Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bury


Depot Details
Depot Name Bury
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
26D187531/08/1963
9M01/09/196331/03/1965
BV06/05/197304/01/1975
BQ05/01/1975
Date Closed 12/04/1965
Big 4 Company LMS
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the Bury (Bolton Street)-Radcliffe line. The yard is visible from the line.

From Bury Knowsley Street Station.
Turn left outside Bury Knowsley Street Station along Knowsley Street. Turn right into Baron Street, and the shed entrance is on the left hand side. Walking time 5 minutes.

From Bury Bolton Street Station.
Turn right outside Bury Bolton Street Station into Bolton Street. Turn right into Silver Street, and continue into Manchester Road. Turn right into Baron Street, and the shed entrance is on the left hand side. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 26D
01/09/1963Change of code to 9M
12/04/1965Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to BV
05/01/1975Change of code to BQ