Depot: To Scottish Region
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to To Scottish Region | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46121 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 91X | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42129 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 66C | Hamilton (West) (New) | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 91X | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67767 | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 91X | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 34A | Kings Cross | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67771 | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 91X | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 34B | Hornsey | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90523 | on | 24/04/1950 | 63A | Perth South | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 91X | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90530 | on | 24/04/1950 | 63A | Perth South | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 91X | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90523 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90530 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 91X | To Scottish Region | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79207 | on | 24/04/1950 | 63A | Perth South | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60821 | on | 22/04/1951 | 64A | St Margarets | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 91X | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61769 | on | 20/05/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 91X | on | 24/02/1952 | 65C | Parkhead |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61721 | on | 03/06/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 91X | on | 20/01/1952 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 61734 | on | 03/06/1951 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 91X | on | 10/02/1952 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60814 | on | 05/06/1951 | 64A | St Margarets | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 91X | on | 25/01/1953 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42535 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13A | Plaistow | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 91X | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42535 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 91X | To Scottish Region | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 91X | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 67D | Ardrossan |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42530 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 91X | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46210 | on | 15/09/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 06/07/1958 | 91X | on | 04/03/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42568 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 91X | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46451 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 91X | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46467 | m/e | 06/1951 | 31A | Cambridge (New) | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 91X | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67B | Hurlford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6840 | on | 08/05/1963 (New) | 91X | m/e | 09/1963 | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6840 | on | 08/05/1963 | 91X | To Scottish Region (New) | m/e | 09/1963 | 91X | m/e | 07/1966 | 91X | To Scottish Region |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6840 | m/e | 09/1963 | 91X | To Scottish Region | m/e | 07/1966 | 91X | 9w/e | 20/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25101 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | TI | Tinsley | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 91X | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25111 | w/e | 19/10/1974 | TI | Tinsley | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 91X | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25083 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | BS | Bescot | 3w/e | 02/08/1975 | 91X | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25086 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | LO | Longsight | 3w/e | 02/08/1975 | 91X | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25087 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 3w/e | 02/08/1975 | 91X | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25009 | w/e | 19/10/1974 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 91X | on | 01/02/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25010 | w/e | 19/10/1974 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 91X | on | 11/02/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25011 | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 91X | on | 01/12/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25012 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 91X | on | 01/02/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25013 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 91X | 3w/e | 27/03/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25014 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 91X | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25029 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 91X | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25030 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 91X | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25031 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 91X | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 97250 | on | 10/10/1982 | Withdrawn | m/e | 06/1983 (R) | 91X | on | 12/10/1987 | Withdrawn |