Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 254 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1540 Week
» 29014 Month
» 326028 Year
» 402615 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Burton


Depot Details
Depot Name Burton
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
2187531/12/1922
M201/01/192331/01/1935
17B01/02/193508/09/1963
16F09/09/196305/05/1973
BU06/05/1973
Date Opened 1840
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions Midland Shed.
The shed is on the west side of the line south of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside the station along Borough Road. Turn left into Wellington Street, and left into Shobnall Road. A cinder path leads to the shed from a gate on the right hand side, just before the railway over-bridge. Walking time 15 minutes. North Western Shed.
The shed is at the end of a goods spur off the main line north of the station. The yard is not visible from the line.

Turn right outside the station along Borough Road. Continue into Station Street, turn left into Guild Street, left again at the end into Horninglow Street, and right into Hawkins Lane. A path leads to the shed from a gate on the right hand side, on the railway bridge. Walking time 20 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1840Depot opened
1875Change of code to 2
01/01/1923Change of code to M2
01/01/1935Change of code to 17B
09/09/1963Change of code to 16F
09/1966Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to BU