Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 136 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2409 Week
» 22142 Month
» 319156 Year
» 395743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Devons Road (Bow)


Depot Details
Depot Name Devons Road (Bow)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
13B188209/06/1950
1D10/06/195009/09/1963
1J09/09/196310/02/1964
Date Opened 1882
Date Closed 10/02/1964
Pre Grouping Company NLR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
Information
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the Bow-Poplar line south of Bow Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside Bromley (by Bow) L.P.T.B. Station along St. Leonards Street. Turn right into Devas Street, and at the end of this street left into Brickfields Road. The shed entrance is a gate on the right hand side by the end of this road. Walking time 10 minutes.

This area was heavily blitzed during the war, and some of the streets are not too easy to identify, but the coal stage is visible from St. Leonards Street.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1882Depot opened
1882Change of code to 13B
10/06/1950Change of code to 1D
25/08/1958Closed to steam locomotives
09/09/1963Change of code to 1J
10/02/1964Depot closed