Depot: Bromsgrove
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Bromsgrove | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7239 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 21C | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7301 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7303 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7305 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7308 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7313 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7425 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7565 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6F | Bidston | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7234 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | 69999 | on | 17/10/1925 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 07/03/1949 | 21C | on | 11/11/1950 | 36B | Mexborough |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3321 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 21C | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 21C | on | 03/04/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43686 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 21C | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3186 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 21C | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 21C | Bromsgrove |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3186 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 21C | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 21B | Bournville |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47276 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 21C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47301 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 21C | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47502 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 21C | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 21C | Bromsgrove |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47502 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 21C | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 56020 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 21C | ||||||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47635 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 21C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47257 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 21C | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43462 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 21C | on | 07/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51217 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 21C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | 69999 | on | 11/11/1950 | 36B | Mexborough | on | 03/07/1955 | 21C | on | 13/09/1955 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43762 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 21C | on | 25/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92079 | on | 30/04/1956 | 18A | Toton (New) | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 21C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8402 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 21C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8400 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 21C | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8404 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 21C | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8405 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 21C | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8401 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 21C | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8403 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 21C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8406 | on | 31/12/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 21C | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 21C | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9455 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 85F | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8427 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85F | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5226 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85F | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3988 | on | 27/08/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85D | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43593 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 85D | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8409 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 85D | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9430 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 85D | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9493 | m/e | 06/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 85D | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8480 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 85D | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8487 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 85D | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9429 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 85D | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92234 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85D | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8487 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 85D | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 85D | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9401 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 85A | Worcester | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 85D | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47506 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 85D | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8418 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 85D | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92223 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 85D | 07/02/1964 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85D | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9453 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85D | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |