Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 55 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3510 Week
» 14803 Month
» 279436 Year
» 1501001 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Trafford Park (LNER)


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Trafford Park (LNER) Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam D5 4-4-0 694 by 1910 SHF Sheffield Neepsend by 1921 TFD by 1925 WAL  
Steam D5 4-4-0 695 by 1910 SHF Sheffield Neepsend by 1921 TFD by 1925 WAL  
Steam D5 4-4-0 696 by 1910 SHF Sheffield Neepsend by 1921 TFD by 1925 WAL  
Steam D5 4-4-0 697 by 1910 SHF Sheffield Neepsend by 1921 TFD by 1925 WAL  
Steam D5 4-4-0 698 by 1910 SHF Sheffield Neepsend by 1921 TFD by 1925 WAL  
Steam D5 4-4-0 699 by 1910 SHF Sheffield Neepsend by 1921 TFD by 1925 WAL  
Steam B9 4-6-0 6106 on 19/08/1921 GOR Gorton on 07/06/1926 TFD on 08/08/1928 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6105 on 08/10/1925 GOR Gorton on 24/11/1927 TFD on 19/03/1930 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6111 on 12/11/1926 GOR Gorton on 28/11/1927 TFD on 13/08/1929 GOR Gorton
Steam D5 4-4-0 5694 by 1925 WAL   m/e 02/1928 TFD m/e 10/1932 Withdrawn
Steam D5 4-4-0 5695 by 1925 WAL   m/e 02/1928 TFD m/e 07/1931 Withdrawn
Steam D5 4-4-0 5696 by 1925 WAL   m/e 02/1928 TFD m/e 07/1930 Withdrawn
Steam D5 4-4-0 5697 by 1925 WAL   m/e 02/1928 TFD m/e 10/1932 Withdrawn
Steam D5 4-4-0 5698 by 1925 WAL   m/e 02/1928 TFD m/e 10/1931 Withdrawn
Steam D5 4-4-0 5699 by 1925 WAL   m/e 02/1928 TFD m/e 03/1933 Withdrawn
Steam B9 4-6-0 6108 on 10/02/1927 GOR Gorton on 08/08/1928 TFD on 24/08/1928 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6106 on 08/08/1928 GOR Gorton on 27/08/1928 TFD on 04/06/1930 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6110 on 19/08/1921 GOR Gorton m/e 01/1929 TFD on 15/04/1929 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6109 on 19/08/1921 GOR Gorton on 15/04/1929 TFD on 25/10/1929 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6110 on 15/04/1929 GOR Gorton on 13/08/1929 TFD on 06/01/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6111 on 13/08/1929 GOR Gorton on 25/10/1929 TFD on 30/04/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6107 on 20/04/1925 GOR Gorton on 18/03/1930 TFD on 09/09/1930 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6105 on 19/03/1930 GOR Gorton on 04/06/1930 TFD on 30/05/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6106 on 04/06/1930 GOR Gorton on 09/09/1930 TFD on 29/08/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6108 on 24/08/1928 GOR Gorton on 24/11/1930 TFD on 11/07/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6107 on 09/09/1930 GOR Gorton on 06/01/1932 TFD on 14/07/1933 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6110 on 06/01/1932 GOR Gorton on 30/04/1932 TFD on 03/11/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6112 on 26/05/1927 GOR Gorton on 28/05/1932 TFD on 04/03/1933 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6109 on 25/10/1929 GOR Gorton on 11/07/1932 TFD on 23/03/1934 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6108 on 11/07/1932 GOR Gorton on 29/08/1932 TFD on 27/10/1932 GOR Gorton
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5344 on 01/08/1931 GOR Gorton on 18/10/1932 TFD on 27/12/1933 MEX Mexborough
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5368 on 03/10/1931 GOR Gorton on 18/10/1932 TFD on 27/12/1933 MEX Mexborough
Steam B9 4-6-0 6106 on 29/08/1932 GOR Gorton on 27/10/1932 TFD on 11/10/1933 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6108 on 27/10/1932 GOR Gorton on 03/11/1932 TFD on 02/02/1935 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6105 on 30/05/1932 GOR Gorton on 04/03/1933 TFD on 13/07/1934 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6113 on 19/08/1921 GOR Gorton on 14/07/1933 TFD on 19/07/1935 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1265 on 01/09/1933 DON Doncaster on 26/09/1933 TFD on 16/10/1933 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1233 on 03/05/1927 GOR Gorton (New) on 16/10/1933 TFD on 16/08/1935 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6110 on 03/11/1932 GOR Gorton on 23/03/1934 TFD on 01/04/1936 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1296 on 31/05/1933 CLK Colwick on 28/03/1934 TFD on 27/05/1936 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1295 on 30/05/1933 CLK Colwick on 10/04/1934 TFD on 30/12/1935 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6114 on 10/02/1920 GOR Gorton on 18/07/1934 TFD on 17/06/1935 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6111 on 30/04/1932 GOR Gorton on 02/02/1935 TFD on 19/06/1936 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6106 on 11/10/1933 GOR Gorton on 17/06/1935 TFD on 19/01/1937 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6108 on 02/02/1935 GOR Gorton on 19/07/1935 TFD on 01/09/1936 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2692 on 18/07/1928 GOR Gorton (New) on 16/08/1935 TFD on 03/03/1937 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2693 on 20/07/1928 GOR Gorton (New) on 30/12/1935 TFD on 26/02/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6113 on 19/07/1935 GOR Gorton on 31/03/1936 TFD on 04/03/1937 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1275 on 19/02/1935 GOR Gorton on 26/05/1936 TFD on 14/06/1937 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6107 on 14/07/1933 GOR Gorton on 19/06/1936 TFD on 13/10/1937 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1255 on 29/11/1929 GOR Gorton on 01/09/1936 TFD on 01/07/1937 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2962 on 18/09/1931 GOR Gorton (New) on 02/09/1936 TFD on 24/02/1939 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2963 on 16/09/1931 GOR Gorton (New) on 15/09/1936 TFD on 04/02/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1497 on 30/03/1931 GOR Gorton on 03/03/1937 TFD on 05/01/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6108 on 01/09/1936 GOR Gorton on 04/03/1937 TFD on 02/06/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B9 4-6-0 6105 on 13/07/1934 GOR Gorton on 17/03/1937 TFD on 05/08/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2691 on 08/02/1937 GOR Gorton on 14/06/1937 TFD on 26/09/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2692 on 03/03/1937 GOR Gorton on 01/07/1937 TFD on 11/10/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6106 on 19/01/1937 GOR Gorton on 13/10/1937 TFD on 27/09/1939 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1498 on 19/08/1930 GOR Gorton on 05/01/1938 TFD on 03/06/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1496 on 13/08/1930 GOR Gorton on 04/02/1938 TFD on 13/01/1940 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1255 on 01/07/1937 GOR Gorton on 26/02/1938 TFD on 27/09/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1233 on 16/08/1935 GOR Gorton on 03/06/1938 TFD on 27/10/1939 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6111 on 19/06/1936 GOR Gorton on 05/08/1938 TFD on 30/09/1938 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1275 on 14/06/1937 GOR Gorton on 26/09/1938 TFD on 30/11/1939 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1274 on 17/02/1928 GOR Gorton on 27/09/1938 TFD on 17/02/1939 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6105 on 05/08/1938 GOR Gorton on 30/09/1938 TFD on 11/10/1941 19D Heaton Mersey
Steam J39 0-6-0 1498 on 03/06/1938 GOR Gorton on 11/10/1938 TFD on 29/08/1939 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1295 on 05/11/1938 GOR Gorton on 17/02/1939 TFD on 21/08/1940 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2963 on 04/02/1938 GOR Gorton on 24/02/1939 TFD on 13/04/1947 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1281 on 08/02/1937 GOR Gorton on 29/08/1939 TFD on 30/04/1941 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6110 on 01/04/1936 GOR Gorton on 27/09/1939 TFD on 21/09/1941 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1497 on 05/01/1938 GOR Gorton on 27/10/1939 TFD on 16/11/1941 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2962 on 24/02/1939 GOR Gorton on 30/11/1939 TFD on 11/03/1951 38A Colwick
Steam J39 0-6-0 2691 on 26/09/1938 GOR Gorton on 13/01/1940 TFD on 13/04/1947 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6113 on 04/03/1937 GOR Gorton on 13/04/1940 TFD on 25/08/1947 Withdrawn
Steam B9 4-6-0 6114 on 17/06/1935 GOR Gorton on 13/04/1940 TFD on 06/11/1942 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6112 on 04/03/1933 GOR Gorton on 31/05/1940 TFD on 06/11/1942 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6300 on 08/01/1924 GOR Gorton on 20/07/1940 TFD on 06/08/1940 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 1290 on 19/11/1938 GOR Gorton on 21/08/1940 TFD on 30/09/1945 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6106 on 27/09/1939 GOR Gorton on 06/04/1941 TFD on 21/09/1941 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6107 on 13/10/1937 GOR Gorton on 06/04/1941 TFD on 21/09/1941 GOR Gorton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2997 on 25/09/1936 GOR Gorton on 30/04/1941 TFD on 01/04/1951 9G Northwich
Steam B9 4-6-0 6109 on 23/03/1934 GOR Gorton on 21/06/1941 TFD on 31/12/1947 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 1263 on 10/05/1927 GOR Gorton (New) on 16/11/1941 TFD on 11/03/1951 38A Colwick
Steam B9 4-6-0 6110 on 21/09/1941 GOR Gorton on 22/03/1942 TFD on 07/10/1947 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 1265 on 16/10/1933 GOR Gorton on 13/12/1942 TFD on 30/09/1945 GOR Gorton
Steam B9 4-6-0 6112 on 31/07/1943 GOR Gorton on 13/08/1944 TFD on 19/08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam B9 4-6-0 6105 on 11/10/1941 19D Heaton Mersey on 22/04/1945 TFD on 06/05/1945 19D Heaton Mersey
Steam B5 4-6-0 1679 on 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall on 06/10/1946 TFD on 24/08/1947 MEX Mexborough
Steam B5 4-6-0 1680 on 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall on 06/10/1946 TFD on 08/01/1947 19D Heaton Mersey
Steam B5 4-6-0 1686 on 11/04/1943 SHF Sheffield Darnall on 06/10/1946 TFD on 24/08/1947 MEX Mexborough
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67358       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 01/01/1948 Withdrawn
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7369       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 14/02/1953 35A New England
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67370       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 01/01/1948 Withdrawn
Steam C12 4-4-2T 67378       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 01/01/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2300       on 01/01/1948 TFD m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2301       on 01/01/1948 TFD m/e 04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2305       on 01/01/1948 TFD w/e 24/07/1950 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2307       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 12/06/1950 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2312       on 01/01/1948 TFD m/e 04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2313       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 12/10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2317       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 18/07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2325       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 06/02/1950 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2329       on 01/01/1948 TFD m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D9 4-4-0 2330       on 01/01/1948 TFD on 15/08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D10 4-4-0 2651       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 24/02/1951 9G Northwich
Steam D10 4-4-0 2656       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 24/10/1953 9G Northwich
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8540       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 14/02/1953 40A Lincoln
Steam J69 0-6-0T 8585       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 21/04/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9252       on 01/01/1948 TFD w/e 25/08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9255       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 23/04/1955 9G Northwich
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9304       on 01/01/1948 TFD 2w/e 17/06/1950 2B Bletchley
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9336       on 01/01/1948 TFD w/e 11/12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9343       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 05/11/1955 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9361       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 10/05/1958 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9364       on 01/01/1948 TFD w/e 13/08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9370       on 01/01/1948 TFD 4w/e 10/05/1958 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam 2P 4-4-0 628 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD 8w/e 16/07/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41166 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40433 on 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD 2w/e 17/06/1950 7D Rhyl
Steam 2P 4-4-0 464 on 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD 4w/e 26/01/1952 4B Northampton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40479 on 01/01/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR) 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 527 on 01/01/1948 8D Widnes 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD 4w/e 31/12/1950 4B Northampton
Steam 2P 4-4-0 539 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD on 07/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40561 on 01/01/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 16/07/1949 TFD m/e 03/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64733 on 12/10/1949 GOR Gorton on 16/10/1949 TFD on 22/05/1950 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam J39 0-6-0 64727 on 16/10/1949 GOR Gorton on 18/10/1949 TFD on 07/01/1951 12B Carlisle Canal
Steam J39 0-6-0 64954 on 06/04/1947 LIV Brunswick on 22/05/1950 TFD on 01/04/1951 9G Northwich