Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3368 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16774 Week
» 69790 Month
» 189317 Year
» 3216170 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Norwich Thorpe
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Norwich Thorpe |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | NOR | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 32A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | NO | 06/05/1973 | 01/09/1973 | NR | 02/09/1973 | 30/11/1983 | NC | 01/12/1983 | |
|
Date Opened |
30/04/1844 |
Date Closed |
1990 |
Pre Grouping Company |
YNR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Go up the short slope from Norwich Thorpe Station yard to Lower
Clarence Road, Continue along this road, and turn first right into
Clarence Road. The shed entrance is on the right hand side just past
the railway under-bridge. Walking time 10 minutes.
Note: This shed is very dispersed. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 30/04/1844 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to NOR | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 32A | 02/04/1962 | Closed to steam locomotives | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to NO | 02/09/1973 | Change of code to NR | 01/12/1983 | Change of code to NC | 1990 | Depot closed |
|
|
|