Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 255 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1541 Week
» 29015 Month
» 326029 Year
» 402616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Cardiff Canton


Depot Details
Depot Name Cardiff Canton
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
66187531/01/1946
CDF01/01/188231/01/1950
86C01/02/195009/09/1960
88A10/09/196031/08/1963
86A01/09/196305/05/1973
CF06/05/1973
Date Opened 1882
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division NEWPORT
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the main line west of Cardiff General Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside Cardiff General Station along Saunders Road. Turn left along Wood Street, continue along Tudor Road, and then Ninian Park Road. Turn left into De Croche Place (a short cul-de-sac), about 200 yards past the junction of Clare Road. A footbridge leads to the shed from the end of this cul-de-sac.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 66
1882Depot opened
01/01/1882Change of code to CDF
01/02/1950Change of code to 86C
10/09/1960Change of code to 88A
09/1962Closed to steam locomotives
01/09/1963Change of code to 86A
06/05/1973Change of code to CF