Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Banbury


Depot Details
Depot Name Banbury
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
44187531/01/1946
BAN187531/01/1950
84C01/02/195031/08/1963
2D01/09/196303/10/1966
Date Opened 02/09/1850
Date Closed 03/10/1966
Pre Grouping Company GWR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region LMR
GWR Division WOLVERHAMPTON
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line, south of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left out of the station yard into a rough road running parallel to the railway. This turns into a cinder path, and leads to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
02/09/1850Depot opened
1875Change of code to 44
1875Change of code to BAN
01/02/1950Change of code to 84C
01/09/1963Change of code to 2D
03/10/1966Depot closed