Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Northampton
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Northampton |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 6 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1889 | 5 | 01/01/1890 | 31/12/1922 | W5 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 2C | 01/01/1923 | 30/06/1950 | 4B | 01/07/1950 | 29/02/1952 | 2E | 01/03/1952 | 31/08/1963 | 1H | 01/09/1963 | 31/08/1965 |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the Blisworth-Peterborough line.
The yard is ivisible from this line.
Turn left out of Northampton Castle Station along West Bridge.
Continue along Marefair and Gold Street. Turn right into Bridge Street,
and continue into Cotton End. Cross over the level crossing by Bridge
Street Station, turn right into St. Leonards Road. and continue along
Muir Road parallel to the railway until a foot bridge over the line is
reached. This gives direct access to the shed. Walking time 30 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 2C | 01/07/1950 | Change of code to 4B | 01/03/1952 | Change of code to 2E | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 1H | 27/09/1965 | Closed to steam locomotives |
|
|
|