Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 255 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1541 Week
» 29015 Month
» 326029 Year
» 402616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Coalville


Depot Details
Depot Name Coalville
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
10C187531/12/1910
10b01/01/191131/12/1922
M10C01/01/192331/01/1935
17C01/02/193519/04/1958
15D20/04/195808/09/1963
15E09/09/196330/09/1965
Date Opened 1890
Date Closed 04/10/1965
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of Coalville Town Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside the station over the level crossing. Turn left along a cinder path, just past the crossing. This leads to the shed. Walking time less than 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 10C
1890Depot opened
01/01/1911Change of code to 10b
01/01/1923Change of code to M10C
01/01/1935Change of code to 17C
20/04/1958Change of code to 15D
09/09/1963Change of code to 15E
04/10/1965Depot closed