Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 835 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18638 Week
» 71654 Month
» 191181 Year
» 3218034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Kentish Town
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Kentish Town |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 16 | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | M16 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 14B | 01/01/1923 | 30/04/1963 |
|
Date Opened |
08/09/1867 |
Date Closed |
04/1963 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the main line north of the station.
The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn right outside Kentish Town L.P.T.B. Station into Kentish
Town Road, and fork left into Highgate Road. Turn left up an opening
opposite Lady Somerset Road. A broad path leads from the end of this
opening to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 08/09/1867 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 16 | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M16 | 1935 | Change of code to 14B | 04/1963 | Depot closed |
|
|
|