Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Annesley


Depot Details
Depot Name Annesley
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
ANN187531/01/1950
38B01/02/195031/01/1958
16D01/02/195831/08/1963
16B01/09/196303/01/1966
Date Opened 1898
Date Closed 14/01/1966
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
Information Originally built by the Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway. Later absorbed by the GCR. Possibly closed on 14th June 1965 - TBC
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the G.N. Leen Valley Branch (closed to passenger traffic) about 2½ miles north of Hucknall. At this point the L.M.S. Nottingham-Mansfield, the Leen Valley Branch, and the G.C. Main lines are running parallel. The actual position of the shed is 53.04.20N; 01.12.50W.
Follow the line north from Newstead L.M.S. Station for about 200 yards and then turn right over the level crossing by a derelict L.N.E. station. The shed entrance is round to the right just past the level crossing.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Note: The shed is over one mile from Annesley L.M.S. Station.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to ANN
1898Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 38B
01/02/1958Change of code to 16D
01/09/1963Change of code to 16B
14/01/1966Depot closed