Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 467 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18270 Week
» 71286 Month
» 190813 Year
» 3217666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Carstairs
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Carstairs |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 27D | 1884 | 31/12/1939 | 28C | 01/01/1940 | 31/12/1948 | 64D | 01/01/1949 | 30/04/1960 | 66E | 01/05/1960 | 28/02/1967 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is adjacent to the east side of the station. The yard is
partially visible from the line.
A footbridge connects the Glasgow end of the station platforms,
and leads to the shed. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 28C | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 64D | 01/05/1960 | Change of code to 66E |
|
|
|