Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 66 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 22072 Month
» 319086 Year
» 395673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Alexandra Dock (Hull)


Depot Details
Depot Name Alexandra Dock (Hull)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
53C01/12/195814/11/1960
Date Opened 20/07/1885
Date Closed 14/11/1960
Pre Grouping Company HBR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
Information Stayed open as a stabling point until 27th October 1963
1947 Directions The shed is in Hull Dockland.
Turn right outside Hull Paragon Station into Paragon Square. Turn left into Carr Lane, and continue across the square into Alfred Street. Continue into Gelder Street, and over Drypool Bridge. Turn right into Great Union Street, and bear left into Hedon Road. Enter Alexandra Dock by the main gate and bear left along the dock road. This passes the shed office on the left-hand side. There is no shed and the locos stand on a pit.
Walking time 40 minutes.
A bus service labelled No. 47 Hedon Road operates from the City to Alexandra Dock.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
20/07/1885Depot opened
01/12/1958Change of code to 53C
14/11/1960Depot closed