Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1900 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19703 Week
» 72719 Month
» 192246 Year
» 3219099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Edge Hill
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Edge Hill |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 26 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W26 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 8A | 01/01/1923 | 06/05/1968 | EG | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Closed |
06/05/1968 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in a maze of lines east of Edge Hill Station. The coal
stage is visible from the Liverpool-Crewe line.
Turn right outside Edge Hill Station along Tunnel Road. Turn right into Wavertree Read, changing to Picton Road. Turn left into
Tiverton Road just past a railway overbridge. A cinder path leads
through a tunnel from the end of this road to the shed. Walking time
15 minutes.
Note.-The coal stage is separated from the rest of the yard by a
bridge. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 8A | 06/05/1968 | Depot closed | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to EG |
|
|
|