 29/10/1950 | 40F | on | 28/08/1955 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 9816 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 29/10/1950 | 40F | on | 11/03/1956 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | 62132 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | LTH | Louth | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 40F | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | 62132 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 40F | Boston | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 40F | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61736 | on | 16/06/1946 | NWE | New England | on | 07/01/1951 | 40F | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61739 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | NWE | New England | on | 07/01/1951 | 40F | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61736 | on | 07/01/1951 | 40F | Boston | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40F | on | 20/05/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61739 | on | 07/01/1951 | 40F | Boston | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40F | on | 20/05/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68171 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 40F | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64214 | on | 01/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 40F | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64272 | on | 01/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 40F | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64277 | on | 01/01/1948 | ARD | Ardsley | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 40F | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64214 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 40F | Boston | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 40F | on | 19/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64272 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 40F | Boston | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 40F | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64277 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 40F | Boston | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 40F | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68171 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 40F | on | 12/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69821 | on | 04/02/1951 | 40E | Langwith Junction | on | 10/02/1952 | 40F | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69821 | on | 10/02/1952 | 40F | Boston | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40F | on | 20/04/1952 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64250 | on | 01/01/1948 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 40F | on | 08/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64260 | on | 01/01/1948 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 40F | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61757 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 31B | March | on | 29/06/1952 | 40F | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61766 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | SL | South Lynn | on | 29/06/1952 | 40F | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40F | Boston |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61757 | on | 29/06/1952 | 40F | Boston | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40F | on | 24/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61766 | on | 29/06/1952 | 40F | Boston | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40F | on | 25/01/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61728 | on | 27/04/1947 | IMM | Immingham | on | 15/03/1953 | 40F | on | 10/07/1955 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61745 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 15/03/1953 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62667 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 40B | Immingham | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 40F | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61766 | on | 25/01/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | on | 25/03/1953 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68499 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 40A | Lincoln | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 40F | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68501 | on | 01/01/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 40F | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68557 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 32B | Ipswich | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 40F | on | 20/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68570 | on | 15/12/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 40F | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68602 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 40F | on | 28/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61767 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 27/06/1954 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61742 | on | 10/10/1954 | 40B | Immingham | on | 07/11/1954 | 40F | on | 08/01/1961 | 34E | New England |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61743 | on | 13/09/1953 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 13/02/1955 | 40F | on | 22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61761 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 13/02/1955 | 40F | on | 10/07/1955 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61778 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 13/03/1955 | 40F | on | 24/04/1955 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69804 | on | 20/02/1955 | 40B | Immingham | on | 24/04/1955 | 40F | on | 15/05/1955 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61720 | on | 27/04/1947 | IMM | Immingham | on | 10/07/1955 | 40F | on | 12/06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61748 | on | 13/09/1953 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 10/07/1955 | 40F | on | 22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61765 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 10/07/1955 | 40F | on | 01/05/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61943 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 40F | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69369 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 40F | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69808 | on | 19/02/1956 | 40B | Immingham | on | 26/02/1956 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69812 | on | 13/02/1955 | 40B | Immingham | on | 11/03/1956 | 40F | on | 29/07/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69269 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 40B | Immingham | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 40F | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69284 | on | 01/01/1948 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 40F | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11178 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 40A | Lincoln | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68569 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 40A | Lincoln | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 40F | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln |
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11179 | on | 29/09/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61746 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 29/12/1957 | 40F | on | 27/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61759 | on | 17/06/1956 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 29/12/1957 | 40F | on | 05/04/1959 | 34E | New England |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11160 | on | 15/06/1956 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11186 | on | 04/03/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43059 | on | 11/10/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43061 | on | 27/10/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43062 | on | 03/11/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43064 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43065 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43080 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43083 | on | 11/11/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43085 | on | 21/11/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64171 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | on | 20/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64172 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | on | 07/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64191 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | on | 21/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64207 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64231 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 35A | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | on | 14/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64278 | on | 01/01/1948 | NWE | New England | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40F | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61751 | on | 17/06/1956 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 23/02/1958 | 40F | on | 22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68618 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 40A | Lincoln | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 40F | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61771 | on | 16/04/1945 | CLK | Colwick | on | 16/03/1958 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43058 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 35A | New England | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43060 | on | 20/10/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40F | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43066 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 35A | New England | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2025 | on | 26/08/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 11181 | on | 06/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 40F | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64712 | on | 09/01/1955 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64716 | on | 30/03/1947 | CLK | Colwick | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64728 | on | 16/09/1945 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 22/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64741 | on | 10/07/1955 | 38A | Colwick | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | m/e | 03/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64823 | on | 11/03/1951 | 38A | Colwick | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 08/11/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64887 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64960 | on | 15/08/1954 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 07/12/1958 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61763 | on | 23/08/1946 | CLK | Colwick | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61773 | on | 26/10/1936 | CLK | Colwick | on | 09/11/1958 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2023 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 40B | Immingham | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64755 | on | 13/06/1954 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 07/12/1958 | 40F | on | 01/03/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64729 | on | 08/01/1959 | 40E | Colwick | on | 25/01/1959 | 40F | on | 14/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2024 | on | 19/08/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43068 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 31D | South Lynn | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | on | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43091 | on | 13/12/1950 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43092 | on | 16/12/1950 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 34E | New England |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43093 | on | 20/12/1950 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43095 | on | 23/12/1950 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43104 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 31D | South Lynn | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43107 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 31D | South Lynn | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43108 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 31D | South Lynn | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43109 | on | 14/06/1951 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43110 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 31D | South Lynn | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43111 | on | 04/07/1951 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43142 | on | 22/08/1951 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43147 | on | 08/10/1951 | 32G | Melton Constable (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 34E | New England |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43154 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 40E | Colwick | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43155 | on | 28/12/1951 | 32G | Melton Constable (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43158 | on | 16/07/1952 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach (New) | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 40F | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43157 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 40F | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43159 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 40F | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68522 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 40F | on | 17/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3489 | on | 03/04/1958 | 34E | New England (New) | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68550 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 40F | on | 25/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3490 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 34C | Hatfield | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2296 | on | 29/09/1960 (New) | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43144 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 34E | New England |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43108 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 40F | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43148 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 40F | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43158 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 34E | New England |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3442 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68554 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 40A | Lincoln | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 40F | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43142 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 40F | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68018 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40F | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68070 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40F | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68077 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 34B | Hornsey | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 40F | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D4086 | on | 15/02/1962 (New) | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick | ||||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | D2403 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 40F | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2027 | on | 16/09/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2235 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 40F | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2298 | on | 11/10/1960 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 40F | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | D2407 | on | 14/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | D2403 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 40F | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40E | Colwick |