Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Cardiff East Dock


Depot Details
Depot Name Cardiff East Dock
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
48187531/01/1946
CED187531/01/1950
88B01/02/195009/09/1960
CED01/10/196028/02/1962
88L01/03/196231/08/1963
88A01/09/196302/08/1965
Date Closed 02/08/1965
Big 4 Company GWR
GWR Division CARDIFF VALLEYS
1947 Directions The shed is in the heart of Cardiff Dockland.

Turn right outside Cardiff General Station into Saunders Road, and continue into Customhouse Street. Turn right into Bute Street, and continue for about ¾ mile. Turn left into the docks through the main entrance opposite the end of James Street. Continue along the dock road in an easterly direction crossing three small swing bridges. The first is over the entrance to Bute West Dock, the second is between Bute East Basin, and Bute East Dock, and the third is between Bute East Dock and Roath Basin. The shed is on the left hand side of this road a few yards further on. Walking time 30 minutes.

Note-The section of this itinerary actually in the dockland may be difficult to follow as the roads and docks do not carry names.

The No. 16 (Pier Head) bus service operates from the Monument at the end of Saunders Road to the entrance to the docks.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 48
1875Change of code to CED
01/02/1950Change of code to 88B
01/10/1960Change of code to CED
01/03/1962Change of code to 88L
01/09/1963Change of code to 88A
02/08/1965Depot closed