Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Carlisle Kingmoor


Depot Details
Depot Name Carlisle Kingmoor
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
12A01/02/193509/06/1950
68A10/06/195031/01/1958
12A01/02/195805/05/1973
KM06/05/197304/01/1975
KD05/01/1975
Big 4 Company LMS
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the main line about l½ miles north of Carlisle Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Leave Carlisle station by the main entrance and go straight ahead into Court Square. Turn left along English Street, and continue into Scotch Street and Rickergate. Cross Eden Bridge and continue up Stanwix Bank. Turn left at the top along Etterby Street and continue along Etterby Scaur. Turn left at the top of the hill into Etterby Road. A broad cinder path leads to the shed from the right hand side of this road (just before the railway bridge). Walking time 45 minutes.

A bus service (C3 or C4 St. Anns) runs from English Street to the end of Etterby Road (200 yards from the shed entrance).
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 12A
10/06/1950Change of code to 68A
01/02/1958Change of code to 12A
31/12/1967Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to KM
05/01/1975Change of code to KD