Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 103 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6159 Week
» 20736 Month
» 383981 Year
» 460568 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ayr


Depot Details
Depot Name Ayr
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
30D187531/01/1950
67C01/02/195003/10/1966
AY06/05/1973
Date Opened 05/08/1839
Date Closed 03/10/1966
Pre Grouping Company GSWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is in the triangle formed by the Ayr-Newton-on-Ayr- Auchincruive lines. The yard is partially visible from each line.

Turn right outside Newton-on-Ayr Station, and right again along Prestwick Road (over the railway bridge). Fork left into Allison Street, and turn left into Viewfield Road. A footbridge leads from the left hand side of this road to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes.
1980 Directions The depot is on the east side of the line south of Newton-on-Ayr Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn right outside Newton-on-Ayr Station into Falkland Park Road, and right again along Prestwick Road, over the railway bridge. Fork left into Allison Street and turn left into Viewfield Road. A footbridge leads to the depot from the left-hand side of this road. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
05/08/1839Depot opened
1875Change of code to 30D
01/02/1950Change of code to 67C
03/10/1966Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to AY

Shunter Duties
Nearby Shunter Duties Ardrossan Harbour
Continuous Class 08 workings for harbour and trips to Kilwinning and Stevenston as required. Stabling point east of Harbour Station, south side.

Ayr Harbour
Continuous Class 08 workings on freight spur one mile south-west of Newton-on-Ayr Station. Access off Prestwick Road. Sometimes return to depot at week-ends.

Ayr Station
DMU sidings adjacent to station, west side.

Falkland Junction
Class 08 workings in yard north of Newton-on-Ayr Station either side of line. Return to depot at weekends.

Glengarnook
Class 08 working in yard and at BSC Works, west side of line north of station. Returns to Ardrossan weekends.

Irvine
Class 08 working in yard south of station either side. Sometimes returns to AY at weekends.