Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 254 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1540 Week
» 29014 Month
» 326028 Year
» 402615 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Croes Newydd


Depot Details
Depot Name Croes Newydd
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
64187531/01/1946
CNYD187531/01/1950
84J01/02/195009/09/1960
89B10/09/196031/08/1963
6C01/09/196331/05/1967
Big 4 Company GWR
GWR Division WOLVERHAMPTON
1947 Directions The shed is in the triangle formed by the Ruabon-Wrexham-Brymbo lines. The yard is not visible from the main line; there is no passenger service on the other lines.

Leave Wrexham G.W.R. Station by the main exit. Turn left into Regent Street, and right into Bradley Road. Turn right into Ruthin Road and a path leads to the shed over a boarded crossing from a gate on the left-hand side, just past the level-crossing. Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 64
1875Change of code to CNYD
01/02/1950Change of code to 84J
10/09/1960Change of code to 89B
01/09/1963Change of code to 6C
05/06/1967Closed to steam locomotives