Depot: Bristol Bath Road
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Bristol Bath Road | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2911 | on | 28/07/1907 (New) | BRD | m/e | 03/1935 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2916 | on | 19/08/1907 (New) | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2921 | on | 06/09/1907 (New) | BRD | m/e | 12/1945 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4600 | 4-4-2T | 4600 | on | 02/12/1913 | SW Stock | Swindon Stock shed (New) | on | 05/02/1914 | BRD | on | 11/05/1914 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4009 | on | 20/07/1911 | LA | Laira | on | 16/02/1918 | BRD | on | 28/08/1918 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | on | 02/12/1929 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 25/10/1930 | BRD | on | 12/11/1930 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 25/06/1926 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 11/09/1931 | BRD | on | 01/12/1932 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 30/06/1930 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 16/09/1931 | BRD | m/e | 03/1933 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4009 | on | 03/09/1931 | EXE | Exeter | on | 28/01/1932 | BRD | m/e | 05/1933 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | m/e | 12/1931 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 27/05/1932 | BRD | on | 24/06/1932 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 07/09/1931 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 07/09/1932 | BRD | on | 01/01/1934 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 07/02/1924 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 30/11/1932 | BRD | on | 04/01/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 04/01/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 20/01/1933 | BRD | on | 20/05/1934 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 17/04/1929 | SRD | Stafford Road | m/e | 02/1933 | BRD | on | 14/04/1939 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | m/e | 04/1933 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 12/05/1934 | BRD | on | 21/04/1940 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 01/01/1934 | 98S | on | 14/07/1934 | BRD | on | 20/10/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | m/e | 07/1933 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 24/07/1934 | BRD | on | 06/01/1936 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 20/10/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 11/1934 | BRD | on | 26/02/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 22/02/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 25/08/1935 | BRD | on | 13/03/1938 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 11/07/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 09/09/1935 | BRD | on | 21/03/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4566 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4585 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4592 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5349 | on | 01/01/1934 | 54 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5512 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5548 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6322 | on | 01/01/1934 | 76 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | |
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3378 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | m/e | 11/1945 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | on | 03/06/1934 | LDR | Landore | on | 18/11/1935 | BRD | m/e | 03/1941 | 142 | |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4670 | on | 02/07/1935 | MAR | March | m/e | 12/1935 | BRD | on | 22/01/1936 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2526 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2528 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2955 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4064 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | m/e | 06/1937 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5514 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 3224 | m/e | 11/1922 | ARD | Ardsley (New) | m/e | 01/1936 | BRD | on | 01/01/1948 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4661 | on | 14/10/1935 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | m/e | 01/1936 | BRD | on | 09/02/1936 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4666 | on | 09/09/1935 | CLK | Colwick | m/e | 01/1936 | BRD | on | 12/02/1936 | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4015 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2526 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BRD | on | 10/1940 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2975 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BRD | m/e | 11/1944 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4019 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BRD | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2913 | on | 31/07/1907 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4042 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5556 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | on | 04/05/1936 (New) | BRD | on | 19/01/1938 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 21/03/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 24/05/1936 | BRD | on | 16/10/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 16/10/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 10/11/1936 | BRD | on | 17/10/1937 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 06/1937 | BRD | m/e | 10/1937 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | m/e | 10/1936 | EXE | Exeter | on | 17/09/1937 | BRD | m/e | 11/1945 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | m/e | 10/1937 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | m/e | 11/1937 | BRD | on | 15/01/1943 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | on | 03/07/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 21/03/1938 | BRD | m/e | 09/1942 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | on | 17/12/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 24/04/1938 | BRD | m/e | 05/1938 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5006 | m/e | 05/1938 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | m/e | 06/1938 | BRD | m/e | 12/1942 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5068 | on | 22/06/1938 (New) | BRD | m/e | 11/1940 | 142 | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5014 | on | 19/12/1935 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 16/07/1938 | BRD | m/e | 08/1942 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SDN | Swindon | on | 18/12/1938 | BRD | m/e | 04/1939 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5070 | on | 03/07/1938 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 01/1939 | BRD | on | 18/03/1940 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | on | 31/07/1938 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 01/1939 | BRD | m/e | 04/1942 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | m/e | 12/1938 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 02/1939 | BRD | m/e | 05/1945 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | m/e | 04/1939 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | m/e | 06/1939 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5082 | on | 16/06/1939 (New) | BRD | m/e | 04/1944 | 142 | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 14/04/1939 | SDN | Swindon | on | 17/06/1939 | BRD | on | 18/07/1940 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | on | 08/07/1939 (New) | BRD | m/e | 05/1940 | 142 | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | on | 18/12/1939 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 02/1940 | BRD | m/e | 12/1940 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 21/04/1940 | 142 | m/e | 05/1940 | BRD | m/e | 03/1941 | 142 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | m/e | 05/1940 | 142 | m/e | 06/1940 | BRD | m/e | 07/1942 | 142 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5019 | on | 05/02/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 17/06/1940 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | m/e | 12/1940 | 142 | m/e | 01/1941 | BRD | on | 06/02/1942 | SDN | Swindon | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5068 | m/e | 11/1940 | 142 | on | 01/02/1941 | BRD | on | 06/11/1941 | SDN | Swindon | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | m/e | 03/1941 | 142 | on | 12/07/1941 | BRD | on | 26/11/1946 | LDR | Landore | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | m/e | 03/1941 | 142 | on | 25/07/1941 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 09/02/1938 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 02/1942 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | m/e | 04/1942 | 142 | on | 10/06/1942 | BRD | on | 24/08/1945 | NA | Newton Abbot | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | m/e | 07/1942 | 142 | m/e | 08/1942 | BRD | on | 02/05/1947 | 142 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5014 | m/e | 08/1942 | 142 | m/e | 09/1942 | BRD | m/e | 10/1942 | 142 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | m/e | 09/1942 | 142 | m/e | 10/1942 | BRD | m/e | 05/1943 | 142 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | on | 23/12/1941 | LDR | Landore | on | 09/11/1942 | BRD | m/e | 10/1943 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | on | 06/02/1942 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 02/1943 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | on | 15/01/1943 | 142 | m/e | 02/1943 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5024 | on | 20/04/1937 | LA | Laira | m/e | 05/1943 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | on | 13/05/1939 | LA | Laira | m/e | 06/1943 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | m/e | 05/1943 | 142 | on | 27/08/1943 | BRD | m/e | 09/1946 | 142 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | m/e | 10/1943 | 142 | on | 06/01/1944 | BRD | m/e | 08/1946 | 142 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5082 | m/e | 04/1944 | 142 | m/e | 05/1944 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6962 | m/e | 10/1944 | 142 | m/e | 11/1944 | BRD | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | m/e | 05/1945 | 142 | m/e | 07/1945 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | on | 24/08/1945 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 07/09/1945 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | m/e | 11/1945 | 142 | on | 10/11/1945 | BRD | m/e | 06/1947 | 142 | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2534 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 32 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5964 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | BRD | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4815 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 22 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5343 | on | 01/01/1934 | 66 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5813 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | m/e | 08/1946 | 142 | m/e | 09/1946 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4019 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | m/e | 09/1946 | 142 | m/e | 11/1946 | BRD | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1002 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1005 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 22 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1007 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83F | Truro | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1011 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1013 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1014 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1028 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2072 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2322 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | WES | Westbury | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2462 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2929 | on | 10/10/1907 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2931 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2939 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2942 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2950 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 09/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4019 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4020 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4030 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 05/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4033 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4034 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82D | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4035 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 10/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4041 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4042 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4043 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 01/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4047 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | m/e | 09/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 07/01/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | m/e | 11/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 03/1948 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | m/e | 02/1942 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 08/1947 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4093 | m/e | 06/1943 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 07/11/1950 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | on | 25/07/1941 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 09/1948 | 142 | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4142 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4143 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4151 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4535 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 02/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4536 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4539 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4563 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4577 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83G | Penzance | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4580 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4595 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1415 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1430 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1463 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 04/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4942 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | Exeter | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5019 | on | 17/06/1940 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 04/1948 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5024 | m/e | 05/1943 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 11/1948 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | m/e | 06/1947 | 142 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 07/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | m/e | 02/1943 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 03/11/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5074 | on | 07/09/1945 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 22/02/1951 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | m/e | 07/1945 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 03/1948 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5082 | m/e | 05/1944 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 07/11/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5083 | on | 06/12/1946 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 29/08/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | m/e | 02/1943 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 21/05/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | m/e | 06/1939 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 30/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | on | 02/05/1947 | 142 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 18/07/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5169 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5325 | on | 01/01/1934 | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5327 | on | 01/01/1934 | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5343 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5506 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5511 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5512 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5514 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5523 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5527 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5528 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | spm | Yatton | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5535 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 06/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5539 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | WTD | Whitland | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5546 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83C | Exeter | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5547 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5548 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5553 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5555 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5558 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83B | Taunton | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5559 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83F | Truro | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5561 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 07/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5564 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | wes | Frome | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5572 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5803 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 31/05/1948 | OSW | |||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5809 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5813 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | on | 23/04/1956 | To Store | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5949 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3950 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 30/04/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6958 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7809 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7812 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 31/05/1948 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7814 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | m/e | 31/05/1948 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79226 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 07/1947 | BRD | m/e | 09/1947 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 18/07/1947 | BRD | m/e | 12/1947 | 142 | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5083 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 29/08/1947 | BRD | m/e | 30/04/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | m/e | 09/1947 | 142 | on | 08/10/1947 | BRD | m/e | 02/1951 | 82D | Westbury | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | m/e | 08/1947 | 142 | on | 30/10/1947 | BRD | m/e | 30/06/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | m/e | 12/1947 | 142 | m/e | 12/1947 | BRD | on | 22/11/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5067 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | BRD | on | 20/06/1958 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4084 | m/e | 03/1948 | 142 | m/e | 04/1948 | BRD | on | 04/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | m/e | 03/1948 | 142 | m/e | 04/1948 | BRD | on | 07/02/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5019 | m/e | 04/1948 | 142 | m/e | 05/1948 | BRD | on | 08/05/1958 | 84A | Stafford Road | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6935 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 31/05/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | WES | Westbury |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6965 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 31/05/1948 | BRD | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | 2709 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 30/06/1948 | BRD | m/e | 09/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5327 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 30/06/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6977 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5041 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | m/e | 07/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7011 | m/e | 07/1948 (New) | BRD | on | 21/10/1959 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4056 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | BRD | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7014 | on | 21/07/1948 | SDN | Swindon (New) | m/e | 08/1948 | BRD | on | 16/09/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5041 | m/e | 07/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | BRD | m/e | 10/1948 | 142 | |
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 8105 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | BRD | on | 14/10/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | m/e | 09/1948 | 142 | m/e | 10/1948 | BRD | m/e | 10/1948 | 142 | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4142 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | on | 14/10/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5041 | m/e | 10/1948 | 142 | on | 22/10/1948 | BRD | on | 17/02/1950 | To Store | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4044 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SALOP | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4096 | m/e | 10/1948 | 142 | m/e | 11/1948 | BRD | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6000 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6018 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6019 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | BRD | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2445 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4563 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7019 | m/e | 06/1949 (New) | BRD | on | 09/11/1961 | 84A | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5955 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5984 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5955 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | LLY | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5984 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5024 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 07/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4914 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5024 | m/e | 07/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BRD | on | 18/11/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6915 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7900 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1002 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2534 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | BRD | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 6019 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 8105 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6351 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6958 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2322 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRD | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5311 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRD | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | BRD | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | on | 22/11/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 01/1950 | BRD | on | 13/09/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4954 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5327 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82A | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 11/06/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 07/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 06/07/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 07/07/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 07/07/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 15/07/1950 | 82A | m/e | 10/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 11/06/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82A | m/e | 12/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | m/e | 07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82A | on | 03/11/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2948 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4914 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4985 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | on | 07/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | on | 23/09/1950 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | on | 07/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | m/e | 02/1951 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | on | 06/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | m/e | 06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7034 | m/e | 08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7917 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2948 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | m/e | 11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4914 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4985 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7917 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5064 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | on | 05/10/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 06/11/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4060 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | on | 06/11/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | m/e | 10/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5064 | on | 05/10/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | on | 23/04/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6102 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6107 | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4060 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | m/e | 10/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4521 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4539 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6102 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6107 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6109 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | OXF | Oxford | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6153 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4521 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4539 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6109 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6153 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 81B | Slough |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | m/e | 02/1951 | 82D | Westbury | on | 17/02/1951 | 82A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 24/04/1951 | 82A | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | on | 24/04/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 82A | m/e | 05/1956 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5037 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 82D | Westbury | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 82A | m/e | 06/1954 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6982 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4544 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82A | m/e | 09/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 06/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | m/e | 07/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | m/e | 06/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82A | on | 16/10/1951 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | m/e | 07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82A | on | 31/07/1956 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82A | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4592 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4592 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75004 | m/e | 08/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 82A | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4961 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6900 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6322 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6374 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6967 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84B | Oxley | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | on | 16/10/1951 | 83D | Laira | on | 29/11/1951 | 82A | on | 31/03/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7900 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5904 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7900 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 82A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5904 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4603 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4660 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9604 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4603 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4660 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9604 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82A | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5919 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82A | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5919 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 82A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | SDN | Swindon | on | 22/08/1952 | 82A | on | 02/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5085 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 10/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5085 | m/e | 10/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5069 | m/e | 11/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 22/10/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4157 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4159 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5069 | on | 22/10/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | on | 23/06/1954 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5534 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6986 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7907 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 09/12/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4094 | on | 09/12/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82A | m/e | 07/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4517 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82A | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5182 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9008 | on | 06/10/1952 | 98S | on | 13/01/1953 | 82A | on | 03/05/1953 | To Store | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9010 | on | 25/10/1952 | 98S | on | 13/01/1953 | 82A | on | 09/02/1953 | To Store | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9016 | on | 06/10/1952 | 98S | on | 13/01/1953 | 82A | on | 14/06/1953 | To Store | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9020 | on | 06/10/1952 | 98S | on | 13/01/1953 | 82A | on | 14/06/1953 | To Store | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9026 | on | 25/10/1952 | 98S | on | 13/01/1953 | 82A | on | 03/05/1953 | To Store | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1454 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1026 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4139 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82A | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5565 | on | 15/06/1947 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 26/02/1953 | 82A | on | 04/11/1959 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5512 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82A | m/e | 02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | on | 27/01/1953 | 82C | Swindon | on | 27/03/1953 | 82A | on | 23/01/1957 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2203 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4150 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5197 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4511 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82A | m/e | 11/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4532 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82A | m/e | 02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4582 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82A | m/e | 04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5525 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3650 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5701 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7901 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9610 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4166 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4558 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4909 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4972 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5934 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7782 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4597 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82A | m/e | 01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5532 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5949 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6107 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5307 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6867 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1000 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5351 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6322 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4958 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6936 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6954 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6957 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6958 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5027 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 84A | Stafford Road | m/e | 06/1954 | 82A | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5063 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | on | 01/06/1954 | 82A | on | 16/04/1958 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5057 | on | 30/04/1952 | 83D | Laira | on | 08/06/1954 | 82A | on | 04/11/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | on | 22/09/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1954 | 82A | m/e | 07/1956 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3759 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3795 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6908 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6925 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4080 | on | 19/05/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 17/07/1954 | 82A | on | 13/05/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4562 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1454 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3784 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4914 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5904 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5306 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4562 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46507 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1009 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46527 | on | 01/04/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82A | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3784 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6977 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41202 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1402 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82A | m/e | 10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4958 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4959 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6137 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6163 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6986 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4924 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5910 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5950 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6951 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6982 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7907 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7015 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 11/1955 | 82A | on | 28/05/1959 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4524 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82A | m/e | 06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9771 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3692 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4947 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6363 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 82A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6908 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41203 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7018 | on | 15/08/1955 | 82C | Swindon | on | 26/05/1956 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3748 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4947 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4958 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4999 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5949 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5964 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | LA | Laira | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6908 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6972 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8491 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8795 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9729 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5919 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | m/e | 09/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 01/10/1956 | 82A | on | 19/11/1956 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4927 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4956 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6915 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6977 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1412 | on | 15/06/1947 | OSY | Oswestry | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82A | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6360 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8714 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8747 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | on | 19/11/1956 | 82C | Swindon | on | 01/12/1956 | 82A | on | 16/02/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1433 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5403 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 82A | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3720 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4660 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6391 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82A | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5054 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/04/1957 | 82A | on | 04/11/1959 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3676 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82A | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4567 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4619 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6997 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6982 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 29/06/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road | on | 13/06/1957 | 82A | on | 13/09/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9481 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4922 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8741 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5188 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9626 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5511 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6327 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9769 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4553 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4959 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6919 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3759 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82A | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4589 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5529 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5949 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | on | 16/06/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5073 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | on | 13/09/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5090 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85A | Worcester | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | on | 19/10/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5092 | m/e | 02/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 20/03/1958 | 82A | on | 02/08/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5574 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6996 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82001 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82003 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon | on | 23/04/1958 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4595 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5188 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5311 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82002 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82032 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82033 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82034 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82035 | on | 03/03/1955 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82036 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82037 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82039 | on | 10/05/1955 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4918 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | on | 20/11/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 12/06/1958 | 82A | on | 26/08/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5527 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5530 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6936 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82040 | on | 19/05/1955 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82041 | on | 17/06/1955 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82043 | on | 27/06/1955 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82044 | on | 12/08/1955 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1024 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5186 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82A | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5525 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82005 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82042 | on | 20/06/1955 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3764 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3795 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9771 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82007 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3677 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4949 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4078 | on | 15/06/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 08/11/1958 | 82A | on | 11/07/1959 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3764 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3795 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4988 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6363 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82A | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 16/05/1958 | 83C | Exeter | on | 02/12/1958 | 82A | on | 18/06/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5078 | on | 24/07/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 02/12/1958 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7003 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | on | 02/12/1958 | 82A | on | 16/06/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41249 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4163 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82030 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6972 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5097 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | on | 02/06/1959 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4593 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5940 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5941 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 18/06/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 15/07/1959 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6107 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3604 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3623 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5509 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5529 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6977 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6988 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1027 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5934 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5941 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4129 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82006 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82009 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82030 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82037 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82038 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4077 | on | 05/05/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 10/02/1960 | 82A | on | 10/11/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4575 | on | 15/06/1947 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5049 | on | 24/07/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 22/04/1960 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41240 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | on | 16/10/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 30/06/1960 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5997 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41304 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5975 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5052 | on | 15/01/1957 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 06/09/1960 | 82A | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7000 | on | 16/05/1961 (New) | 82A | m/e | 06/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7002 | on | 19/07/1961 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82D | Westbury | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7000 | m/e | 06/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 08/1961 | 82A | on | 02/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7003 | on | 03/08/1961 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7001 | on | 03/07/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7004 | on | 15/08/1961 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D35 | on | 30/06/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 82A | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D33 | on | 19/06/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | on | 07/11/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D34 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D35 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D36 | on | 06/07/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D37 | on | 10/07/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D38 | on | 13/07/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D39 | on | 20/07/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D40 | on | 26/07/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D41 | on | 29/07/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D42 | on | 19/08/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | on | 10/09/1961 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7005 | on | 25/09/1961 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82D | Westbury | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7006 | on | 06/10/1961 (New) | 82A | m/e | 11/09/1971 | To Store | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7008 | on | 24/10/1961 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3000 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3001 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3002 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3003 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3182 | 4w/e | 18/10/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3183 | 4w/e | 24/10/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3184 | 4w/e | 27/10/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3185 | on | 04/11/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3186 | on | 04/11/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3187 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3255 | on | 08/06/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3256 | on | 08/06/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3257 | on | 13/06/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3503 | on | 14/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3504 | on | 17/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3505 | on | 18/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3506 | on | 18/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3507 | on | 25/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3508 | on | 25/04/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3750 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3751 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3803 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3805 | on | 18/12/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3806 | on | 23/12/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3998 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 82D | Westbury |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4012 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4015 | on | 17/05/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4016 | on | 18/05/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 82D | Westbury |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4017 | on | 14/05/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4019 | on | 05/06/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82D | Westbury |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4020 | on | 12/06/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4022 | on | 21/06/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4023 | on | 26/06/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 82D | Westbury |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4024 | on | 04/07/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4025 | on | 10/07/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4026 | on | 09/08/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7009 | on | 07/11/1961 (New) | 82A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7010 | on | 20/11/1961 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7012 | on | 01/12/1961 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7011 | on | 04/12/1961 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7013 | on | 14/12/1961 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7014 | on | 18/12/1961 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7015 | on | 22/12/1961 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7016 | on | 03/01/1962 (New) | 82A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D149 | on | 30/12/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7017 | on | 08/01/1962 (New) | 82A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7018 | on | 18/01/1962 (New) | 82A | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D149 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82A | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5908 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82A | on | 30/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7020 | on | 08/02/1962 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7019 | on | 14/02/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 11/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7021 | on | 14/02/1962 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7023 | on | 21/02/1962 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4118 | on | 16/02/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7026 | on | 26/03/1962 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7027 | on | 07/04/1962 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7002 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7005 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4169 | on | 29/05/1962 (New) | 82A | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6347 | on | 02/06/1962 (New) | 82A | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7040 | on | 13/07/1962 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7041 | on | 13/07/1962 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3403 | on | 29/11/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7007 | on | 18/10/1961 | 82D | Westbury (New) | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7042 | on | 23/07/1962 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7043 | on | 24/07/1962 (New) | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6354 | on | 02/08/1962 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7045 | on | 10/08/1962 (New) | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7046 | on | 15/08/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7047 | on | 15/08/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7044 | on | 18/08/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6355 | on | 24/08/1962 (New) | 82A | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7048 | on | 26/09/1962 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6356 | on | 27/09/1962 (New) | 82A | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7049 | on | 05/10/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7050 | on | 05/10/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6351 | on | 27/06/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6352 | on | 12/07/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6353 | on | 12/07/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82A | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7051 | on | 06/10/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7052 | on | 24/10/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7053 | on | 24/10/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7055 | on | 02/11/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6357 | on | 13/11/1962 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7054 | on | 16/11/1962 (New) | 82A | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6349 | on | 14/06/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6350 | on | 27/06/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1046 | on | 24/12/1962 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1035 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1048 | on | 15/12/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 82A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7069 | on | 22/02/1963 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7070 | on | 08/03/1963 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7071 | on | 11/03/1963 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7073 | on | 11/03/1963 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7072 | on | 22/03/1963 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1058 | on | 25/03/1963 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7074 | on | 26/03/1963 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7002 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 82A | on | 03/10/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7010 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7022 | on | 26/02/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7023 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7024 | on | 16/03/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7025 | on | 15/03/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7028 | on | 05/04/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7075 | on | 29/03/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7088 | on | 29/10/1963 (New) | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1689 | on | 21/11/1963 (New) | 82A | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 2B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1692 | on | 30/11/1963 (New) | 82A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1693 | on | 06/12/1963 (New) | 82A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7081 | on | 12/12/1963 (New) | 82A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7077 | on | 13/12/1963 (New) | 82A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7093 | on | 14/12/1963 (New) | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7079 | on | 16/12/1963 (New) | 82A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1041 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1043 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1053 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7001 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | on | 02/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7003 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7011 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7015 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7021 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1720 | on | 06/03/1964 (New) | 82A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1722 | on | 13/03/1964 (New) | 82A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1723 | on | 17/03/1964 (New) | 82A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1724 | on | 17/03/1964 (New) | 82A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1725 | on | 24/03/1964 (New) | 82A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1002 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1029 | on | 20/04/1964 (New) | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1020 | on | 21/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1712 | on | 28/01/1964 | 2B | Oxley (New) | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 82A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1734 | on | 23/05/1964 (New) | 82A | on | 19/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6938 | on | 12/06/1964 (New) | 82A | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1006 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1021 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1024 | on | 01/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1068 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1071 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7027 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7092 | on | 16/12/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7094 | on | 14/12/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1750 | on | 07/07/1964 (New) | 82A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1749 | on | 10/07/1964 (New) | 82A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9500 | on | 24/07/1964 (New) | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9502 | on | 27/07/1964 (New) | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9503 | on | 30/07/1964 (New) | 82A | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9504 | on | 08/08/1964 (New) | 82A | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9505 | on | 12/08/1964 (New) | 82A | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2134 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2135 | on | 21/03/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road (New) | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2145 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2195 | on | 05/06/1961 | 82C | Swindon (New) | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | m/e | 08/1968 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3000 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3001 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3002 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | on | 17/07/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3003 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | on | 17/07/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3182 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3183 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3184 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3185 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3187 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3503 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3504 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3505 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3506 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3507 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | w/e | 17/08/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3508 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3750 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3751 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3803 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | m/e | 11/1976 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3805 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | WS | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3806 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4015 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4017 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4018 | on | 01/06/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | w/e | 14/07/1973 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4020 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | w/e | 16/03/1974 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4022 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83B | Taunton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4024 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4025 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4026 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 3w/e | 22/07/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4118 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4169 | on | 29/05/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9526 | on | 06/01/1965 (New) | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9525 | on | 13/01/1965 (New) | 82A | on | 09/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9527 | on | 18/01/1965 (New) | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9528 | on | 21/01/1965 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7087 | on | 20/07/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7091 | on | 24/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1611 | on | 18/08/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1612 | on | 21/08/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | w/e | 13/05/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1613 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1699 | on | 28/12/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1728 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 82A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1700 | on | 13/01/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1721 | on | 06/03/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1729 | on | 09/04/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1732 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1748 | on | 01/07/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1751 | on | 14/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1752 | on | 21/07/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1753 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7089 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 84A | Laira | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1735 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1736 | on | 22/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1737 | on | 25/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1738 | on | 28/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82A | w/e | 11/11/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1739 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9517 | on | 12/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1597 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1598 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1599 | on | 29/06/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1713 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1718 | on | 18/02/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1719 | on | 25/02/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1726 | on | 24/03/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1730 | on | 28/04/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1741 | on | 09/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2130 | on | 27/01/1960 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | m/e | 08/1965 | 82A | m/e | 10/1965 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9553 | on | 16/09/1965 (New) | 82A | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7027 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 84A | Laira | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7029 | on | 17/04/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7030 | on | 19/04/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7031 | on | 25/04/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7032 | on | 05/05/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7033 | on | 24/05/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7037 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7083 | on | 05/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7084 | on | 26/06/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9554 | on | 06/10/1965 (New) | 82A | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9555 | on | 22/10/1965 (New) | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1586 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1589 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9521 | on | 20/11/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9522 | on | 25/11/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9523 | on | 01/12/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | on | 20/01/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9524 | on | 11/12/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1925 | on | 22/12/1965 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1926 | on | 01/01/1966 (New) | 82A | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1585 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1590 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1591 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1603 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1712 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1742 | on | 29/05/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1743 | on | 19/06/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7038 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7039 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | on | 03/06/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9531 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9535 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1928 | on | 21/01/1966 (New) | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1927 | on | 31/01/1966 (New) | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1929 | on | 07/02/1966 (New) | 82A | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1692 | on | 30/11/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 82A | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1693 | on | 06/12/1963 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 82A | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1930 | on | 12/02/1966 (New) | 82A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1707 | on | 11/01/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 82A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1727 | on | 09/04/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 82A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1931 | on | 21/02/1966 (New) | 82A | w/e | 19/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1932 | on | 24/02/1966 (New) | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1933 | on | 02/03/1966 (New) | 82A | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1934 | on | 18/03/1966 (New) | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1935 | on | 18/03/1966 (New) | 82A | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1636 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1637 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1649 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1650 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1652 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1668 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1669 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1670 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1672 | on | 27/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1673 | on | 03/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1674 | on | 05/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1675 | on | 10/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1676 | on | 16/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | w/e | 04/01/1969 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1677 | on | 24/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | w/e | 04/01/1969 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7027 | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9501 | on | 27/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6336 | on | 03/07/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6337 | on | 13/03/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6338 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1027 | on | 28/01/1964 | 84A | Laira (New) | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1030 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6333 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6334 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1025 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1744 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3516 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 83C | Westbury | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | 36A | Doncaster |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3998 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4165 | on | 14/05/1962 | 83B | Taunton (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6324 | on | 01/06/1960 | 83D | Laira (New) | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | on | 14/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6325 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6329 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6330 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6331 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9500 | on | 24/07/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9501 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9502 | on | 27/07/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9517 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7032 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 82A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7033 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 82A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6313 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6340 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1026 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1745 | on | 01/07/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1747 | on | 03/07/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1584 | 4w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3352 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1586 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1588 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1589 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1652 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1733 | on | 12/06/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | w/e | 14/10/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4162 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6322 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6323 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6340 | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6341 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6604 | on | 22/09/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6605 | on | 06/10/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6606 | on | 11/10/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6607 | on | 22/10/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6608 | on | 09/11/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6320 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6321 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | on | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6336 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 98S | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6338 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 98S | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6341 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 98S | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6342 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1653 | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3964 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6311 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6312 | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6313 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6315 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6316 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | on | 31/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6317 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6318 | m/e | 08/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | m/e | 05/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6319 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7078 | on | 03/05/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1590 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1606 | m/e | 12/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1607 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1608 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1609 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1610 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1614 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1615 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1648 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3186 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | w/e | 15/06/1968 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3195 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 81F | Oxford | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3355 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 83B | Taunton | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3405 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7028 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6342 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 82A | on | 21/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6349 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 84A | Laira | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 82A | on | 14/09/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2133 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 83B | Taunton | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | on | 07/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2134 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 83B | Taunton | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4019 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82D | Westbury | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4021 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4022 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 83B | Taunton | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4023 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 82D | Westbury | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4122 | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 83B | Taunton | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4163 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 83C | Westbury | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4166 | on | 17/05/1962 | 83E | St Blazey (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1937 | on | 07/04/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1938 | on | 27/04/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2190 | 2w/e | 31/01/1966 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | on | 28/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7047 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7048 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7049 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82A | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1757 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | on | 29/12/1968 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1756 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 04/01/1969 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1012 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1040 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2136 | on | 21/03/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6331 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | on | 27/03/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7056 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7057 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7059 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7060 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7100 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D138 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D141 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D142 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D143 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D149 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D151 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D154 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D156 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D157 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D165 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D146 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D150 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D155 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1059 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1065 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1067 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D839 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 82A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1034 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1038 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 84A | Laira | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 43 | B-B | D845 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1032 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1055 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 87E | Landore | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1072 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2128 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82C | Swindon | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | w/e | 04/04/1970 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4169 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82C | Swindon | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | w/e | 20/07/1974 | AN | Allerton |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6348 | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 84A | Laira | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6352 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1605 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1641 | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1753 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | w/e | 05/05/1973 | BS | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6310 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | on | 27/03/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6354 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3255 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | 84B | St Blazey | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4125 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1596 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1587 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2121 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2136 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 98S | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 85A | Worcester | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3972 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3990 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4122 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4123 | on | 20/03/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | w/e | 14/06/1975 | SY | Saltley |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1035 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | on | 05/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1643 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | w/e | 13/07/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1644 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1645 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1646 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2121 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | Swindon | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | on | 03/05/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3517 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 84B | St Blazey | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | w/e | 22/02/1975 | BZ | St Blazey |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6327 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | To Store | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6348 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6308 | on | 07/01/1960 | 83D | Laira (New) | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3000 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 82A | on | 19/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6338 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 83A | Newton Abbot | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 82A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6352 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 83A | Newton Abbot | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 82A | on | 02/05/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | D1200 | on | 04/02/1965 | Manufacturer | Manufacturer | w/e | 19/12/1970 | 82A | m/e | 08/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3815 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | 82A | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D140 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 02/01/1971 | 82A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D144 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 02/01/1971 | 82A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6328 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7047 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D145 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 06/02/1971 | 82A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D147 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 06/02/1971 | 82A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4013 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 84D | Penzance | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 82A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D152 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D158 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D159 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D161 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D162 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D163 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 82A | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4160 | on | 24/04/1962 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 82A | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4173 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 82A | w/e | 13/07/1974 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7054 | m/e | 31/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 22/05/1971 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3509 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3754 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 82A | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4183 | on | 17/10/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 82A | m/e | 11/1981 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3513 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | 82A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7074 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 82A | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7075 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 82A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D184 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D185 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D186 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D188 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D189 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1593 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1647 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1680 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1936 | on | 26/03/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2122 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2136 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 85A | Worcester | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4016 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5809 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5812 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5692 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 04/12/1971 | 82A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5695 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 04/12/1971 | 82A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1726 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2122 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 85A | Worcester | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 26/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3526 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 84B | St Blazey | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | SW | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3811 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4121 | on | 07/03/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5202 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5230 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5823 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5824 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5826 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5827 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 04/02/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5828 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5837 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5842 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | w/e | 10/03/1973 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5843 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7004 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 08/01/1972 (R) | 82A | on | 16/06/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7005 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 08/01/1972 (R) | 82A | on | 02/07/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7007 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 08/01/1972 (R) | 82A | on | 19/04/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7038 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | on | 08/01/1972 (R) | 82A | on | 02/07/1972 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7045 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 11/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7050 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 01/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7068 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7076 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7077 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 02/07/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7080 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 07/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7100 | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | on | 01/11/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7569 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7588 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7625 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7656 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7657 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7676 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7677 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3810 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 82A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3989 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 82A | w/e | 16/03/1974 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7054 | on | 01/01/1972 | Withdrawn | w/e | 01/05/1972 (R) | 82A | 2w/e | 13/05/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7089 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | 82A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1601 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1602 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1603 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1604 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1715 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 87A | Landore | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1941 | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3509 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82A | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1940 | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1682 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | w/e | 29/06/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1936 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3797 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | w/e | 14/04/1973 | OC | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5617 | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1948 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3835 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 82A | m/e | 07/1981 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1595 | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1598 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4125 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82C | Swindon | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | w/e | 20/01/1973 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5209 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5213 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5227 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7087 | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | on | 07/10/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1945 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 19/08/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1590 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1949 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D01 | London Division | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1942 | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4118 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 85A | Worcester | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 82A | w/e | 20/09/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7096 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 82A | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | D400 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 21/10/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7502 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 82A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7577 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 82A | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1591 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 07/09/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1728 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1729 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1730 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5803 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5809 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5818 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7028 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7044 | m/e | 10/1971 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 10/03/1973 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7054 | on | 15/09/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7097 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7503 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7504 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1959 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4175 | on | 22/06/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 82A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2382 | on | 20/08/1972 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 82A | on | 02/10/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7507 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 82A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | D7093 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 82A | on | 06/05/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3964 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 85A | Worcester | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | 82A | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4004 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 20/01/1973 | 82A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | WS | Worcester |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1676 | w/e | 12/12/1970 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 82A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47057 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 82A | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3992 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 82A | w/e | 22/02/1975 | BZ | St Blazey |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5528 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 10/03/1973 | 82A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1947 | w/e | 16/12/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 82A | w/e | 05/05/1973 | 87A | Landore |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5617 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 82A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1710 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1711 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1712 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1714 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1719 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1720 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1722 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47132 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 10/11/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1732 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7508 | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47133 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | BR | w/e | 07/12/1974 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5530 | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | BR | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4159 | on | 16/04/1962 | 83D | Laira (New) | w/e | 23/06/1973 | BR | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1741 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 07/07/1973 | BR | w/e | 09/11/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5617 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 07/07/1973 | BR | on | 19/02/1978 | MR | March |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | D401 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 08/07/1973 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3816 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 14/07/1973 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3994 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | w/e | 11/08/1973 | BR | w/e | 16/03/1974 | GL | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5554 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5655 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5668 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | w/e | 10/11/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7624 | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | w/e | 09/03/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7625 | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 06/10/1973 | BR | w/e | 09/03/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | D402 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1676 | w/e | 06/10/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | w/e | 06/07/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47185 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | w/e | 13/07/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4130 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7507 | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 10/11/1973 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47484 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 08/12/1973 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50011 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/02/1974 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50003 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | w/e | 06/04/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | D405 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50027 | on | 10/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | w/e | 06/04/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3040 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | w/e | 12/07/1975 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31279 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 09/03/1974 | BR | w/e | 11/05/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08089 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | w/e | 16/03/1974 | BR | w/e | 11/01/1976 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3208 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 67C | Ayr | w/e | 16/03/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08003 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | w/e | 01/11/1975 | DR | Doncaster |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31256 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31257 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 27/04/1974 | BR | w/e | 11/01/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50020 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 04/05/1974 | BR | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50025 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 04/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50038 | on | 16/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 04/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50044 | on | 11/10/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 04/05/1974 | BR | on | 01/01/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50006 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 18/05/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50016 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 12/04/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50017 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 25/05/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50018 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50019 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 19/07/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50023 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50024 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50030 | on | 25/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50032 | on | 12/07/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50033 | on | 19/07/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50037 | on | 20/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50039 | on | 09/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50040 | on | 25/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 25/05/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50042 | on | 30/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | on | 01/10/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50043 | on | 04/10/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | on | 01/02/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50046 | on | 25/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 04/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50047 | on | 05/11/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 04/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50048 | on | 05/12/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 04/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50049 | on | 11/12/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 04/1977 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47063 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47064 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47097 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47104 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47106 | 2w/e | 23/12/1972 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47111 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47112 | on | 17/06/1968 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08951 | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 84D | Penzance | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | m/e | 08/1977 | WS | Worcester |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25077 | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 06/09/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25220 | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46016 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 18/05/1974 | BR | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46023 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 18/05/1974 | BR | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08377 | w/e | 13/05/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 22/06/1974 | BR | w/e | 22/02/1975 | BZ | St Blazey |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08935 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | Swindon | w/e | 22/06/1974 | BR | on | 30/04/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47142 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 29/06/1974 | BR | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47472 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47478 | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | w/e | 15/03/1975 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 09025 | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 13/07/1974 | BR | m/e | 31/01/1976 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 09024 | on | 29/12/1968 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 20/07/1974 | BR | m/e | 31/01/1976 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08113 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 27/07/1974 | BR | w/e | 02/11/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47119 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 10/08/1974 | BR | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47104 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | w/e | 14/09/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47106 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47111 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47112 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47477 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 87A | Landore | w/e | 07/09/1974 | BR | on | 01/11/1981 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25156 | w/e | 06/10/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 07/09/1974 | BR | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | LO | Longsight |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47104 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 14/09/1974 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47106 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47111 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47112 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 05/10/1974 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47464 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47479 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | 87E | Landore | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25059 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25063 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25152 | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | w/e | 28/02/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25153 | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | w/e | 28/02/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25155 | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25158 | w/e | 07/07/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | BR | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47008 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 07/12/1974 | BR | on | 17/10/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08855 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 82C | Swindon | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | BR | w/e | 22/03/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08839 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83E | St Blazey | w/e | 22/02/1975 | BR | 2w/e | 20/09/1975 | SW | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08841 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83E | St Blazey | w/e | 22/02/1975 | BR | w/e | 15/03/1975 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08928 | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | BZ | St Blazey | w/e | 22/02/1975 | BR | w/e | 15/03/1975 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47093 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | w/e | 11/10/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08149 | w/e | 26/01/1974 | DY | Derby | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | on | 05/04/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08800 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | on | 25/01/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31230 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | w/e | 12/04/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31231 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | BR | w/e | 12/04/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47032 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 15/03/1975 | BR | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08091 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 15/03/1975 | BR | w/e | 13/12/1975 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08810 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 15/03/1975 | BR | w/e | 22/08/1976 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08322 | on | 18/10/1957 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | w/e | 22/03/1975 | BR | m/e | 11/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47066 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47075 | 2w/e | 01/06/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25093 | 2w/e | 22/02/1975 | LO | Longsight | w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25094 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25096 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | BS | Bescot | w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25098 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31165 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | m/e | 08/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31261 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | m/e | 09/1977 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31262 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | w/e | 11/10/1975 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31296 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TE | Thornaby | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | m/e | 09/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25157 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25158 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25159 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25160 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25161 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25162 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25171 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25172 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25219 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | BR | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08414 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | 65F | Grangemouth | w/e | 17/05/1975 | BR | on | 03/10/1976 | AF | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08478 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 17/05/1975 | BR | on | 14/12/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08006 | w/e | 04/08/1973 | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | w/e | 14/06/1975 | BR | w/e | 01/11/1975 | DR | Doncaster |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08936 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 14/06/1975 | BR | m/e | 12/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46011 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 84A | Laira | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | BR | w/e | 11/10/1975 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47464 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LE | Landore | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | BR | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08479 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | BR | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47074 | w/e | 06/04/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08053 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | SW | Swindon | 2w/e | 20/09/1975 | BR | w/e | 01/11/1975 | DR | Doncaster |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08185 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 20/09/1975 | BR | m/e | 01/1977 | GL | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47001 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | m/e | 09/1981 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47054 | w/e | 20/07/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47063 | w/e | 05/10/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47129 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | LE | Landore | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31295 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | on | 19/02/1978 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31309 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 11/10/1975 | BR | m/e | 09/1977 | MR | March |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47020 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | w/e | 10/01/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47091 | w/e | 12/12/1970 | 87A | Landore | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08816 | w/e | 22/03/1975 | WS | Worcester | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | w/e | 23/05/1976 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31229 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | m/e | 09/1977 | MR | March |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31293 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | on | 19/02/1978 | MR | March |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25163 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25164 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | BR | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08281 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | w/e | 13/12/1975 | BR | w/e | 06/03/1976 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50035 | on | 30/09/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 10/01/1976 | BR | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50041 | on | 03/10/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 10/01/1976 | BR | on | 17/04/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25167 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 10/01/1976 | BR | w/e | 28/02/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 25168 | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 10/01/1976 | BR | w/e | 28/02/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08756 | m/e | 31/01/1976 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 21/02/1976 | BR | on | 11/10/1987 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08850 | m/e | 31/01/1976 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 21/02/1976 | BR | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50022 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50029 | on | 21/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division (New) | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08821 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | NA | Newton Abbot | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | on | 11/12/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31136 | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31254 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | w/e | 06/03/1976 | BR | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50008 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | BR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 50040 | w/e | 25/05/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47020 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BR | w/e | 10/07/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47024 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BR | w/e | 10/07/1976 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31209 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BR | m/e | 07/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31210 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31213 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 08/05/1976 | BR | m/e | 09/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08218 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | 2w/e | 05/06/1976 | BR | on | 20/07/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47056 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | BR | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03128 | m/e | 25/09/1971 | Withdrawn | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 (R) | BR | on | 04/07/1976 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03134 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 84A | Laira | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | BR | on | 04/07/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47061 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | w/e | 10/07/1976 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47317 | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | HA | Haymarket | 2w/e | 24/07/1976 | BR | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47059 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | ED | Eastfield | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BR | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08823 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82C | Swindon | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BR | m/e | 10/1976 | SW | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08816 | w/e | 22/08/1976 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 3w/e | 04/09/1976 | BR | m/e | 08/1977 | RG | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31260 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 18/09/1976 | BR | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47148 | w/e | 09/11/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 10/1976 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08492 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | Swindon | m/e | 10/1976 | BR | m/e | 11/1976 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31124 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | IM | Immingham | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | BR | m/e | 10/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31132 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | IM | Immingham | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | BR | on | 09/01/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08140 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | LA | Laira | m/e | 12/1976 | BR | m/e | 05/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08410 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot | m/e | 12/1976 | BR | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47465 | 2w/e | 25/08/1973 | LE | Landore | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | BR | m/e | 10/1977 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08825 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 01/1977 | BR | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47478 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | on | 31/12/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47484 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | on | 01/06/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47493 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | m/e | 06/1977 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47494 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | m/e | 06/1977 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47495 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47496 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 87A | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47497 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47498 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47499 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47500 | w/e | 31/03/1973 | 87A | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47502 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | LE | Landore | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31265 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 05/1977 | BR | m/e | 07/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47284 | w/e | 02/09/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 06/1977 | BR | on | 14/01/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47285 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 06/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47286 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley | m/e | 06/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08185 | m/e | 01/1977 | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 08/1977 | BR | on | 06/09/1981 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08638 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | WS | Worcester | m/e | 08/1977 | BR | m/e | 11/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31421 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | OC | Old Oak Common | m/e | 08/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31424 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 09/1977 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31423 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 09/1977 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31414 | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 09/1977 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31416 | w/e | 10/03/1973 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 09/1977 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31422 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 09/1977 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47159 | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1977 | BR | on | 17/05/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08238 | w/e | 13/11/1976 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 10/1977 | BR | on | 18/03/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08480 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 10/1977 | BR | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31419 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common | m/e | 10/1977 | BR | on | 01/12/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47140 | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47142 | m/e | 02/1977 | LA | Laira | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31258 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | BR | on | 01/11/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08338 | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | WS | Worcester | on | 01/02/1978 | BR | m/e | 11/1981 | GL | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31135 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 31B | March | on | 19/02/1978 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31154 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | on | 19/02/1978 | BR | on | 31/05/2006 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31158 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 31B | March | on | 19/02/1978 | BR | on | 07/07/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31401 | w/e | 24/08/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park | on | 19/02/1978 | BR | on | 31/03/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47138 | m/e | 01/1977 | LA | Laira | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08949 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 08/12/1980 | BR | on | 17/05/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47254 | w/e | 19/08/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 05/01/1981 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08584 | w/e | 22/03/1975 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 07/1981 | BR | on | 23/08/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37127 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TI | Tinsley | m/e | 07/1981 | BR | on | 04/10/1987 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37134 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 07/1981 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37135 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TI | Tinsley | m/e | 07/1981 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08486 | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 09/1981 | BR | on | 27/11/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08259 | on | 01/12/1980 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 11/1981 | BR | on | 01/07/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08322 | w/e | 22/03/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 11/1981 | BR | on | 18/09/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08638 | m/e | 08/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 11/1981 | BR | on | 11/12/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37187 | on | 31/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | on | 22/11/1981 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37188 | on | 16/01/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | on | 22/11/1981 | BR | on | 31/03/2006 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37189 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 87E | Landore | on | 22/11/1981 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47556 | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | LA | Laira | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/05/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47466 | m/e | 02/1978 | ED | Eastfield | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/08/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47557 | on | 01/11/1981 | GD | Gateshead | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/04/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47558 | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/03/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47559 | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | LA | Laira | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/01/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47564 | m/e | 05/1977 | ED | Eastfield | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/11/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47565 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | IM | Immingham | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/01/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47567 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | IM | Immingham | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/02/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47535 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | BS | Bescot | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/02/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47537 | w/e | 01/06/1974 | BS | Bescot | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47625 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47626 | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/06/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47624 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/11/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47607 | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47592 | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/12/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47575 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47584 | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | TI | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47616 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47600 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47589 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47615 | on | 07/02/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47596 | on | 21/06/1981 | SF | Stratford | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/04/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47603 | on | 01/05/1977 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/04/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47627 | on | 13/11/1965 | 64B | Haymarket (New) | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 01/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37142 | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | LA | Laira | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37146 | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37158 | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37174 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 40B | Immingham | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37207 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 87A | Landore | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37232 | on | 20/03/1964 | 87E | Landore (New) | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | on | 15/05/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47519 | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | Gateshead | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47525 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 31/10/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47560 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | LA | Laira | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47662 | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | LA | Laira | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47566 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | IM | Immingham | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/11/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47652 | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47654 | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/06/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47661 | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47620 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47609 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47613 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/05/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47653 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/09/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47656 | m/e | 03/1978 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47658 | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47664 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | SF | Stratford | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/02/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47621 | m/e | 05/1977 | LE | Landore | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47551 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | YK | York (North) | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/06/2002 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47660 | w/e | 18/11/1972 | 30A | Stratford | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47611 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/11/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47665 | on | 19/10/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 01/09/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47657 | on | 18/11/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47663 | on | 03/12/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47659 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47655 | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47651 | on | 05/01/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47650 | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47500 | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47552 | on | 01/11/1981 | GD | Gateshead | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47508 | m/e | 03/1978 | OC | Old Oak Common | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 14/05/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47553 | on | 12/02/1978 | HA | Haymarket | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | on | 22/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47591 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47629 | on | 17/06/1968 | D05 | Stoke Division | on | 15/05/1988 | BR |