Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1197 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19000 Week
» 72016 Month
» 191543 Year
» 3218396 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Coventry
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Coventry |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 8C | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W8C | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 2F | 01/01/1923 | 30/06/1950 | 2D | 01/07/1950 | 31/10/1958 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the Rugby and Warwick lines east of the
station. The yard is visible from the Warwick line.
Cross the station yard into Eaton Road, and turn first right into
Park Road. At the end of Park Road turn right into Quinton Road.
The shed entrance is on the right hand side just past the railway bridge.
Walking time 10 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 2F | 01/07/1950 | Change of code to 2D |
|
|
|