Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2766 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16172 Week
» 69188 Month
» 188715 Year
» 3215568 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Stockport Edgeley
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Stockport Edgeley |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 16S | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W16S | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 9B | 01/01/1923 | 06/05/1968 |
|
Date Closed |
06/05/1968 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line, south of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Go straight ahead outside the station along Station Road. Turn right into Wellington Road, and right again into Greek Street. Turn
left into Shaw Heath, and right into Booth Street. A cinder path leads
to the shed from a gate on the left handside of this road. Walking
time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 9B | 06/05/1968 | Depot closed |
|
|
|