Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 268 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5846 Week
» 25579 Month
» 322593 Year
» 399180 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Aberbeeg


Depot Details
Depot Name Aberbeeg
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
16187531/01/1946
ABEEG01/01/191931/01/1950
86H01/02/195009/09/1960
86F10/09/196030/11/1964
Date Opened 07/04/1919
Date Closed 12/1964
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division NEWPORT
Information Still standing in industrial use
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side ot the line between Aberbeeg and Llanhilleth Stations. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Aberbeeg Station along the main road to Crumlin. Continue along this road for about half a mile, and a broad path leads down a steep bank to the shed, from the right hand side of this road.
Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 16
01/01/1919Change of code to ABEEG
07/04/1919Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 86H
10/09/1960Change of code to 86F
12/1964Depot closed