Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3931 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17337 Week
» 70353 Month
» 189880 Year
» 3216733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Hasland
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Hasland |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 23 | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | M23 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 18C | 01/01/1923 | 31/08/1963 | 16H | 01/09/1963 | 31/08/1964 |
|
Date Opened |
1875 |
Date Closed |
07/09/1964 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the main line about 1¾ miles south
of Chesterfield Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Bear left outside Chesterfield L.M.S. Station into Corporation Street.
Turn left into St. Marys Gate, and continue into Lordsmill Street. Fork
right into Derby Road (A61), and continue along this road for about
one mile. Turn left into Storforth Lane, and continue under the railway bridge. Turn right immediately along North Terrace (parallel to
the railway). Turn left at the end, and almost immediately right. This
turning is a tarmac path that leads to the shed. Walking time 50 minutes.
The Storforth Lane Circular bus route operates between Vicar Lane
bus station in Chesterfield, and the railway bridge in Storforth Lane. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 23 | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M23 | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 18C | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 16H | 07/09/1964 | Depot closed |
|
|
|