Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 206 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4452 Week
» 1560 Month
» 108506 Year
» 1330071 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: To Eastern Region


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to To Eastern Region Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam J3 0-6-0 4035 m/e 05/1939 Withdrawn m/e 10/1939 (R) 91E m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J3 0-6-0 086 m/e 07/1939 Withdrawn m/e 10/1939 (R) 91E m/e 09/1947 Withdrawn
Steam J10 0-6-0 5076 m/e 07/1939 Withdrawn m/e 10/1939 (R) 91E m/e 08/1947 Withdrawn
Steam J3 0-6-0 4126 m/e 08/1939 Withdrawn m/e 04/1940 (R) 91E m/e 02/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41200 m/e 07/1949 IPS Ipswich 5w/e 16/07/1949 91E 3w/e 31/05/1950 32B Ipswich
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44222 01/01/1948 20F Skipton 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E w/e 09/04/1960 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44223 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42681 m/e 30/11/1949 PLS Plaistow 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42684 m/e 30/11/1949 PLS Plaistow 5w/e 24/12/1949 91E 4w/e 15/12/1956 33C Shoeburyness
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44228 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 19/05/1951 91E 4w/e 22/03/1952 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44530 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 19/05/1951 91E 4w/e 22/03/1952 14A Cricklewood East
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5687 w/e 25/09/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965 91E w/e 08/07/1972 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5861 w/e 21/08/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965 91E w/e 26/11/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 D3152 w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 04/12/1965 91E w/e 11/12/1965 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 D3153 w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 04/12/1965 91E w/e 11/12/1965 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 D3164 w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 04/12/1965 91E w/e 11/12/1965 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 D3165 w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 04/12/1965 91E w/e 11/12/1965 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel D3/5 0-6-0 D3166 w/e 04/12/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 04/12/1965 91E w/e 11/12/1965 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5821 w/e 11/12/1965 91M To London Midland Region w/e 25/12/1965 91E w/e 01/01/1966 41C Wath
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D94 w/e 07/01/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 11/03/1967 91E w/e 29/04/1967 ML Line Power Controller, Derby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42616 w/e 12/02/1966 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 27/05/1967 91E 4w/e 17/06/1967 56F Low Moor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42066 w/e 24/07/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 27/05/1967 91E 4w/e 17/06/1967 56F Low Moor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42236 m/e 05/1967 Withdrawn w/e 27/05/1967 (R) 91E 4w/e 17/06/1967 56F Low Moor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42252 w/e 17/12/1966 12E Tebay w/e 27/05/1967 91E 4w/e 17/06/1967 56F Low Moor
Diesel 14 0-6-0 D9507 4w/e 20/05/1967 50B Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/05/1967 91E 01/04/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 14 0-6-0 D9510 4w/e 20/05/1967 50B Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/05/1967 91E 01/04/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 14 0-6-0 D9529 4w/e 20/05/1967 50B Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/05/1967 91E 01/04/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 14 0-6-0 D9534 4w/e 20/05/1967 50B Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/05/1967 91E 01/04/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8020 4w/e 15/07/1967 52A Gateshead 5w/e 29/07/1967 91E w/e 10/10/1970 41A Tinsley
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8022 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 29/07/1967 91E 4w/e 12/08/1967 52A Gateshead
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8025 4w/e 28/01/1967 66A Polmadie 5w/e 29/07/1967 91E 4w/e 12/08/1967 52A Gateshead
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8027 4w/e 15/07/1967 52A Gateshead 5w/e 29/07/1967 91E w/e 06/06/1970 55B York (North)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3946 w/e 19/08/1967 40A Lincoln 4w/e 09/09/1967 91E w/e 16/11/1968 41J Shirebrook
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1956 22/12/1966 WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 4w/e 02/12/1967 91E 17/06/1968 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1957 28/01/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 4w/e 02/12/1967 91E 17/06/1968 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1958 25/02/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 4w/e 02/12/1967 91E 17/06/1968 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1994 w/e 25/11/1967 34G Finsbury Park 4w/e 02/12/1967 91E w/e 13/09/1969 41A Tinsley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3918 4w/e 11/03/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/04/1968 91E w/e 04/05/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3137 w/e 29/06/1968 34E New England 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E w/e 26/10/1968 31B March
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3138 w/e 29/06/1968 34E New England 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E w/e 26/10/1968 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3401 w/e 29/06/1968 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E 3w/e 10/05/1975 SB Shirebrook
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3405 w/e 29/06/1968 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E w/e 07/09/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12114 w/e 29/06/1968 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E 05/10/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12115 w/e 29/06/1968 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E 05/10/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12116 w/e 29/06/1968 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/07/1968 91E 30/09/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1570 4w/e 20/07/1968 52A Gateshead w/e 03/08/1968 91E w/e 09/11/1968 52A Gateshead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3132 30/10/1954 65F Grangemouth (New) 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E w/e 26/10/1968 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3134 30/10/1954 65F Grangemouth (New) 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E w/e 20/06/1970 30A Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3209 9w/e 26/11/1966 67C Ayr 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E 25/01/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3337 20/03/1957 62A Thornton Junction (New) 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E w/e 07/09/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13338 23/03/1957 62A Thornton Junction (New) 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E w/e 07/09/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3339 29/03/1957 62A Thornton Junction (New) 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E w/e 07/09/1968 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3394 4w/e 21/12/1957 65E Kipps 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E w/e 26/10/1968 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3409 4w/e 25/03/1967 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 31/08/1968 91E w/e 26/10/1968 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3275 w/e 14/09/1968 34E New England 4w/e 28/09/1968 91E w/e 26/10/1968 31B March
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13281 w/e 01/02/1969 36C Frodingham 5w/e 01/03/1969 91E 2w/e 20/11/1976 TE Thornaby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3533 w/e 01/02/1969 40A Lincoln 5w/e 01/03/1969 91E      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3537 w/e 01/02/1969 36A Doncaster 5w/e 01/03/1969 91E w/e 08/01/1972 30A Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3542 w/e 01/02/1969 31B March 5w/e 01/03/1969 91E 14/11/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3523 w/e 15/02/1969 30A Stratford 5w/e 15/03/1969 91E 29/04/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3524 9w/e 25/01/1969 84A Laira 5w/e 15/03/1969 91E 15/06/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 29/03/1969 91E w/e 12/04/1969 40B Immingham
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6938 w/e 24/05/1969 40B Immingham 5w/e 14/06/1969 91E w/e 05/07/1969 30A Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3911 09/11/1960 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 30/10/1971 91E w/e 26/08/1972 40B Immingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3919 4w/e 11/03/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 30/10/1971 91E w/e 26/08/1972 40B Immingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3934 w/e 09/10/1971 52A Gateshead 4w/e 30/10/1971 91E w/e 16/09/1972 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3935 5w/e 30/09/1967 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 30/10/1971 91E w/e 20/05/1972 30A Stratford
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5603 w/e 06/11/1971 D10 Preston Division w/e 20/11/1971 91E w/e 04/03/1972 40B Immingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5658 w/e 18/03/1972 91M To London Midland Region w/e 25/03/1972 91E w/e 11/11/1972 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5658 w/e 18/03/1972 D16 Nottingham Division w/e 25/03/1972 91E w/e 11/11/1972 41A Tinsley
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25083 w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley 4w/e 03/11/1973 91E w/e 08/03/1975 BS Bescot
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25084 w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley 4w/e 03/11/1973 91E w/e 08/03/1975 91W To Western Region / GWR
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25084 w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley 4w/e 03/11/1973 91E 2w/e 08/03/1975 CF Cardiff Canton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25085 w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley 4w/e 03/11/1973 91E w/e 08/03/1975 91W To Western Region / GWR
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25085 w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley 4w/e 03/11/1973 91E 2w/e 08/03/1975 CF Cardiff Canton
Diesel 37 Co-Co 37219 w/e 13/10/1973 TE Thornaby 4w/e 03/11/1973 91E 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20119 w/e 13/10/1973 TI Tinsley 4w/e 03/11/1973 91E 01/06/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1687 w/e 09/10/1971 86A Cardiff Canton w/e 08/12/1973 91E w/e 11/05/1974 IM Immingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3046 w/e 12/10/1968 6A Chester (MR) w/e 23/03/1974 91E 06/01/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08075 w/e 11/07/1970 16C Derby w/e 23/03/1974 91E 13/12/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47368 w/e 11/05/1974 CD Crewe Diesel w/e 25/05/1974 91E 2w/e 01/06/1974 TI Tinsley
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47380 w/e 11/05/1974 TO Toton w/e 25/05/1974 91E 2w/e 01/06/1974 TI Tinsley
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25108 17/06/1968 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 22/06/1974 91E 3w/e 12/07/1975 91X To Scottish Region
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47306 w/e 02/06/1973 CE Crewe Diesel w/e 06/07/1974 91E w/e 07/06/1975 TO Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25026 w/e 17/08/1974 TI Tinsley 2w/e 24/08/1974 91E 2w/e 15/02/1975 HA Haymarket
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25302 w/e 07/11/1970 D08 Liverpool Division w/e 28/09/1974 91E w/e 11/01/1975 BS Bescot
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47542 w/e 24/11/1973 CF Cardiff Canton 2w/e 12/10/1974 91E 2w/e 30/11/1974 GD Gateshead
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47541 w/e 09/10/1971 86A Cardiff Canton 2w/e 12/10/1974 91E 2w/e 30/11/1974 YK York (North)
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47025 w/e 11/05/1974 CF Cardiff Canton w/e 16/11/1974 91E w/e 07/12/1974 GD Gateshead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08930 6w/e 03/07/1971 83A Newton Abbot 2w/e 05/04/1975 91E w/e 21/06/1975 SF Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08081 w/e 14/06/1975 OC Old Oak Common 3w/e 12/07/1975 91E w/e 13/09/1975 GD Gateshead
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08834 q/e 14/11/1970 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 12/07/1975 91E      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08274 3w/e 12/07/1975 GD Gateshead 5w/e 26/07/1975 91E 23/12/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08325 3w/e 12/07/1975 GD Gateshead 5w/e 26/07/1975 91E 08/07/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47064 2w/e 10/08/1974 OC Old Oak Common w/e 11/10/1975 91E      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47085 q/e 15/01/1967 81A Old Oak Common w/e 11/10/1975 91E 12/06/1988 CD Crewe Diesel
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47093 2w/e 08/03/1975 BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 11/10/1975 91E 05/01/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 31418 w/e 18/08/1973 CD Cricklewood East w/e 11/10/1975 91E 3w/e 02/05/1976 GD Gateshead
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 31279 w/e 11/05/1974 OC Old Oak Common w/e 11/10/1975 91E      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 31291 w/e 27/04/1974 OC Old Oak Common w/e 11/10/1975 91E      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 03084 2w/e 11/10/1975 NR Norwich Thorpe m/e 31/10/1975 91E 05/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 03086 2w/e 11/10/1975 NR Norwich Thorpe m/e 31/10/1975 91E 13/11/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 03179 2w/e 11/10/1975 CR Colchester m/e 31/10/1975 91E 31/07/2002 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 03196 2w/e 11/10/1975 CR Colchester m/e 31/10/1975 91E 12/06/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08120 w/e 16/11/1975 DN Darlington 3w/e 29/11/1975 91E 25/10/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08089 w/e 16/03/1974 BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 10/01/1976 91E w/e 11/01/1976 SF Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08102 3w/e 04/01/1976 DR Doncaster 2w/e 10/01/1976 91E 14/03/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 24137 w/e 28/02/1976 98S   3w/e 20/03/1976 91E 3w/e 08/05/1976 To Store
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08816 w/e 23/05/1976 TI Tinsley 2w/e 05/06/1976 91E w/e 22/08/1976 91W To Western Region / GWR
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08824 w/e 23/05/1976 SB Shirebrook 2w/e 05/06/1976 91E      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20017 2w/e 04/07/1976 TI Tinsley 3w/e 24/07/1976 91E 05/12/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20078 2w/e 04/07/1976 TI Tinsley 3w/e 24/07/1976 91E 10/01/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20079 2w/e 04/07/1976 TI Tinsley 3w/e 24/07/1976 91E 25/04/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20098 2w/e 04/07/1976 TI Tinsley 3w/e 24/07/1976 91E 24/06/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08810 w/e 22/08/1976 TI Tinsley 3w/e 04/09/1976 91E      
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 46047 4w/e 10/05/1975 CF Cardiff Canton 3w/e 09/10/1976 91E 02/09/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 46048 4w/e 10/05/1975 CF Cardiff Canton 3w/e 09/10/1976 91E 13/09/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 46049 4w/e 10/05/1975 CF Cardiff Canton 3w/e 09/10/1976 91E 12/12/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 46051 4w/e 10/05/1975 CF Cardiff Canton 3w/e 09/10/1976 91E 04/12/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 46052 w/e 11/10/1975 CF Cardiff Canton 3w/e 09/10/1976 91E 30/09/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 31110 w/e 10/03/1973 82A Bristol Bath Road 3w/e 09/10/1976 91E 31/05/2006 Withdrawn
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 31112 2w/e 02/06/1973 BR Bristol Bath Road 3w/e 09/10/1976 91E 01/05/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 47 Co-Co 47403 w/e 12/12/1976 FP Finsbury Park 5w/e 31/12/1976 91E 28/09/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20034 w/e 12/12/1976 TI Tinsley 5w/e 31/12/1976 91E 01/10/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20100 w/e 12/12/1976 TI Tinsley 5w/e 31/12/1976 91E 05/05/1989 Withdrawn