Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 89 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6145 Week
» 20722 Month
» 383967 Year
» 460554 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Camden


Depot Details
Depot Name Camden
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
1B01/02/193503/01/1966
Date Opened 20/06/1837
Date Closed 03/01/1966
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
Information Originally opened by the London and Birmingham Railway. Used for the stabling of diesel locomotives awaiting return workings after closure.
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the main line about 1½ miles north of Euston Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Cross the railway bridge (Regents Park Road) opposite Chalk Farm (L.P.T.B.) Station into Gloucester Road. Turn left into Dumpton Place, and the shed entrance is at the end of this short cul-de-sac. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
20/06/1837Depot opened
1863Change of code to 1
01/01/1923Change of code to W1
01/01/1935Change of code to 1B
09/09/1963Closed to steam locomotives
03/01/1966Depot closed