Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1193 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18996 Week
» 72012 Month
» 191539 Year
» 3218392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Danygraig
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Danygraig |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | DG (47) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 87C | 01/02/1950 | 31/12/1960 | DG | 01/01/1961 | 28/02/1962 | 87C | 01/03/1962 | 29/02/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
NEATH |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the R & S.B. line west of Jersey
Marine Station (closed). There is now no passenger service on this
line.
Turn left outside Swansea High Street Station along High Street.
Continue along Castle Street, Wind Street, and turn left into Quay
Parade. Continue over the river bridge, past St. Thomas Station, into
Fabian Street. Pass the entrance to Swansea East Dock Shed, continue
along Port Tennant Road, and then Vale of Neath Road for about 2
miles. The shed entrance is on the left hand side of this main, road.
Walking time 55 minutes.
The “United Welsh” Swansea to Neath via Jersey Marine service
passes this shed, and Swansea East Dock. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 47 | 1875 | Change of code to DG | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 87C | 01/01/1961 | Change of code to DG | 01/03/1962 | Change of code to 87C |
|
|
|