Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Colwick


Depot Details
Depot Name Colwick
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
CLK187531/01/1950
38A01/02/195030/06/1958
40E01/07/195803/01/1966
16B03/01/196631/03/1970
Big 4 Company LNER
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line between Netherfield and Colwick, and Gedling and Carlton Stations. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Netherfield and Colwick L.N.E.R. Station into Meadow Road. Turn right at the cross roads into Victoria Road, and the shed entrance is on the left hand side just past the level crossing.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to CLK
01/02/1950Change of code to 38A
01/07/1958Change of code to 40E
03/01/1966Change of code to 16B
12/12/1966Closed to steam locomotives