Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 253 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1539 Week
» 29013 Month
» 326027 Year
» 402614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bushbury


Depot Details
Depot Name Bushbury
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
1301/01/187531/12/1922
W1301/01/192331/01/1935
3B01/02/193531/05/1960
21C01/06/196031/08/1963
2K01/09/196312/04/1965
Date Opened 1859
Date Closed 12/04/1965
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the Stafford line, 1½ miles north of Wolverhampton Station. The yard is visible from the line.

From Wolverhampton L.M.S. Station.
Go straight ahead outside Wolverhampton High Level Station along Railway Drive. Continue straight across the square at the end of Rail- way Drive into Short Street. Turn right into Princes Square.

From Wolverhampton G.W. Station.
Turn right outside Wolverhampton Low Level Station into the drive. Turn left at the end of the drive into Wednesfield Road, and continue along Broad Street to Princes Square.
Turn right at Princes Square into- Stafford Street, and continue along Lower Stafford Street and Stafford Road. Turn right into Bush- bury Lane. The shed entrance is a gate on the lefthand side just past the railWay under bridge. Walking time 35 minutes, but a bus route (No. 33) runs from the town to the shed entrance.

Note.-Bushbury Lane is the second turning on the right past Stafford Road G.W.R. shed.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1859Depot opened
1875Change of code to 13
01/01/1923Change of code to W13
01/01/1935Change of code to 3B
01/06/1960Change of code to 21C
01/09/1963Change of code to 2K
12/04/1965Depot closed