Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Carlisle Canal


Depot Details
Depot Name Carlisle Canal
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
CAR187531/01/1950
12B01/06/195006/10/1951
68E07/10/195131/01/1958
12D01/02/195831/03/1958
12C01/04/195817/06/1963
Date Closed 17/06/1963
Big 4 Company LNER
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the Hawick line just north of the junction of the Silloth line. The yard is not visible from the line.
Leave Carlisle Station by the main entrance and continue into Court Square. Turn left into English Street, and fork left into Castle Street. Turn left into Annetwell Street, and cross Caldew Bridge. Continue along Bridge Street and Church Street. Fork right into Caldcotes, and continue into Port Road and Newton Road. A broad cinder path leads from the right hand side of this road (opposite Raffles Road) to the shed.
Walking time 35 minutes.
A bus service labelled Raffles operates between English Street, and the end of Raffles Road.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to CAR
01/06/1950Change of code to 12B
07/10/1951Change of code to 68E
01/02/1958Change of code to 12D
01/04/1958Change of code to 12C
17/06/1963Depot closed