Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 253 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1539 Week
» 29013 Month
» 326027 Year
» 402614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Derby


Depot Details
Depot Name Derby
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
1187531/12/1922
M101/01/192331/01/1935
17A01/02/193508/09/1963
16C09/09/196305/05/1973
DY06/05/1973
Date Opened 1890
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is at the south end of the station on the east side of the London Line. The yard is visible from the London line, and partially visible from the Burton line.

Turn left outside the station, and right into Midland Road. Turn left into Carrington Street, and continue into Noble Street. Turn left into Hullard Street, and a footbridge leads to the shed from the end of this cul-de-sac. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 1
1890Depot opened
01/01/1923Change of code to M1
01/01/1935Change of code to 17A
09/09/1963Change of code to 16C
03/1967Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to DY