Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 254 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1540 Week
» 29014 Month
» 326028 Year
» 402615 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Cricklewood East


Depot Details
Depot Name Cricklewood East
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
15187531/12/1922
M1501/01/192331/01/1935
14A01/02/193505/05/1973
CD06/05/197303/12/1973
CW06/12/1973
Big 4 Company LMS
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 15
01/01/1923Change of code to M15
01/01/1935Change of code to 14A
06/05/1973Change of code to CD
06/12/1973Change of code to CW