Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Chester West


Depot Details
Depot Name Chester West
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
CHR01/01/183531/01/1950
54187531/01/1946
84K01/02/195031/01/1958
6E01/02/195831/03/1960
CH06/05/1973
Date Opened 1856
Pre Grouping Company CBR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division WOLVERHAMPTON
Information An amalgamation of the Chester and Birkenhead Railway depot from 1856 (taken over by the GWR) and the Chester and Crewe Railway (later LNWR) depot - in 1870, the LNWR built a new depot east of Chester station and handed over the old shed to the Great Western.
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line at the west end of Chester General Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn right outside Chester General Station, and ascend the flight of steps to Hoole Road, turning right over the end of the station. Turn left into the goods yard approach road, just the other side of the bridge. A foot-bridge leads from the left-hand side of the road to the shed. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/01/1835Change of code to CHR
1856Depot opened
1875Change of code to 54
01/02/1950Change of code to 84K
01/02/1958Change of code to 6E
04/1960Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to CH