Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1723 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15129 Week
» 68145 Month
» 187672 Year
» 3214525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Dawsholm
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Dawsholm |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 27K | 10/08/1896 | 31/12/1939 | 31E | 01/01/1940 | 31/01/1949 | 65D | 01/01/1949 | 05/10/1964 |
|
Date Opened |
10/08/1896 |
Date Closed |
05/10/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
CR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
ScR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of a goods branch, north of Maryhill
Station.
Turn left outside Maryhill L.M.S. Station along Maryhill Road.
Turn left into Kelvindale Road. The shed entrance is on the right hand
side of the road. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 31E | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 65D | 05/10/1964 | Depot closed |
|
|
|